Starbucks Corporation v. Wellshire Farms, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: STARBUCKS CORPORATION
Defendant: WELLSHIRE FARMS, INC. and HAHN BROS., INC.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00041
Filed: January 6, 2014
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Camden Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Presiding Judge: Noel L. Hillman
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2016 259 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 3/4/2016. (TH, )
March 11, 2015 154 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 3/11/2015. (tf, )
November 21, 2014 139 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 11/20/2014. (dmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starbucks Corporation v. Wellshire Farms, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STARBUCKS CORPORATION
Represented By: JUDITH BOND JENNISON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLSHIRE FARMS, INC.
Represented By: JAMES MURDOCK ANDREWS(Designation Retained)
Represented By: CATHERINE JEAN BICK(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAHN BROS., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?