SUPERNUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. v. TWI PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: SUPERNUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Defendant: TWI PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. and TWI INTERNATIONAL LLC
Counter_claimant: TWI INTERNATIONAL LLC and TWI PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Counter_defendant: SUPERNUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00369
Filed: January 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Atlantic
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Presiding Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 402 CLERK'S OPINION re 368 MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Plaintiff SUPERNUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (William T. Walsh, Clerk) (jo, )
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 361 REDACTED OPINION Re: 329 Opinion. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/15/2017. (rtm, )
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER granting 328 Motion to Redact and Seal 326 Transcript ; granting 328 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/28/17. (dd, )
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER granting 215 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/24/17. (dd, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SUPERNUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. v. TWI PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUPERNUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM C. BATON
Represented By: CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Represented By: SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWI PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: MARY PAT GALLAGHER
Represented By: STEVEN GERBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWI INTERNATIONAL LLC
Represented By: MARY PAT GALLAGHER
Represented By: STEVEN GERBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: TWI INTERNATIONAL LLC
Represented By: MARY PAT GALLAGHER
Represented By: STEVEN GERBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: TWI PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: MARY PAT GALLAGHER
Represented By: STEVEN GERBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: SUPERNUS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM C. BATON
Represented By: CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA
Represented By: SARAH ANN SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?