THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN et al v. CUMBERLAND COUNTY et al
Plaintiff: THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN and CHRISTINE ALLEN
Defendant: CUMBERLAND COUNTY, WARDEN ROBERT BALICKI, JOHN DOE CORRECTION OFFICERS 1-50, A. GARCIA, RN, CORRECTIONS OFFICER RICHARD SERANO, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL PUGLISE, CORRECTIONS OFFICER D. ORTIZ, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MELANIE LOATMAN, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL FOWLKES, CORRECTIONS OFFICER SANTOS and JOHN DOE CORRECTIONS OFFICERS 9-50
Special Master: WILLIAM M. TAMBUSSI
Cross Claimant: CORRECTIONS OFFICER FLOYD and CORRECTIONS OFFICER BADGE NO. 120
Case Number: 1:2015cv06273
Filed: August 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Atlantic
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Robert B Kugler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 266 AFFIDAVIT of William M. Tambussi as Special Master by WILLIAM M. TAMBUSSI. (TAMBUSSI, WILLIAM)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER Appointing William M. Tambussi, Esq. as Special Master in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/13/2023. (mag)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Letter addressed to Judge Bumb from JOHN E. KUSTURISS, JR. (Received via ECF Help Desk) (mag)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 263 Letter from JOHN E. KUSTURISS, JR. re #261 Order, objecting to the appointment of a Special Master. (mag)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 262 RESPONSE re #261 Order. (MCCLAIN, JEFFREY)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER stating that the Court intends to appoint a special master to address the settlement allocations and distributions; any objections shall be filed by no later than June 7, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 5/24/2023. (mag)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 260 Letter from John E. Kusturiss, Esquire. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/3/2023. (Court Reporter, ECR) (mag)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 258 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Conference set for 5/3/2023 at 12:15 PM by Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 4/21/2023. (ssp, )
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Letter from John E. Kusturiss, Esquire. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 256 Letter from John E. Kusturiss, Esquire. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER adjourning the hearings on settlement approval scheduled for 4/19/2023 and 4/20/2023. The Court will set new dates for settlement approval hearings upon Plaintiffs submission of the documents and certifications required pursuant to the March 22, 2023 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 4/11/2023. (dmr)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER: The Court well conduct a hearing for approval of the settlements on April 19, 2023 at 11:00 A.M. in Courtroom 3B as to the following cases: The Estate of Alissa Marie Allen v. Cumberland County, et al., Civil No. 15-6273 (RBK/AMD); The Estate of David Hennis v. Balicki, et al., Civil No. 16-4216 (RBK/AMD); The Estate of Jon Leon Watson v. Cumberland County, et al., Civil No. 16-6578 (JHR/AMD); and The Estate of Robert Wayne Lewis v. Cumberland County, et al., Civil No. 16-3503; Court will conduct a subsequent hearing for approval of the settlements on April 20, 2023 at 11:00 A.M. in Courtroom 3B, in the following cases: The Estate of David B. Conroy v. Cumberland County, et al., Civil No. 17-7183 (RBK/AMD); The Estate of Megan Moore v. Cumberland County, et al., Civil No. 17-2839 (RBK/AMD); and The Estate of Megan Moore v. Roman, et al., Civil No. 18-16345 (RBK/AMD). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 3/22/2023. (ssp, ) Modified on 3/29/2023 (tf, ).
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/14/2023. Telephone Status Conference held on the record. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter, ECR) (dmr)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 252 AMENDED TEXT ORDER: The telephonic conference on 3/15/2023 shall be, and is hereby, RESCHEDULED to 3/14/2023 at 11:00 A.M. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference call: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 3/1/2023. (slc)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 251 TEXT ORDER: The Court will conduct a telephonic conference on 3/15/2023 at 12:00 Noon. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference call: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 3/1/2023. (slc)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Letter from Conrad J. Benedetto, Esq.. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Letter from Conrad J. Benedetto, Esq.. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Letter from Conrad J. Benedetto, Esq.. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 247 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/31/2022. (Court Reporter, Court Conference Line) (amv)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 246 TEXT ORDER: The telephonic conference on 10/27/2022 shall be, and is hereby, RESCHEDULED to 10/31/2022 at 10:30 A.M. All counsel shall appear. Counsel shall utilize the same dial-in instructions previously provided by the Court. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/26/2022. (slc)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 245 TEXT ORDER: Due to a change in the Court's calendar, the telephone conference on 10/26/2022 shall be, and is hereby, RESCHEDULED to 10/27/2022 at 2:30 P.M. Counsel shall utilize the same dial-in instructions previously provided by the Court. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/26/2022. (slc)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 244 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 10/26/2022 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference call: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/14/2022. (slc)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 243 Letter from Conrad J. Benedetto, Esquire. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 242 Letter from Conrad J. Benedetto, Esquire. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Invoices, #2 Exhibit Invoices of Experts)(BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 241 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs' counsel shall submit all deposition invoices, as well as all invoices from each retained expert in this matter by no later than 8/5/2022. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/29/2022. (slc)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Letter from Conrad J. Benedetto, Esquire. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Certification of Conrad J. Benedetto on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Costs and Expenses)(BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER confirming directives given to counsel during telephonic conference held on March 16, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 3/22/2022. (alb)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 236 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/16/2022. (Court Reporter, Court Conference Line) (alb)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 235 Certification of Conrad J. Benedetto on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Costs and Expenses)(BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER directing counsel for Plaintiff to file an affidavit that itemizes the costs and expenses to be reimbursed to Plaintiff's counsel; The Court will conduct a telephone conference on 3/16/2022 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/17/2022. (dmr) Modified on 2/17/2022 (dmr, ).
