KAPLAN v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Petitioner: RICHARD KAPLAN
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2013cv02554
Filed: April 22, 2013
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Camden Office
County: Camden
Presiding Judge: Joseph E. Irenas
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER Denying 38 Motion to Compel; ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall accept no further filings from Petitioner in any of the following: Docket Nos. 13-2554, 13-5295, 14-1007, 14-3473, and 13-3023; Case Closed. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 7/28/16. (js)
March 3, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION FILED. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 3/2/16. (js)
January 13, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 1/12/2016. (drw)
December 15, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 12/15/2015. (drw)
July 24, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing w/ prejudice the 2255 Motion to Vacate. The Clerk shall CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas on 7/24/2013. (drw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KAPLAN v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RICHARD KAPLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: JAMES JAMARI BUXTON
Represented By: ROBERT STEPHEN STIGALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?