CORDERO v. RICKNAUER et al

Plaintiff: ADOLFO CORDERO
Defendant: FNU RICKNAUER, SPECIAL INVESTIGATIVE SECTION and THE FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Case Number: 1:2013cv02023
Filed: April 1, 2013
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Camden Office
County: Burlington
Referring Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Presiding Judge: Robert B. Kugler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/21/2016. (tf, n.m.)
April 22, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying without prejudice 40 & 44 MOTIONS for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by ADOLFO CORDERO. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/22/2015. (tf, n.m.)
September 17, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 9/16/2014. (drw)n.m.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CORDERO v. RICKNAUER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADOLFO CORDERO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU RICKNAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECIAL INVESTIGATIVE SECTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?