POTEAT v. ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY et al
Petitioner: JOHN WESLEY POTEAT
Respondent: ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY and STATE OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 1:2016cv02351
Filed: April 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Mercer
Presiding Judge: Robert B. Kugler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that petitioner's applications to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal (Dkt. Nos. 19 & 20) are denied as unnecessary as the Third Circuit has now denied a certificate of appealability on petitioner's appeal. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 5/4/2017. (tf, n.m.)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Vacating the Court's 16 Order. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/10/2017. (TH, )
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM, ORDER Petitioner's IFP application, on appeal, is Denied without prejudice. nm 3/7. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/6/17. (jbk, )
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 1/31/2017. (tf, n.m.)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Clerk shall reopen this case; Respondents may file a Motion to Dismiss the Petition on timeliness grounds only within forty-five (45) days of the date this Order; if Respondents do not file a Motion to Dismiss the Petition, they shall file a full and complete answer to all claims asserted in the Petition within forty-five (45) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 5/10/2016. (tf,n.m.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POTEAT v. ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOHN WESLEY POTEAT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STATE OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?