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER of USCA as to #203 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by CHRISTINE ALLEN, THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN (Finance notified). (js)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 233 AFFIDAVIT of Conrad J. Benedetto by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER directing counsel for Plaintiffs to file an affidavit that itemizes the costs and expenses to be reimbursed to Plaintiffs' counsel; counsel for Plaintiffs in the Hennis matter to provide a Disclaimer of Interest and a Renunciation of Administration by the father of the decedent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/1/2022. (alb)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 231 AFFIDAVIT of Conrad J. Benedetto by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER regarding affidavit pertaining to settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/25/2022. (dmr)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Letter from Conrad J. Benedetto, Esquire. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/20/2021. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter, Court Conference Line) (tf, )
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER confirming the directives given to counsel during the telephonic status conference held on December 20, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 12/20/2021. (tf, )
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 226 TEXT ORDER: Upon the letter application of Plaintiffs' counsel, and for good cause shown, the telephone conference on 12/8/2021 shall be, and is hereby, RESCHEDULED to 12/20/2021 at 2:00 P.M. Counsel shall utilize the same dial-in instructions previously provided by the Court. Additionally, this matter shall not be fully closed until resolution of the allocation of the settlement proceeds. Plaintiffs shall provide a letter to the Court setting forth the proposed allocation of the settlement proceeds and the proposed disbursement by no later than 12/15/2021. No disbursement shall be made of the settlement proceeds until further order of the Court. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 12/8/2021. (slc)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Letter from Conrad Benedetto's Office. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 224 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 12/8/2021 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference call: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 12/6/2021. (slc)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 223 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of any and all claims, crossclaims, third-party claims by A. GARCIA, RN. (MCCLAIN, JEFFREY)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 222 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by CUMBERLAND COUNTY. (BARKER, A.)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 221 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by CUMBERLAND COUNTY, CORRECTIONS OFFICER FLOYD, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL FOWLKES, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MELANIE LOATMAN, CORRECTIONS OFFICER D. ORTIZ, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL PUGLISE, CORRECTIONS OFFICER RICHARD SERANO, WARDEN ROBERT BALICKI. (BARKER, A.)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 220 Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by A. GARCIA, RN. (HOLTZMAN, STEPHEN)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 219 NOTICE of Appearance by A. MICHAEL BARKER on behalf of CORRECTIONS OFFICER FLOYD, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL FOWLKES, CORRECTIONS OFFICER D. ORTIZ, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL PUGLISE, CORRECTIONS OFFICER RICHARD SERANO, WARDEN ROBERT BALICKI (BARKER, A.)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 218 NOTICE by CORRECTIONS OFFICER BADGE NO. 120, CUMBERLAND COUNTY, CORRECTIONS OFFICER FLOYD, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL FOWLKES, CORRECTIONS OFFICER D. ORTIZ, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL PUGLISE, CORRECTIONS OFFICER SANTOS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER RICHARD SERANO, WARDEN ROBERT BALICKI that John C. Eastlack, Jr. should be removed as counsel for certain defendants and removed from electronic case filing notifications (ANGSTREICH, STEVEN)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney LILIA LONDAR terminated. (LONDAR, LILIA)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 216 NOTICE of Change of Address by DANIEL EDWARD RYBECK (RYBECK, DANIEL)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Change of Address submitted by D. Rybeck on 5/25/2021 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (tf, )
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 215 Letter from Conrad J. Benedetto, Esquire. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Settlement Conference held via telephone on 4/8/2021. (sb, )
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Settlement Conference held via telephone on 4/7/2021. (sb, )
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 214 TEXT ORDER: The Court will reconvene the telephonic settlement conference on 4/7/2021 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Clients with settlement authority should be directed to be available by telephone. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 4/1/2021. (slc)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Settlement Conference held via telephone on 3/26/2021. (sb, )
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 213 BRIEF in Opposition filed by A. GARCIA, RN re #207 First MOTION Pursuant to Rule 60b with Proof of E-Filing and Service (MCCLAIN, JEFFREY)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Letter from Conrad J Benedetto. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 211 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CORRECTIONS OFFICER MELANIE LOATMAN re #207 First MOTION Pursuant to Rule 60b (BARKER, A.)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/17/2021. Ordered plaintiff's settlement memoranda due March 2. Ordered defendants' joint settlement memoranda due March 17. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder Court Conference Line.) (tf, )
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 209 TEXT ORDER: The Court will conduct a telephonic Settlement Conference on 3/26/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. Additionally, Plaintiffs shall submit their settlement memorandum to defense counsel by no later than 3/2/2021, and defense counsel shall submit a joint memorandum to Plaintiffs by 3/17/2021. All parties shall email their memoranda to the Court at njdnef_donio@njd.uscourts.gov. Clients with settlement authority should be directed to be available by telephone. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/17/2021. (slc)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 208 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 2/17/2021 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference: 1-888-684-8852 / 2828702# / 654321#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/16/2021. (slc)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #207 First MOTION Pursuant to Rule 60b . Motion set for 3/15/2021 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 207 First MOTION Pursuant to Rule 60b by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certification Certification of Counsel, #3 Brief Motion Brief, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A)(BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER that Defendant Loatman may move for fees, costs, and sanctions, within thirty (30) days after this Court receives the Third Circuit's mandate in this case. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 7/31/2020. (tf, )
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Letter from Vanessa E. James, Esquire. (JAMES, VANESSA)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 204 USCA Case Number 20-2411 for #203 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by CHRISTINE ALLEN, THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN. USCA Case Manager Stephanie (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3sb, )
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 203 NOTICE OF APPEAL by CHRISTINE ALLEN, THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ANJDC-11044798. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. Appeal Record due by 7/23/2020. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Appeal filed by Conrad Benedetto on 7/7/2020 was submitted incorrectly as a Notice(other). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Notice of Appeal USING *Notice of Appeal*. Please be advised, the Notice of Appeal was filed without a filing fee. PLEASE SUBMIT THE FEE OF $505. (tf, )
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 202 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting [179, 184, 185] Defendants' motions for summary judgment; denying #180 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting #182 Motion to Seal ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/23/2020. (tf, )
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 200 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/23/2020. (tf, )
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CORRECTIONS OFFICER BADGE NO. 120, CUMBERLAND COUNTY, CORRECTIONS OFFICER FLOYD, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL FOWLKES, CORRECTIONS OFFICER D. ORTIZ, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL PUGLISE, CORRECTIONS OFFICER SANTOS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER RICHARD SERANO, WARDEN ROBERT BALICKI re #185 First MOTION for Summary Judgment (LONDAR, LILIA)
October 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by A. GARCIA, RN re #184 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Proof of E-Filing and Service (Attachments: #1 Statement (Reply) to Plaintiffs' Response to Statement of Material Facts, #2 Certification (Reply) of Counsel, #3 Exhibit (Reply) 1-2)(MCCLAIN, JEFFREY)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CORRECTIONS OFFICER MELANIE LOATMAN re #179 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Authenticity of Exhibits, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #3 Index Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit 30)(BARKER, A.)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #185 First MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT D)(BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #179 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT A)(BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #184 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Proof of E-Filing and Service (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief)(BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CORRECTIONS OFFICER BADGE NO. 120, CUMBERLAND COUNTY, CORRECTIONS OFFICER FLOYD, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL FOWLKES, CORRECTIONS OFFICER D. ORTIZ, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL PUGLISE, CORRECTIONS OFFICER SANTOS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER RICHARD SERANO, WARDEN ROBERT BALICKI re #180 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Statement Response and Counterstatement of Facts, #2 Exhibit 1-14)(LONDAR, LILIA)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 RESPONSE to Motion filed by CORRECTIONS OFFICER MELANIE LOATMAN re #185 First MOTION for Summary Judgment (BARKER, A.)
