CONOVER et al v. PATRIOT LAND TRANSFER, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JACQUELINE VAN VELSON, JACQUELINE SHERIDAN, ANNA CONOVER, PARRISH SHERIDAN and BRYAN VAN VELSON
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., PATRIOT LAND PROCESSING, LLC and PATRIOT LAND TRANSFER, LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv04625
Filed: June 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Gloucester
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Filing 86 Letter from Bruce D. Greenberg to the Honorable Joel Schneider, U.S.M.J. (GREENBERG, BRUCE)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: The in-person conference scheduled for July 29, 2019 is hereby cancelled. All other present scheduling deadlines shall remain in place. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 5/22/2019. (tf, )
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: In-Person Conference set for 8/15/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 5/17/2019. (dmr)
May 16, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Discovery Conference held on 5/16/2019. (se, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 83 Letter from Benjamin Spang to Hon. Joel Schneider, U.S.M.J.. (SPANG, BENJAMIN)
May 14, 2019 Filing 82 Letter from Bruce D. Greenberg to the Honorable Joel Schneider, U.S.M.J. (GREENBERG, BRUCE)
May 14, 2019 Filing 81 Letter from Jennifer J. Nagle, counsel for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., to the Honorable Joel Schneider, U.S.M.J. regarding Status of ESI Discovery Conferral. (NAGLE, JENNIFER)
May 10, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by MALORY MARIE PASCARELLA on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (PASCARELLA, MALORY)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 TEXT ORDER -- The Court having received plaintiffs' May 7, 2019 letter application requesting to reschedule the May 16, 2019 in-person conference; and plaintiffs representing that a scheduling conflict arose on May 6; and the Court noting the May 16 conference before this Court was scheduled on April 23, 2019; and the Court further noting the conference on May 16 was scheduled because the parties were not prepared to address all ESI disputes on April 22, 2019; and the Court finding that good cause does not exist to grant plaintiffs' request; and accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED the in-person conference on May 16, 2019 will proceed as scheduled. All deadlines in the Court's April 23, 2019 Order [Doc. No. 78] shall remain in place. All ESI disputes not timely raised shall be deemed waived. It is further ORDERED counsel is reminded of the requirement in L.Civ.R. 101.1(c)(4) that only an attorney at law of this Court may file papers. Thus, all submissions to this Court shall be signed by New Jersey counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 5/8/19. (Schneider, Joel)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: In-Person Conference set for 5/16/2019 at 2:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 4/23/2019. (dmr)
April 22, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Discovery Conference held on 4/22/2019. (se, )
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 TEXT ORDER -- It is hereby ORDERED the start time for the conference on April 22, 2019 is changed to 3:00 p.m. from the original scheduled time of 4:00 p.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 4/12/19. (Schneider, Joel)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: To the extent the parties do not resolve their ESI discovery disputes, an In-Person Conference will be held on 4/22/2019 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 4/8/2019. (dmr)
April 4, 2019 Filing 75 Letter from Jennifer J. Nagle, counsel for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., to the Honorable Joel Schneider, U.S.M.J.. (NAGLE, JENNIFER)
April 3, 2019 Filing 74 Letter from Benjamin W. Spang, Counsel for Defendant, Patriot Land Transer LLC regarding Discovery Dispute. (SPANG, BENJAMIN)
April 3, 2019 Filing 73 Letter from Jennifer J. Nagle, counsel for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., to the Honorable Joel Schneider, U.S.M.J. regarding Local Rule 37.1 Discovery Dispute. (NAGLE, JENNIFER)
April 2, 2019 Filing 72 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/20/2019, before Judge JOEL SCHNEIDER. Court Reporter/Transcriber DIANA DOMAN TRANSCRIBING, LLC ((856) 435-7172). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 4/23/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2019. (tf, )
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 SCHEDULING ORDER: In-Person Status Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 9/16/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/16/2019, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 3/22/2019. (dmr)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCHNEIDER'S STANDING ORDER IN ALL CIVIL CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 3/22/2019. (dmr)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 3/21/2019. (dmr)
March 20, 2019 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Initial Conference held on 3/20/2019. Initial Scheduling Conference held on the record. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder Electronic Court Reporter.) (dmr)
March 15, 2019 Filing 67 Joint Discovery Plan by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NAGLE, JENNIFER)
February 27, 2019 Filing 66 Letter from All Parties to the Honorable Renee M. Bumb, U.S.D.J. and Honorable Joel Schneider, U.S.M.J. (GREENBERG, BRUCE)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 TEXT ORDER -- The Court having received defense counsel's February 19, 2019 Order, it is hereby ORDERED the March 20, 2019 conference before this Court will proceed as scheduled. The parties are advised discovery will proceed in accordance with Judge Bumb's Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 2/19/19. (Schneider, Joel)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Order Initial Conference set for 3/20/2019 at 11:00 AM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 2/15/2019. (dmr)
February 14, 2019 Filing 63 ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NAGLE, JENNIFER)
