WILSON et al v. CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION et al

Plaintiff: DONALD WILSON, MISHON WILSON, ALVERA BLANDING ROBINSON and JUAN SEREY
Defendant: CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY and CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Case Number: 1:2012cv07586
Filed: December 11, 2012
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Camden Office
County: Gloucester
Presiding Judge: Robert B. Kugler
Referring Judge: Karen M. Williams
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2015 108 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/13/15. (dd, )
October 4, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION FILED. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 10/4/13. (js)
April 8, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/8/14. (dd, )
August 20, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/20/2014. (drw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILSON et al v. CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD WILSON
Represented By: EVAN J. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MISHON WILSON
Represented By: EVAN J. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALVERA BLANDING ROBINSON
Represented By: EVAN J. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN SEREY
Represented By: EVAN J. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSOLIDATED RAIL CORPORATION
Represented By: ALISON C. FINNEGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: ALISON C. FINNEGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Represented By: ALISON C. FINNEGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.