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 BRIEF in Opposition filed by A. GARCIA, RN re #180 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Proof of E-Filing and Service (Attachments: #1 Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts, #2 Reply Statement of Facts by RN Amber Garcia, #3 Certification of Counsel, #4 Exhibit A-D, #5 Exhibit E-F, #6 Exhibit G-N, #7 Exhibit O-Q, #8 Exhibit R-S)(MCCLAIN, JEFFREY)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CORRECTIONS OFFICER MELANIE LOATMAN re #179 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #180 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Statement Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Facts, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of service, #3 Certification Certification of Authenticity of Exhibits, #4 Index Exhibit List, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6)(BARKER, A.)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order AMENDED Set/Reset Deadlines as to #179 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #179 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Melanie Loatman. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #184 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Proof of E-Filing and Service, #180 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #185 First MOTION for Summary Judgment , #179 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (BARKER, A.)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order AMENDED Set/Reset Deadlines as to #180 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #180 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (MCCLAIN, JEFFREY)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #180 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (LONDAR, LILIA)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 First MOTION for Summary Judgment by CORRECTIONS OFFICER BADGE NO. 120, CUMBERLAND COUNTY, CORRECTIONS OFFICER FLOYD, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL FOWLKES, JOHN DOE CORRECTION OFFICERS 1-50, JOHN DOE CORRECTIONS OFFICERS 9-50, CORRECTIONS OFFICER D. ORTIZ, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL PUGLISE, CORRECTIONS OFFICER SANTOS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER RICHARD SERANO, WARDEN ROBERT BALICKI. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit 1-20, #4 Exhibit 21-41)(RYBECK, DANIEL)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #185 First MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #184 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Proof of E-Filing and Service. Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Proof of E-Filing and Service by A. GARCIA, RN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Statement, #3 Brief, #4 Certification, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit N, #19 Exhibit O, #20 Exhibit P, #21 Exhibit Q)(MCCLAIN, JEFFREY)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Certification of of Service (Lisa Jones) on behalf of CHRISTINE ALLEN, THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN Re #180 Motion for Summary Judgment, QC - Electronic signature does not match e-filer,. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MOTION to Seal Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3 by CORRECTIONS OFFICER MELANIE LOATMAN. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Counsel in Support of Motion to Seal)(BARKER, A.)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Letter from Daniel E. Rybeck, Esq. (RYBECK, DANIEL)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MOTION for Summary Judgment by CHRISTINE ALLEN, THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Exhibit 8 [179-14] filed by A. Barker on 9/26/2019 appears to be designated as sealed/confidential materials. The Clerk's Office has restricted access to this document, pending further clarification. (tf, )
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #179 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #182 MOTION to Seal Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3. Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE submitted by Conrad Benedetto on 9/27/2019 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ONLY WITH A SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (tf, )
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #180 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Exhibit A [180-1] filed by Conrad Benedetto on 9/27/2019 appears to be designated as sealed/confidential materials. The Clerk's Office has restricted access to this document, pending further clarification. (tf, )
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MOTION for Summary Judgment by CORRECTIONS OFFICER MELANIE LOATMAN. Responses due by 10/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support of MSJ, #2 Statement Statement of Facts in Support of MSJ, #3 Certification Certification of Authenticity of Exhibits, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #5 Index Transmittal Letter, #6 Index Exhibit List, #7 Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 9, #16 Exhibit 10, #17 Exhibit 11, #18 Exhibit 12, #19 Exhibit 13, #20 Exhibit 14, #21 Exhibit 15, #22 Exhibit 16, #23 Exhibit 17, #24 Exhibit 18, #25 Exhibit 19, #26 Exhibit 20, #27 Exhibit 21, #28 Exhibit 22, #29 Exhibit 23, #30 Exhibit 24, #31 Exhibit 25, #32 Exhibit 26, #33 Exhibit 27, #34 Exhibit 28, #35 Exhibit 29)(BARKER, A.)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 TEXT ORDER: The joint request on 8/8/2019 by counsel to extend the time within which to file dispositive motions shall be, and is hereby, GRANTED. Dispositive motions shall be filed by no later than 9/27/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/28/2019. (slc)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Motion Hearing held on 8/8/2019 re #155 MOTION for Protective Order filed by A. GARCIA, RN. Ordered motion denied. Order to be entered. Hearing on joint application to extend deadline for filing dispositive motion. Order application granted. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tf, )
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER Denying Defendants' motions for protective order, [D.I. 155] in Civil No. 15-6273, [D.I. 83] in Civil No. 17-7183,[D.I. 113] in Civil No. 16-6578, and [D.I. 150] in Civil No. 16-4216, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/8/2019. (rss, )
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert B. Kugler for all further proceedings. Judge Jerome B. Simandle no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 8/8/19. (dd, )
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting #157 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/31/2019. (rtm, )
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 TEXT ORDER SETTING HEARING: Oral Argument on Motion [D.I. 155] for Protective Order set for 8/8/2019 at 1:30 PM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/31/2019. (slc)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 6/21/2019. (sb)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motions due by 8/23/2019. Depositions of proposed expert witnesses shall be concluded by July 19, 2019, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 6/10/2019. (rtm, )
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Letter from Lilia Londar, Esq.. (LONDAR, LILIA)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motions due by 6/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/16/2019. (tf, )
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/15/2019. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tf, )
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Defendant Corrections Officer Melanie Loatman's ANSWER to Amended Complaint , Fourth CROSSCLAIM for Contribution and Indemnification; Cross-Claim for Settlement Credit against CHRISTINE ALLEN, THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN by CORRECTIONS OFFICER MELANIE LOATMAN. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal letter)(BARKER, A.)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 1/15/2019 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/10/2019. (slc)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Letter from Conrad J. Benedetto. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ANSWER to Amended Complaint FOURTH, CROSSCLAIM against A. GARCIA, RN, JOHN DOE CORRECTIONS OFFICERS 9-50, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MELANIE LOATMAN by CORRECTIONS OFFICER SANTOS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL PUGLISE, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL FOWLKES, CORRECTIONS OFFICER RICHARD SERANO, CORRECTIONS OFFICER FLOYD, CUMBERLAND COUNTY, CORRECTIONS OFFICER D. ORTIZ, CORRECTIONS OFFICER BADGE NO. 120, WARDEN ROBERT BALICKI.(LONDAR, LILIA)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by A. GARCIA, RN re #155 MOTION for Protective Order with Proof of E-Filing and Service (MCCLAIN, JEFFREY)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CHRISTINE ALLEN, THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN re #155 MOTION for Protective Order (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