February 14, 2019 Filing 62 Joint Discovery Plan by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NAGLE, JENNIFER)
February 14, 2019 Filing 61 ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Affimative Defenses by PATRIOT LAND TRANSFER, LLC.(DESIDERATO, JERRY)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 TEXT ORDER: The Court having received the parties' recent letters, it is hereby ORDERED this Court's February 1, 2019 Order [Doc. No. 59] is VACATED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 2/5/2019. (se, )
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 TEXT ORDER -- The Court having received the the January 31, 2019 Order and Opinion regarding Wells Fargo's Motion to Dismiss [Doc. Nos. 57, 58]; and good cause existing to enter this Order, it is hereby ORDERED as follows: (1) a Fed.R.Civ.P. 16 Scheduling Conference will be held on March 20, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3C; (2) the first phase of the case will focus on class certification. However, the Court will not bifurcate discovery since liability issues are relevant to the class certification motion to be decided; (3) consistent with Rule 26(d)(2)(A), the parties shall serve their adversary with document requests by February 15, 2019. (All references to documents shall also include ESI.) Only objections shall be served by March 1, 2019. Thereafter the parties shall meet and confer to resolve their objections. By March 12, 2019 the parties shall serve discovery dispute letter briefs with the Court. Responses shall be served by March 18, 2019 with copies to the Court; (4) the Court will address with the parties at the March 20, 2019 conference all discovery disputes with the goal of resolving all objections. Thereafter the parties will be given a firm date to produce all responsive documents. The Court expects the parties to meet and confer regarding all relevant ESI issues and to present all disputes in accordance with this Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 2/1/19. (Schneider, Joel)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Denying #49 Motion to Dismiss, etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 1/31/2019. (dmr)
January 31, 2019 Filing 57 OPINION. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 1/31/2019. (dmr)
July 16, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE by PATRIOT LAND TRANSFER, LLC re #55 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion NOTICE OF JOINDER IN SUPPORT OF THE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DESIDERATO, JERRY)
July 16, 2018 Filing 55 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. re #49 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint [#46] (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NAGLE, JENNIFER)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting Defendants' #52 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #49 MOTION to Dismiss Replies due by 7/16/2018.. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 7/3/2018. (dmr)
July 2, 2018 Filing 53 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #49 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint [#46] (GREENBERG, BRUCE)
July 2, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Motions to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(NAGLE, JENNIFER)
July 2, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #52 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Motions to Dismiss. Motion set for 8/6/2018 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
June 8, 2018 Amended Set/Reset Deadlines as to #49 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint [#46]. Motion set for 7/16/2018 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
June 7, 2018 Filing 51 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #49 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint [#46] . (GREENBERG, BRUCE)
June 5, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #49 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint [#46]. Motion set for 7/2/2018 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
June 4, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE by PATRIOT LAND TRANSFER, LLC Notice of Joinder in Support of Motion To Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, NA (DESIDERATO, JERRY)
June 4, 2018 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint [#46] by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(NAGLE, JENNIFER)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint by 6/4/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 5/11/2018. (dmr)
May 10, 2018 Filing 47 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to the First Amended Class Action Complaint [#46] by All Defendants. (NAGLE, JENNIFER)
May 7, 2018 Filing 46 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PATRIOT LAND TRANSFER, LLC, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., filed by JACQUELINE SHERIDAN, PARRISH SHERIDAN, ANNA CONOVER, BRYAN VAN VELSON, JACQUELINE VAN VELSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(GREENBERG, BRUCE)
March 29, 2018 Filing 45 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/23/2018, before Judge RENEE MARIE BUMB. Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Farrell (856-318-6100). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 4/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/30/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/27/2018. (tf, )
March 23, 2018 Filing 44 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Renee Marie Bumb: Motion Hearing held on 3/23/2018. Hearing on #20 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. Hearing on #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by PATRIOT LAND TRANSFER, LLC, PATRIOT LAND PROCESSING, LLC. Ordered motions granted. Ordered all claims against defendant Patriot Land Processing, LLC are dismissed. Ordered plaintiff leave to amend the complaint within 45 days. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter Carol Farrell) (ar1, )
