GALLETTA v. VELEZ et al

Defendant: JENNIFER VELEZ, VALERIE HARR and BERGEN COUNTY BOARD OF SOCIAL SERVICES
Plaintiff: ALMA GALLETTA
Case Number: 1:2013cv00532
Filed: January 28, 2013
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Camden Office
County: Camden
Referring Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Presiding Judge: Robert B. Kugler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/3/2014. (tf, )
February 18, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 2/18/2014. (tf, )
November 12, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 11/10/2013. (tf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GALLETTA v. VELEZ et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER VELEZ
Represented By: JENNIFER HEGER SIMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALERIE HARR
Represented By: JENNIFER HEGER SIMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERGEN COUNTY BOARD OF SOCIAL SERVICES
Represented By: JOHN L. SCHETTINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALMA GALLETTA
Represented By: DONALD D. VANARELLI
Represented By: ALAN HERSCHEL SKLARSKY
Represented By: GERALD J. WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?