December 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Separate Defenses, Jury Demand, Designation of Trial Counsel, Answer to Crossclaims, Demand for Allocation of Fault and Proof of E-Filing and Service by A. GARCIA, RN.(HOLTZMAN, STEPHEN)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 AMENDED COMPLAINT Fouth against CORRECTIONS OFFICER BADGE NO. 120, CUMBERLAND COUNTY, CORRECTIONS OFFICER FLOYD, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL FOWLKES, A. GARCIA, RN, JOHN DOE CORRECTION OFFICERS 1-50, JOHN DOE CORRECTIONS OFFICERS 9-50, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MELANIE LOATMAN, CORRECTIONS OFFICER D. ORTIZ, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL PUGLISE, CORRECTIONS OFFICER SANTOS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER RICHARD SERANO, WARDEN ROBERT BALICKI, filed by THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN, CHRISTINE ALLEN.(BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 TEXT ORDER: The parties shall submit a proposed order, by no later than 1/11/2019, setting forth proposed deadlines for the completion of expert discovery and for the filing of dispositive motions. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 12/20/2018. (slc)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Plaintiff's #129 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, etc. Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 12/19/2018. (dmr
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 12/19/2018. (dmr)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MOTION to Seal Document #156 Exhibit (to Document),, by A. GARCIA, RN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of Counsel, #3 Statement that No Brief is Necessary)(MCCLAIN, JEFFREY)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Exhibit to #155 Motion for Protective Order (Exhibit B) by A. GARCIA, RN. (MCCLAIN, JEFFREY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MOTION for Protective Order by A. GARCIA, RN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of Counsel, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Brief)(MCCLAIN, JEFFREY)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #157 MOTION to Seal Document #156 Exhibit (to Document),, , #155 MOTION for Protective Order . Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 TEXT ORDER: As set forth on the record on 11/28/2018, the deadlines for expert discovery and dispositive motions shall be set following a decision on the motion to amend [D.I. 129]. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 11/29/2018. (slc)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 11/28/2018. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tf, )
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Letter from Conrad J. Benedetto; re: Withdrawal of Danielle Marie Key. (tf, )
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/25/2018. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tf, )
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Letter from Georgios Farmakis, Esq.. (FARMAKIS, GEORGIOS)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 10/25/2018 at 3:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/11/2018. (slc)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER dismissing without prejudice #144 Motion for Summary Judgment; after Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a fourth amended complaint is determined, dispositive motions in relation to the then-pending pleading shall be due by no later than thirty (30) days after the order upon Plaintiff's motion to amend has been entered. Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 10/11/2018. (tf, )
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Letter from Lilia Londar, Esq.. (LONDAR, LILIA)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 Letter from Barker, Gelfand, James & Sarvas. (BARKER, A.)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Letter from COnrad J. Benedetto, Esquire. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 First MOTION for Summary Judgment by CORRECTIONS OFFICER MELANIE LOATMAN. Responses due by 11/5/2018 (Attachments: #1 Index Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Statement Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #4 Certification Certification of Authenticity of Exhibits, #5 Exhibit Transmittal letter, #6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #7 Exhibit Exhibit List, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #29 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #30 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #31 Exhibit Exhibit 24)(BARKER, A.)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Motion #144 filed by A. Barker on 9/28/2018 has an exhibit #13 & #15 attached that appear(s) to be designated as sealed/confidential materials. The Clerk's Office has restricted access to this document pending a ruling by the Court. In the future, proposed sealed/confidential materials should be filed separately and not as an attachment to a motion. (tf, )
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #144 First MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion set for 11/5/2018 before Judge Jerome B. Simandle. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting Defendants Cumberland County and Warden Balicki's request that Dr. Ducate be permitted to submit her reports on or before 9/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/2/2018. (tf, )
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Letter from Lilia Londar, Esq.. (LONDAR, LILIA)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 TEXT ORDER: As set forth on the record on 5/2/2018, Plaintiffs may obtain, by way of Subpoena, the Cumberland County Prosecutor's Office (CCPO) records, subject to any objection by the CCPO. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 5/3/2018. (slc)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference and Oral Argument held on 5/2/2018. Hearing on application by plaintiff to obtain Cumberland County Prosecutor's records by way of subpoena. Ordered application granted. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tf, )
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Letter from Conrad J. Benedetto, Esq - conference call info. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by CHRISTINE ALLEN, THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN re #129 Fourth MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CORRECTIONS OFFICER BADGE NO. 120, CUMBERLAND COUNTY, CORRECTIONS OFFICER FLOYD, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL FOWLKES, CORRECTIONS OFFICER D. ORTIZ, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL PUGLISE, CORRECTIONS OFFICER SANTOS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER RICHARD SERANO, WARDEN ROBERT BALICKI re #129 Fourth MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel, #2 Certificate of Service)(LONDAR, LILIA)
April 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Letter from Conrad J. Benedetto, Esq.. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 5/2/2018 at 3:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 4/20/2018. (slc)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Letter from Lilia Londar, Esq.. (LONDAR, LILIA)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 BRIEF in Opposition filed by A. GARCIA, RN re #129 Fourth MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint with Proof of E-Filing and Service (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel, #2 Exhibit A)(MCCLAIN, JEFFREY)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order AMENDED Set/Reset Deadlines as to #129 Fourth MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint . Motion set for 5/7/2018 before Judge Jerome B. Simandle. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CORRECTIONS OFFICER MELANIE LOATMAN re #129 Fourth MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certification of Service, #3 Supplement transmittal letter)(BARKER, A.)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Exhibit to #129 Motion to Amend/Correct by All Plaintiffs. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Letter from Jeffrey S. McClain, Esquire re #129 Fourth MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint . (MCCLAIN, JEFFREY)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #129 Fourth MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint . Motion set for 5/7/2018 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Fourth MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by CHRISTINE ALLEN, THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fouth Amended Complaint)(BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/28/2018. Hearing on application by plaintiff for an extension of the expert report deadline in all cases except the Allen matter. Ordered application granted. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tf, )
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial factual discovery shall be extended for the limited purpose of conducting Sgt. Ortiz's deposition on 4/2/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 9/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 3/28/2018. (tf, )
