LOPEZ-NEGRON v. ORTIZ
Petitioner: FRANCISCO E. LOPEZ-NEGRON
Respondent: DAVID ORTIZ
Case Number: 1:2016cv09075
Filed: December 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Burlington
Presiding Judge: Robert B. Kugler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 9/27/2019. (dmr)(n.m.)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO ANSWER. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 2/14/17. (js)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, petitioner's application to proceed in forma pauperis is Denied; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall re-administratively terminate this case for petitioner's failure to pay the requisite filing fee of $5.00, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 1/18/17. (js)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM, ORDER Petitioner's IFP is DENIED without prejudice. Directing Clerk to administratively terminate this case. IFP and Order mailed 12/21. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 12/21/16. (jbk, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOPEZ-NEGRON v. ORTIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FRANCISCO E. LOPEZ-NEGRON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DAVID ORTIZ
Represented By: CAROLINE A. SADLOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?