SMITH v. KROESEN

Plaintiff: PAUL M. SMITH
Defendant: JOHN A. KROESEN
Case Number: 1:2010cv05723
Filed: November 3, 2010
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Camden Office
County: Atlantic
Referring Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Presiding Judge: Noel L. Hillman
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 9/27/2016. (tf, )
August 18, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Pltf's 52 Motion for Default Judgment against Deft John A. Kroesen; directing Pltf to file a supplemental certification in support of damages w/in 30 days. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 8/18/2015. (drw)
March 25, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Deft Mark Cooley's 34 Motion for Summary Judgment. W/in 30 days, Pltf shall commence prosecution of his claims against Deft John A. Kroesen. If Pltf fails to do so, Pltf's case will be closed for lack of prosecution. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 3/25/2014. (drw)n.m.
November 26, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing pltf to file, w/in 20 days, a certification that properly avers, in accordance with the Courts Opinion, the citizenship of the parties. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 11/26/2013. (drw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. KROESEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL M. SMITH
Represented By: DOMINIC ROMAN DEPAMPHILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN A. KROESEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?