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Letter from Conrad J. Benedetto, Esq.. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend #61 to file the Second Amended Complaint is DENIED; Defendant Loatman's Cross-Motion to Dismiss #66 is GRANTED as to the constitutional claims against Defendant Loatman; Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend #81 to file the proposed Third Amended Complaint adding claims against CFG Health Systems, Inc., is DENIED; Defendant Garcia's Motion for Sanctions #89 is DENIED; Plaintiff may file a Motion for Leave to Amend within thirty (30) days of the entry of this Order upon the docket. Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 3/13/2018. (tf, )
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 OPINION. Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 3/13/2018. (tf, )
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 3/28/2018 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/7/2018. (tf, )
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Discovery Conference held on 2/6/2018. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tf, )
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 TEXT ORDER: Upon the letter application of Conrad J. Benedetto, Esquire, dated 1/22/2018, and for good cause shown, the in-person discovery conference on 2/22/2018 shall be, and is hereby, RESCHEDULED to 2/6/2018 at 11:15 A.M. in Courtroom 3B. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/26/2018. (slc)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Letter from Conrad J. Benedetto, Esq.. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTICE: The in-person discovery conference on 2/22/2018 shall convene at 2:30 P.M. PLEASE NOTE THE CHANGE IN TIME. (slc)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: In-Person Discovery Conference set for 2/22/2018 02:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Pretrial Discovery due by 3/15/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 7/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/17/2018. (tf, )
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/16/2018. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tf, )
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference on 1/8/2018 shall be, and is hereby, RESCHEDULED to 1/16/2018 at 1:30 PM. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/8/2018. (slc)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 TEXT ORDER: Due to the Court's calendar, the telephone conference on 1/4/2018 shall be, and is hereby, RESCHEDULED to 1/8/2018 at 3:00 P.M. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/3/2018. (slc)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Letter from Conrad J. Benedetto, Esq.. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 TEXT ORDER: The telephone status conference on 1/19/2017 shall be, and is hereby, RESCHEDULED to 1/4/2018 at 11:00 A.M. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 12/12/2017. (slc)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/19/2018 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Pretrial Discovery due by 1/31/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 5/25/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 11/13/2017. (tf, )
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 11/13/2017. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tf, )
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 TEXT ORDER: Due to the Court's calendar, the telephone conference on 11/6/2017 shall be, and is hereby, RESCHEDULED to 11/13/2017 at 3:30 PM. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/31/2017. (slc)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 10/18/2017. (sb)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephonic Discovery Hearing and Status Conference and Oral Argument held on 10/3/2017. Hearing on plaintiff's application to take the deposition of defendant Garcia. Ordered application granted in part and denied in part. Hearing in joint application to extend the discovery deadlines. Ordered application granted. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tf, )
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 11/6/2017 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Pretrial Discovery due by 12/29/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 4/27/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/3/2017. (tf, )
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 TEXT ORDER: By consent of all parties, and for good cause shown, the application to extend the discovery deadlines shall be, and is hereby, GRANTED. An Amended Scheduling Order shall issue. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/3/2017. (slc)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 10/3/2017 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/20/2017. (slc)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Letter from Jeffrey S. McClain, Esquire re #104 Letter. (MCCLAIN, JEFFREY)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Letter from Vanessa E. James, Esquire with an update regarding depositions. (JAMES, VANESSA)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Letter from Conrad J. Benedetto. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Letter from Lilia Londar, Esq.. (LONDAR, LILIA)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Exhibit to #101 Letter by A. GARCIA, RN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C)(MCCLAIN, JEFFREY)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Letter from Jeffrey S. McClain, Esquire regarding Depositions re 100 Order,. (MCCLAIN, JEFFREY)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/14/2017. (sb)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 TEXT ORDER: The parties shall meet and confer and submit letter(s) to the Court by no later than 9/19/2017 setting forth the agreed upon dates for depositions or setting forth any issues with the scheduling of depositions. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/14/2017. (slc)
August 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by A. GARCIA, RN re #89 MOTION for Sanctions filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 5 (unopposed) with Proof of E-Filing and Service (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel (Supplemental))(MCCLAIN, JEFFREY)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CHRISTINE ALLEN, THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN re #89 MOTION for Sanctions filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 5 (unopposed) (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STATUS REPORT by CHRISTINE ALLEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STATUS REPORT of all defendants with proof of E-Filing and Service by All Defendants. (MCCLAIN, JEFFREY)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 TEXT ORDER: Due to the Court's calendar, the telephone conference on 9/11/2017 shall be, and is hereby, RESCHEDULED to 9/14/2017 at 11:30 AM. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/16/2017. (slc)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants' letter of 7/12/2017 [D.I. 85] by no later than 8/21/2017. Additionally, the parties shall submit status letters to the Court by no later than 8/21/2017. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/7/2017. (slc)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status and Discovery Conference held on 8/4/2017. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tf, )
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference on 7/27/2017 shall be, and is hereby, RESCHEDULED to 8/4/2017 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/27/2017. (slc)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order AMENDED Set/Reset Deadlines as to #89 MOTION for Sanctions filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 5 (unopposed). Motion set for 8/21/2017 before Judge Jerome B. Simandle. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order AMENDED Set/Reset Deadlines as to #81 Third MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. Motion set for 7/17/2017 before Judge Jerome B. Simandle. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney KIMMO Z. HUSSAIN ABBASI terminated. (HUSSAIN ABBASI, KIMMO)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 TEXT ORDER: Within ten (10) days of the date of this Text Order, counsel for Plaintiffs shall file an exhibit to the motion to amend [D.I. 81] pursuant to Local Civil Rule 15.1(a)(2) (effective 5/10/2017). The exhibit shall delineate how the proposed amended pleading differs from the pleading which it proposes to amend by either bracketing or striking through materials to be deleted and/or underlining additional materials. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/20/2017. (slc)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE: Plaintiffs shall provide a courtesy copy of the motion to amend [D.I. 81]; and defense counsel shall provide a courtesy copy of the opposition thereto [D.I. 82]. (slc)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION for Sanctions filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 5 (unopposed) by A. GARCIA, RN. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Brief, #8 Text of Proposed Order, #9 Exhibit Service Letter pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 5, #10 Brief Reply/Supplemental, #11 Certificate of Service)(MCCLAIN, JEFFREY)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Setting Deadlines as to #89 MOTION for Sanctions filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 5 (unopposed). Motion set for 8/21/2017 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (js)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 TEXT ORDER: Upon the letter application of counsel for Plaintiffs, and for good cause shown, the telephone conference on 7/18/2017 shall be, and is hereby, RESCHEDULED to 7/27/2017 at 3:30 PM. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/17/2017. (slc)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Letter from Conrad J. Benedetto. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 7/18/2017 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/13/2017. (slc)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Letter from Lilia Londar, Esq.. (LONDAR, LILIA)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 6/27/2017. (tf, )