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER, Granting #20 Motion to Dismiss ; Granting #23 Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiffs are granted leave to amend the Complaint, and that any amended complaint shall be filed within forty-five (45) days of the date of this Order, or by May 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 3/23/18. (js)
March 20, 2018 Filing 42 Letter from Jennifer J. Nagle re 41 Order. (NAGLE, JENNIFER)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TEXT ORDER. Due to anticipated inclement weather, oral argument on the pending Motions to Dismiss is postponed to Friday, March 23, 2018, at 11:00 A.M. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 3/20/18. (ar1, )
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT ORDER. Due to an unanticipated scheduling conflict, oral argument on the pending Motion to Dismiss is postponed to Wednesday, March 21, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 3/8/2018. (Bumb, Renee)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 LETTER ORDER, oral argument shall be held on 3/20/18 @10:00am. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 2/7/18. (js)
February 6, 2018 Filing 38 Letter re 37 Order,. (NAGLE, JENNIFER)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ORDER. The Court will conduct oral argument on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss [Docket Nos. 20 and 23] on February 23, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 2/2/2018. (Bumb, Renee)
October 2, 2017 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Support filed by PATRIOT LAND PROCESSING, LLC, PATRIOT LAND TRANSFER, LLC re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DESIDERATO, JERRY)
October 2, 2017 Filing 35 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(NAGLE, JENNIFER)
September 29, 2017 Filing 34 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney ERICA SINGER MEKLES terminated. (MEKLES, ERICA)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER, Granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply; reply briefs due 10/2/17. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 9/21/17. (js)
September 20, 2017 Setting Deadlines as to #32 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #31 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion . Motion set for 10/16/2017 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (js)
September 20, 2017 Filing 32 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #31 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(NAGLE, JENNIFER)
September 18, 2017 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (GREENBERG, BRUCE)
September 7, 2017 Filing 30 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Sarah A. Zadrozny, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GREENBERG, BRUCE)
September 7, 2017 Filing 29 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Melissa L. English, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GREENBERG, BRUCE)
September 7, 2017 Filing 28 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael Paul Smith, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GREENBERG, BRUCE)
September 7, 2017 Filing 27 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Megan A. Benevento, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GREENBERG, BRUCE)
September 7, 2017 Filing 26 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Veronica B. Nannis, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GREENBERG, BRUCE)
September 7, 2017 Filing 25 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Timothy F. Maloney, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (GREENBERG, BRUCE)
September 7, 2017 Pro Hac Vice counsel, TIMOTHY F. MALONEY, VERONICA B. NANNIS, MEGAN A. BENEVENTO, MICHAEL PAUL SMITH, MELISSA L. ENGLISH and SARAH A. ZADROZNY, have been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (js)
September 6, 2017 Pro Hac Vice fee received for Jeffrey S. Patterson, Esq.: $150, receipt number TRE083908 (mmh)
September 5, 2017 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to David E. Fialkow, Esq. receipt number TRE083781 (mps)
September 5, 2017 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Timothy F. Maloney, Veronica B. Nannis and Megan A. Benevento: $ 450, receipt number CAM9024. (js)
September 5, 2017 Pro Hac Vice fee: as to Melissa English, Sara Zadronzy, and Michael Paul Smith $ 450, receipt number CAM9023 (jbk, )
August 29, 2017 Resetting Deadlines as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint. Motion reset for 10/2/2017 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (js)
August 29, 2017 Setting Deadlines as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 10/2/2017 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (js)
August 29, 2017 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PATRIOT LAND PROCESSING, LLC, PATRIOT LAND TRANSFER, LLC. (DESIDERATO, JERRY)
August 29, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by PATRIOT LAND PROCESSING, LLC, PATRIOT LAND TRANSFER, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law, #2 Certification Wm Gordon Certification with Exhibits, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(DESIDERATO, JERRY)
August 29, 2017 Filing 22 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint . (GREENBERG, BRUCE)
August 24, 2017 Setting Deadlines as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint. Motion set for 9/18/2017 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (js)
August 24, 2017 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. identifying Wells Fargo & Company as Corporate Parent.. (NAGLE, JENNIFER)
August 24, 2017 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. Responses due by 9/5/2017 (Attachments: #1 Brief in support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(NAGLE, JENNIFER)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Michael Paul Smith, Melissa L. English, Sarah A. Zadrozny, Timothy F. Maloney, Veronica Nannis, and Megan A. Benevento Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/23/2017. (rtm, )
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice(David E. Fialkow and Jeffrey S. Patterson). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/23/17. (js)
