CARROLL v. DELAWARE RIVER PORT AUTHORITY

Plaintiff: ANTHONY J. CARROLL
Defendant: DELAWARE RIVER PORT AUTHORITY
Case Number: 1:2013cv02833
Filed: May 2, 2013
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Camden Office
County: Camden
Referring Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Presiding Judge: Joseph E. Irenas
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas on 1/10/2014. (dmr)
July 29, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas on 7/29/2014. (dmr)
March 2, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas on 3/2/2015. (drw)
July 9, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas on 7/9/2013. (drw)
July 9, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Delaware River Port Authority's 4 Motion to Dismiss. Pltf Carroll is GRANTED LEAVE to file an AMENDED COMPLAINT by 7/23/2013. Signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas on 7/9/2013. (drw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARROLL v. DELAWARE RIVER PORT AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY J. CARROLL
Represented By: MATTHEW S. WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELAWARE RIVER PORT AUTHORITY
Represented By: CARLA P. MARESCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.