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 OPINION. Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 6/27/2017. (tf, )
June 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 BRIEF in Opposition filed by A. GARCIA, RN re #81 Third MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint with Proof of E-Filing and Service (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(MCCLAIN, JEFFREY)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Third MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by CHRISTINE ALLEN. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit)(HUSSAIN ABBASI, KIMMO)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #81 Third MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. Motion set for 7/17/2017 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE by CORRECTIONS OFFICER BADGE NO. 120, CUMBERLAND COUNTY, CORRECTIONS OFFICER FLOYD, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL FOWLKES, CORRECTIONS OFFICER D. ORTIZ, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL PUGLISE, CORRECTIONS OFFICER SANTOS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER RICHARD SERANO, WARDEN ROBERT BALICKI of Designation of Trial Attorney (RYBECK, DANIEL)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying without prejudice #78 Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a third amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 6/8/2017. (tf, )
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Third MOTION to Amend/Correct #14 Amended Complaint,, #61 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint by CHRISTINE ALLEN. (HOFFMAN, MELISSA)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #78 Third MOTION to Amend/Correct #14 Amended Complaint,, #61 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint . Motion set for 7/3/2017 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER that all written discovery responses shall be completed by no later than June 30, 2017 in all four cases; the parties shall submit a joint status letter to the Court by no later than July 10, 2017; the deadline to complete fact discovery shall be extended to September 29, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 5/25/2017. (tf, )
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/11/2017 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Pretrial Factual Discovery concluded by 9/29/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 1/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 5/25/2017. (tf, )
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Status Conference held on 5/24/2017. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tf, )
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference on May 24, 2017 at 2:00 P.M. in Civil Nos. 15-6273, 16-3503, 16-6578 and 16-4216 shall remain as scheduled. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 5/10/2017. (slc)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CORRECTIONS OFFICER MELANIE LOATMAN re #66 Cross MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with supporting documents filed on the docket in etnry #65 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Certification of Authenticity of Exhibits, #5 Certification of Service, #6 Supplement Transmittal letter)(BARKER, A.)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CHRISTINE ALLEN, THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN re #66 Cross MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with supporting documents filed on the docket in etnry #65 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(HUSSAIN ABBASI, KIMMO)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 TEXT ORDER: Upon request by Plaintiff, and with consent of all Defendants, the Court hereby extends the return date for Plaintiff's motion to file a second amended complaint [D.E. 61] and Defendant's cross-motion to dismiss the first amended complaint [D.E. 66] from May 1, 2017 to May 15, 2017. Plaintiff's time for filing a response to the cross-motion to dismiss shall be extended to May 1, 2017. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 05/01/2017. (db, )
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 TEXT ORDER : Upon request by Plaintiff, and with consent of all Defendants, the Court hereby extends the return date for Plaintiff's motion to file a second amended complaint [D.E. 61] and Defendant's cross-motion to dismiss the first amended complaint [D.E. 66] from May 1, 2017 to May 15, 2017. Plaintiff's time for filing a response to the cross-motion to dismiss shall be extended to May 1, 2017. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 5/1/17. (mb, )
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Letter from Kimmo Z. H. Abbasi, Esq.. (HUSSAIN ABBASI, KIMMO)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN E. KUSTURISS, JR on behalf of CHRISTINE ALLEN, THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN (KUSTURISS, JOHN)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN E. KUSTRISS, JR on behalf of CHRISTINE ALLEN, THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN (KUSTRISS, JOHN)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #66 Cross MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with supporting documents filed on the docket in etnry #65 . Motion set for 5/15/2017 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order AMENDED Set/Reset Deadlines as to #61 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Motion set for 5/1/2017 before Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order AMENDED Set/Reset Deadlines as to #66 Cross MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with supporting documents filed on the docket in etnry #65 . Motion set for 5/15/2017 before Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Cross MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with supporting documents filed on the docket in etnry #65 by CORRECTIONS OFFICER MELANIE LOATMAN. (BARKER, A.)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CORRECTIONS OFFICER MELANIE LOATMAN re #61 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Certification of Authenticity of Exhibits, #8 Certification in Compliance with FRCP 5.2, #9 Text of Proposed Order, #10 Certification of Service, #11 Supplement Notice of Cross-Motion, #12 Supplement transmittal letter)(BARKER, A.)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion #65 submitted by A. Barker on 4/17/2017 contains a Cross-Motion. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE CROSS-MOTION USING THE CORRECT EVENT MOTION in order to have the Motion placed on the Court`s calendar. Counsel is only to re-file the Motion and may refer to the supporting documents as being filed on the docket in entry #65 . This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (tf, )
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by CONRAD J. BENEDETTO on behalf of CHRISTINE ALLEN, THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 APPENDIX in Support filed by CHRISTINE ALLEN, THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN re #61 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Exhibit - Second Amended Complaint (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 TEXT ORDER: The Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint [D.I. 61] filed by Plaintiffs states that the proposed pleading is attached, but there is no attached pleading. Plaintiffs shall file the proposed pleading to supplement Plaintiffs' motion pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.1(f) by no later than April 7, 2017, or the motion shall be dismissed without prejudice. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 4/6/2017. (slc)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #61 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Motion set for 5/1/2017 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by CHRISTINE ALLEN, THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(HUSSAIN ABBASI, KIMMO)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/21/2017. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tf, )
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 5/24/2017 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 3/21/2017. (slc)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 TEXT ORDER: Due to the Court's calendar, the 3/20/2017 telephone conference shall be, and is hereby, RESCHEDULED to 3/21/2017 at 11:00 AM. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/22/2017. (slc)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER FOR CONSOLIDATION FOR DISCOVERY PURPOSES ONLY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 12/9/2016. (tf, )
