BROWN v. COHEN et al
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS BROWN
Defendant: COHEN, TAYLOR and CAMDEN COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY
Case Number: 1:2017cv03436
Filed: May 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Camden
Presiding Judge: Noel L. Hillman
Presiding Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 9/9/2021. (rtm, )(nm)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Directing the Clerk to resend Plaintiff a transmittal letter explaining the procedure for completing the USM-285 forms. ORDERED that once the Marshal receives the USM-285 Forms from Plaintiff and the Marshal so alerts the Clerk, the Clerk shall issue summons in connection with each USM-285 Form that has been submitted by Plaintiff, etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 7/16/2020. (rtm, )(nm)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 10/17/2019. (rtm, )(nm)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 5/22/17. (jbk, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWN v. COHEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMDEN COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?