SILIPENA et al v. AMERICAN PULVERIZER COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: EDWARD SILIPENA, JOSEPH F SILIPENA, AMERICAN IRON & METAL INTERNATIONAL, LLC., AMERICAN AUTO SALVAGE AND RECYCLING, INC., SILIPENA REALTY,LLC and LJE ASSOCIATES, LLC
Defendant: AMERICAN PULVERIZER COMPANY, COOPER & ASSOCIATES LLC, ERIEZ MANUFACTURING COMPANY, HUSTLER CONVEYER COMPANY and PINNACLE ENGINEERING, INC
Case Number: 1:2016cv00711
Filed: February 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Atlantic
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Presiding Judge: Joseph H. Rodriguez
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 322 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 151 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 3/31/2021. (db, )
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER denying without prejudice 181 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 10/30/2020. (tf, )
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 80 Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 3/7/2019. (tf, )
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 OPINION. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 3/27/2017. (tf, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SILIPENA et al v. AMERICAN PULVERIZER COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD SILIPENA
Represented By: JOHN E. GREGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH F SILIPENA
Represented By: JOHN E. GREGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN IRON & METAL INTERNATIONAL, LLC.
Represented By: JOHN E. GREGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN AUTO SALVAGE AND RECYCLING, INC.
Represented By: JOHN E. GREGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SILIPENA REALTY,LLC
Represented By: JOHN E. GREGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LJE ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: JOHN E. GREGORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN PULVERIZER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPER & ASSOCIATES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIEZ MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUSTLER CONVEYER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PINNACLE ENGINEERING, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?