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 3/20/2017 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. The time within which to file a motion to amend the pleadings or a motion to join new parties in the matter of Estate of Jon Leon Watson v. Cumberland County, et al. will expire on 2/28/2017. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 6/30/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 10/27/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 12/9/2016. (tf, )
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/8/2016. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tf, )
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference RESET for 12/8/2016 at 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel may utilize the same dial-in information previously provided. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 11/30/2016. (slc)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 11/30/2016 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio, at which time the Court will address consolidation for discovery purposes only with Civil Action Nos. 15-3503, 16-4216 and 16-6578. The Court will provide a dial-in number for the conference call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 11/23/2016. (slc)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order NOTICE: Telephone conference on 1/6/2017 shall be, and is hereby, adjourned. (slc)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Letter from Lilia Londar, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Consent Order of Consolidation)(LONDAR, LILIA)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against A. GARCIA, RN, JOHN DOE CORRECTIONS OFFICERS 9-50, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MELANIE LOATMAN by CORRECTIONS OFFICER SANTOS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL PUGLISE, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL FOWLKES, CORRECTIONS OFFICER RICHARD SERANO, CORRECTIONS OFFICER FLOYD, CUMBERLAND COUNTY, CORRECTIONS OFFICER D. ORTIZ, CORRECTIONS OFFICER BADGE NO. 120, WARDEN ROBERT BALICKI. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service of Amended Answer to First Amended Complaint)(LONDAR, LILIA)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Answer; Defendants shall file the proposed Amended Answer within 10 days of the date of entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/25/2016. (tf, )
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer by CORRECTIONS OFFICER BADGE NO. 120, CUMBERLAND COUNTY, CORRECTIONS OFFICER FLOYD, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL FOWLKES, CORRECTIONS OFFICER D. ORTIZ, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL PUGLISE, CORRECTIONS OFFICER SANTOS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER RICHARD SERANO, WARDEN ROBERT BALICKI. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Proposed Amended Answer, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(LONDAR, LILIA)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #49 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer. Motion set for 11/7/2016 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by A. GARCIA, RN re #42 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment with Certification of E-Filing and Service in reply to Plaintiff's Opposition currently docketed at Docket Number 47 (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts (Reply))(MCCLAIN, JEFFREY)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - K. Hussain Abbasi has restricted access to the Reply Brief #47 filed on 9/23/2016 without an order or clarification as to why access was restricted. Please submit a certification stating that this document is to be marked Confidential Material or that this document's access was restricted in error. Please be advised, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3, you must file a motion for leave to have a document sealed. The Brief in Opposition was submitted incorrectly as a Reply Brief. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Brief in Opposition USING *Brief in Opposition*. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (tf, )
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CHRISTINE ALLEN re #42 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment with Certification of E-Filing and Service September 23, 2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Material Facts, #2 Appendix Cases)(HUSSAIN ABBASI, KIMMO)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/23/2016. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tf, )
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 1/6/2017 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/23/2016. (slc)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by KIMMO Z. HUSSAIN ABBASI on behalf of CHRISTINE ALLEN (HUSSAIN ABBASI, KIMMO)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against A. GARCIA, RN, JOHN DOE CORRECTIONS OFFICERS 9-50, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MELANIE LOATMAN by CORRECTIONS OFFICER SANTOS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL FOWLKES, CORRECTIONS OFFICER RICHARD SERANO, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL PUGLISE, CORRECTIONS OFFICER FLOYD, CUMBERLAND COUNTY, CORRECTIONS OFFICER D. ORTIZ, WARDEN ROBERT BALICKI, CORRECTIONS OFFICER BADGE NO. 120.(LONDAR, LILIA)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment with Certification of E-Filing and Service by A. GARCIA, RN. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Statement of Material Facts, #5 Brief, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(MCCLAIN, JEFFREY)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #42 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment with Certification of E-Filing and Service. Motion set for 10/3/2016 before Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/16/2016. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tf, )
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/23/2016 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. The time within which to file a motion to amend the pleadings or a motion to join new parties will expire on 9/30/2016. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 12/30/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 4/28/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/16/2016. (tf, )
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 8/16/2016 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/28/2016. (slc)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 7/28/2016. (sb)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/6/2016. (tf, )
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Letter from Lilia Londar, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Discovery Confidentiality Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Discovery Confidentiality Order)(LONDAR, LILIA)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 7/28/2016 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Pretrial Factual Discovery extended to 9/1/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 12/23/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 6/7/2016. (tf, )
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/7/2016. (sb)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIELLE MARIE KEY on behalf of All Plaintiffs (KEY, DANIELLE)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference RESET to 6/7/2016 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 5/24/2016. (slc)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney SURINDER K. AGGARWAL terminated. (AGGARWAL, SURINDER)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting Plaintiff's request regarding filing of a discovery motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 5/16/2016. (tf, )
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Letter from Surinder K. Aggarwal to Hon. Joel Schneider, U.S.M.J. re #24 Letter. (AGGARWAL, SURINDER)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 LETTER ORDER granting Defendant Garcia's #28 Letter request that the #27 Amended Answer be filed nunc pro tunc to 4/1/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 4/29/2016. (TH, )
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney LILIA LONDAR and DANIEL EDWARD RYBECK terminated.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Transmittal letter)(BARKER, A.)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Letter from Jeffrey S. McClain, Equire on behalf of Defendant Amber Garcia, RN re #27 Amended Answer to Complaint,. (MCCLAIN, JEFFREY)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint,, with Separate Defenses, Demand for Allocation of Fault, Demand for Jury Trial, Answer to Any and All Crossclaims, Designation of Trial Counsel and Certification of E-Filing and Service by A. GARCIA, RN. (HOLTZMAN, STEPHEN)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JOHN C. EASTLACK, JR terminated. Attorney STEPHEN D. HOLTZMAN for A. GARCIA, RN added.. (HOLTZMAN, STEPHEN)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN C. EASTLACK, JR on behalf of CORRECTIONS OFFICER BADGE NO. 120, CUMBERLAND COUNTY, CORRECTIONS OFFICER FLOYD, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL FOWLKES, A. GARCIA, RN, CORRECTIONS OFFICER D. ORTIZ, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL PUGLISE, CORRECTIONS OFFICER SANTOS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER RICHARD SERANO, WARDEN ROBERT BALICKI (EASTLACK, JOHN)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Letter from Judge Schneider To Mr. Aggarwal re #20 Letter. (dd, )
