MARINA DISTRICT DEVELOPMENT CO., LLC v. IVEY et al
Plaintiff: MARINA DISTRICT DEVELOPMENT CO., LLC
Defendant: PHILLIP D. IVEY, JR., GEMACO INC., CHENG YIN SUN and JANE DOE
Case Number: 1:2014cv02283
Filed: April 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Atlantic
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Presiding Judge: Noel L. Hillman
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 8/27/2018. (tf, )
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 3/26/2018. (tf, )
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying 120 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Plaintiff shall resume prosecution of its claims against Gemaco, Inc., by renewing its motion for summary judgment, or by seeking other relief that would resolve the claims between Plaintiff and Gemaco, Inc. so that final judgment may be entered on Plaintiff's claims against Ivey and Sun. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 6/6/2017. (tf, )
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 12/15/2016. (dmr)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 10/21/2016. (tf, )
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 3/12/2015. (drw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARINA DISTRICT DEVELOPMENT CO., LLC v. IVEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARINA DISTRICT DEVELOPMENT CO., LLC
Represented By: JEREMY M. KLAUSNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIP D. IVEY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEMACO INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHENG YIN SUN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?