MANNING v. ORTIZ
Petitioner: GILBERT MANNING
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and DAVID ORTIZ
Case Number: 1:2018cv11884
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Burlington
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO ANSWER that within forty-five (45) days of the date of the entry of this Order, Respondent shall file and serve an Answer. ORDERED that within forty-five (45) days of receipt of the Answer, Petitioner may file a Reply to the Answer, etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 9/10/2018. (rss, n.m. and docs sent to respondents)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number new037232 (eu, ) (eu).
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus NO IFP/FF, filed by GILBERT MANNING. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rss, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MANNING v. ORTIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DAVID ORTIZ
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GILBERT MANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?