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by CORRECTIONS OFFICER MELANIE LOATMAN. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Transmittal letter)(BARKER, A.)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by A. MICHAEL BARKER on behalf of CORRECTIONS OFFICER MELANIE LOATMAN (BARKER, A.)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by VANESSA ELAINE JAMES on behalf of CORRECTIONS OFFICER MELANIE LOATMAN (JAMES, VANESSA)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Letter from Surinder K. Aggarwal to Hon. Ann Marie Donio, U.S.M.J. (AGGARWAL, SURINDER)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by LILIA LONDAR on behalf of CORRECTIONS OFFICER BADGE NO. 120, CUMBERLAND COUNTY, CORRECTIONS OFFICER FLOYD, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL FOWLKES, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MELANIE LOATMAN, CORRECTIONS OFFICER D. ORTIZ, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL PUGLISE, CORRECTIONS OFFICER SANTOS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER RICHARD SERANO, WARDEN ROBERT BALICKI (LONDAR, LILIA)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONSENT ORDER that Defendant Amber Garcia RN is granted leave to file an Amended Answer to Plaintiff's first Amended Complaint within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 4/1/2016. (tf, )
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION of All Parties Consenting to the Filing of an Amended Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by A. GARCIA, RN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Answer of RN Garcia)(HOLTZMAN, STEPHEN)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/2/2016. (sb)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 5/23/2016 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 3/2/2016. (slc)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by CORRECTIONS OFFICER BADGE NO. 120, CUMBERLAND COUNTY, CORRECTIONS OFFICER FLOYD, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL FOWLKES, A. GARCIA, RN, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MELANIE LOATMAN, CORRECTIONS OFFICER D. ORTIZ, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL PUGLISE, CORRECTIONS OFFICER SANTOS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER RICHARD SERANO, WARDEN ROBERT BALICKI.(RYBECK, DANIEL)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CUMBERLAND COUNTY, WARDEN ROBERT BALICKI, A. GARCIA, RN, CORRECTIONS OFFICER RICHARD SERANO, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL PUGLISE, CORRECTIONS OFFICER D. ORTIZ, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MELANIE LOATMAN, CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL FOWLKES, CORRECTIONS OFFICER FLOYD, CORRECTIONS OFFICER SANTOS, CORRECTIONS OFFICER BADGE NO. 120, JOHN DOE CORRECTIONS OFFICERS 9-50, filed by THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN, CHRISTINE ALLEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(AGGARWAL, SURINDER)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Pltfs' #12 Motion for leave to file an amended complaint; directing Pltf to file the amended complaint by 2/16/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/3/2016. (drw)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint . Motion set for 2/16/2016 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (drw)
January 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by CHRISTINE ALLEN, THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel, #2 Proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certification of Service)(AGGARWAL, SURINDER)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by SURINDER K. AGGARWAL on behalf of CHRISTINE ALLEN, THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN (AGGARWAL, SURINDER)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 3/2/2016 @ 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Amended Pleadings due by 1/19/2016. Pretrial Factual Discovery extended to 6/3/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 11/3/2015. (drw)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 11/3/2015. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (drw)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CUMBERLAND COUNTY, WARDEN ROBERT BALICKI of Defendants' Initial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP 26 (RYBECK, DANIEL)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Joint Discovery Plan by THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN.(BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order setting Initial Conference for @ 11/3/2015 10:30 AM in Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/1/2015. (drw)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by CUMBERLAND COUNTY, WARDEN ROBERT BALICKI.(RYBECK, DANIEL)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MONITION Returned Executed by THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN. WARDEN ROBERT BALICKI served on 9/10/2015, answer due 9/30/2015., SUMMONS Returned Executed by THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN. WARDEN ROBERT BALICKI served on 9/10/2015, answer due 9/30/2015. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN. CUMBERLAND COUNTY served on 9/10/2015, answer due 10/1/2015. (BENEDETTO, CONRAD)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CUMBERLAND COUNTY, WARDEN ROBERT BALICKI Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *JAIME KASSELMAN* (jbk, )
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CUMBERLAND COUNTY, WARDEN ROBERT BALICKI ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-6590035) with JURY DEMAND, filed by THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN, CHRISTINE ALLEN.(jbk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN et al v. CUMBERLAND COUNTY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: WILLIAM M. TAMBUSSI
Represented By: WILLIAM M. TAMBUSSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE ESTATE OF ALISSA MARIE ALLEN
Represented By: DANIELLE MARIE KEY
Represented By: CONRAD J. BENEDETTO
Represented By: JOHN E. KUSTURISS, JR.
Represented By: KIMMO Z. HUSSAIN ABBASI
Represented By: SURINDER K. AGGARWAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE ALLEN
Represented By: KIMMO Z. HUSSAIN ABBASI
Represented By: DANIELLE MARIE KEY
Represented By: MELISSA YVETTE HOFFMAN
Represented By: JOHN E. KUSTURISS, JR.
Represented By: SURINDER K. AGGARWAL
Represented By: CONRAD J. BENEDETTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUMBERLAND COUNTY
Represented By: DANIEL EDWARD RYBECK
Represented By: JOHN C. EASTLACK, JR.
Represented By: LILIA LONDAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN ROBERT BALICKI
Represented By: LILIA LONDAR
Represented By: DANIEL EDWARD RYBECK
Represented By: JOHN C. EASTLACK, JR.
Represented By: A. MICHAEL BARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORRECTION OFFICERS 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. GARCIA, RN
Represented By: STEPHEN D. HOLTZMAN
Represented By: JEFFREY S. MCCLAIN
Represented By: DANIEL EDWARD RYBECK
Represented By: JOHN C. EASTLACK, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONS OFFICER RICHARD SERANO
Represented By: DANIEL EDWARD RYBECK
Represented By: A. MICHAEL BARKER
Represented By: LILIA LONDAR
Represented By: JOHN C. EASTLACK, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL PUGLISE
Represented By: JOHN C. EASTLACK, JR.
Represented By: A. MICHAEL BARKER
Represented By: DANIEL EDWARD RYBECK
Represented By: LILIA LONDAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONS OFFICER D. ORTIZ
Represented By: A. MICHAEL BARKER
Represented By: LILIA LONDAR
Represented By: DANIEL EDWARD RYBECK
Represented By: JOHN C. EASTLACK, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONS OFFICER MELANIE LOATMAN
Represented By: A. MICHAEL BARKER
Represented By: DANIEL EDWARD RYBECK
Represented By: LILIA LONDAR
Represented By: VANESSA ELAINE JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONS OFFICER MICHAEL FOWLKES
Represented By: A. MICHAEL BARKER
Represented By: JOHN C. EASTLACK, JR.
Represented By: DANIEL EDWARD RYBECK
Represented By: LILIA LONDAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECTIONS OFFICER SANTOS
Represented By: JOHN C. EASTLACK, JR.
Represented By: DANIEL EDWARD RYBECK
Represented By: LILIA LONDAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORRECTIONS OFFICERS 9-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: CORRECTIONS OFFICER FLOYD
Represented By: JOHN C. EASTLACK, JR.
Represented By: LILIA LONDAR
Represented By: DANIEL EDWARD RYBECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: CORRECTIONS OFFICER BADGE NO. 120
Represented By: LILIA LONDAR
Represented By: DANIEL EDWARD RYBECK
Represented By: JOHN C. EASTLACK, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?