BARTON v. MID-ATLANTIC FLOORING VENTURES INC. et al
Plaintiff: PAULINE BARTON
Defendant: MID-ATLANTIC FLOORING VENTURES INC., AARON BAILEY, MARK GROSSMAN, JOHN DOES and ABC ENTITIES
Case Number: 1:2013cv04592
Filed: July 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Camden
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 OPINION. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 1/12/2017. (tf, )
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 OPINION. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/1/2016. (tf, )
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 OPINION. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/18/2015. (TH, )
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 OPINION. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 12/4/2014. (tf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARTON v. MID-ATLANTIC FLOORING VENTURES INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAULINE BARTON
Represented By: ROBERT J. HAGERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MID-ATLANTIC FLOORING VENTURES INC.
Represented By: IAN D. MEKLINSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AARON BAILEY
Represented By: IAN D. MEKLINSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK GROSSMAN
Represented By: IAN D. MEKLINSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC ENTITIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?