August 23, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admissions of Michael Paul Smith, Melissa L. English, Sarah A. Zadrozny, Timothy F. Maloney, Veronica Nannis, and Megan A. Benevento by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Bruce D. Greenberg, #2 Certification of Michael Paul Smith, #3 Certification of Melissa L. English, #4 Certification of Sarah A. Zadrozny, #5 Certification of Timothy F. Maloney, #6 Certification of Veronica Nannis, #7 Certification of Megan A. Benevento, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(GREENBERG, BRUCE)
August 23, 2017 Setting Deadlines as to #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admissions of Michael Paul Smith, Melissa L. English, Sarah A. Zadrozny, Timothy F. Maloney, Veronica Nannis, and Megan A. Benevento. Motion set for 9/18/2017 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (js)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER. THIS MATTER comes before the Court upon letters filed by Defendants Patriot Land Transfer, LLC and Patriot Land Processing, LLC (collectively "Patriot") [Dkt. No. 12] and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. [Dkt. No. 14] requesting a pre-motion conference in regard to their proposed Motions to Dismiss. Having read the submissions by the parties, including Plaintiffs' responses [Dkt. Nos. 13, 15], the Court does not believe that a pre-motion conference would be productive at this time. Therefore, Defendants may proceed with filing their proposed motions if they choose to do so. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/22/17. (ar1, )
August 21, 2017 Filing 15 Letter from Bruce D. Greenberg to the Honorable Renee Marie Bumb, U.S.D.J. (GREENBERG, BRUCE)
August 14, 2017 Filing 14 Letter from Jennifer J. Nagle, Esq. to Hon. Renee Marie Bumb, U.S.D.J. re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference. (NAGLE, JENNIFER)
August 11, 2017 Filing 13 Letter from Bruce D. Greenberg to the Honorable Renee Marie Bumb, U.S.D.J. (GREENBERG, BRUCE)
August 4, 2017 Filing 12 Letter from Jerry R. DeSiderato, Counsel for Defendants, Patriot Land Transfer,LLC and Patriot Land Processing, LLC, Re Request for Pre-Motion Conference. (DESIDERATO, JERRY)
August 1, 2017 Setting Deadlines as to #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motions set for 9/5/2017 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, these motions will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (js)
August 1, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Erica S. Mekles in Support of the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jeffrey S. Patterson, Esq., #2 Certification of Jeffrey S. Patterson in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jeffrey S. Patterson, Esq., #4 Certificate of Service for the Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jeffrey S. Patterson, Esq.)(MEKLES, ERICA)
August 1, 2017 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Erica S. Mekles in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission for David E. Fialkow, Esq., #2 Certification of David E. Fialkow, Esq. in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of David E. Fialkow, Esq., #4 Certificate of Service re: Motion for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of David E. Fialkow, Esq.)(MEKLES, ERICA)
July 28, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ERICA SINGER MEKLES on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (MEKLES, ERICA)
July 20, 2017 Filing 8 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by PATRIOT LAND PROCESSING, LLC, PATRIOT LAND TRANSFER, LLC. (DESIDERATO, JERRY)
July 20, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN W. SPANG on behalf of PATRIOT LAND PROCESSING, LLC, PATRIOT LAND TRANSFER, LLC (SPANG, BENJAMIN)
July 20, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JERRY R. DESIDERATO on behalf of PATRIOT LAND PROCESSING, LLC, PATRIOT LAND TRANSFER, LLC (DESIDERATO, JERRY)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, answer due 8/16/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 7/19/17. (js)
July 19, 2017 Filing 4 STIPULATION and proposed order extending time to respond to the Complaint by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (NAGLE, JENNIFER)
July 19, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER JANEIRA NAGLE on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (NAGLE, JENNIFER)
June 26, 2017 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PATRIOT LAND PROCESSING, LLC, PATRIOT LAND TRANSFER, LLC, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *JAIME KASSELMAN* (jbk, )
June 26, 2017 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (jbk, )
June 26, 2017 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Jury Demand, . In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do not select all plaintiffs or all defendant. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jbk, )
June 23, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7923647) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JACQUELINE SHERIDAN, PARRISH SHERIDAN, ANNA CONOVER, BRYAN VAN VELSON, JACQUELINE VAN VELSON. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Non Arbitrability, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(GREENBERG, BRUCE)
June 23, 2017 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CONOVER et al v. PATRIOT LAND TRANSFER, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUELINE VAN VELSON
Represented By: BRUCE DANIEL GREENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUELINE SHERIDAN
Represented By: BRUCE DANIEL GREENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNA CONOVER
Represented By: BRUCE DANIEL GREENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PARRISH SHERIDAN
Represented By: BRUCE DANIEL GREENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYAN VAN VELSON
Represented By: BRUCE DANIEL GREENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By: ERICA SINGER MEKLES
Represented By: JENNIFER JANEIRA NAGLE
Represented By: MALORY MARIE PASCARELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRIOT LAND PROCESSING, LLC
Represented By: BENJAMIN W. SPANG
Represented By: JERRY R. DESIDERATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRIOT LAND TRANSFER, LLC
Represented By: BENJAMIN W. SPANG
Represented By: JERRY R. DESIDERATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?