EAGLE VIEW TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al v. XACTWARE SOLUTIONS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: EAGLE VIEW TECHNOLOGIES, INC. and PICTOMETRY INTERNATIONAL CORP.
Defendant: XACTWARE SOLUTIONS, INC. and VERISK ANALYTICS, INC.
Counter_claimant: VERISK ANALYTICS, INC. and XACTWARE SOLUTIONS, INC.
Counter_defendant: EAGLE VIEW TECHNOLOGIES, INC. and PICTOMETRY INTERNATIONAL CORP.
Case Number: 1:2015cv07025
Filed: September 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Hudson
Presiding Judge: Robert B. Kugler
Presiding Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 909 OPINION. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 2/16/2021. (dmr)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 901 OPINION. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 9/9/2020. (dmr)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 841 OPINION. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 10/18/2019. (dmr)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 762 ORDER Granting 566 Motion to Seal 561 Transcript; ORDERED that to the extent not already done, defendants shall file a redacted copy of Doc. No. 561 in accordance with this Order by 9/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/12/2019. (dmr)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 557 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 1/29/2019. (dmr)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 547 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/20/2018. (dmr)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 543 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/4/2018. (dmr)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 432 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Defendants' 374 Motion to Amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 5/31/2018. (dmr)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 429 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 5/29/2018. (dmr)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 408 OPINION FILED. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/28/18. (js)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 332 MARKMAN ORDER $ MARKMAN OPINION FILED. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/5/17. (js)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 329 OPINION FILED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 11/29/17. (js)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Denying 107 Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 12/7/16. (js)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 OPINION FILED. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/2/16. (js)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EAGLE VIEW TECHNOLOGIES, INC. et al v. XACTWARE SOLUTIONS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EAGLE VIEW TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: ELEONORE OFOSU-ANTWI
Represented By: HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PICTOMETRY INTERNATIONAL CORP.
Represented By: ELEONORE OFOSU-ANTWI
Represented By: HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XACTWARE SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: MARK H. ANANIA
Represented By: SCOTT S. CHRISTIE
Represented By: RAVIN R. PATEL
Represented By: MATTHEW ADAM SKLAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VERISK ANALYTICS, INC.
Represented By: MARK H. ANANIA
Represented By: SCOTT S. CHRISTIE
Represented By: RAVIN R. PATEL
Represented By: MATTHEW ADAM SKLAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: VERISK ANALYTICS, INC.
Represented By: SCOTT S. CHRISTIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: XACTWARE SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: SCOTT S. CHRISTIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: EAGLE VIEW TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: ELEONORE OFOSU-ANTWI
Represented By: HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: PICTOMETRY INTERNATIONAL CORP.
Represented By: ELEONORE OFOSU-ANTWI
Represented By: HECTOR DANIEL RUIZ
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?