PELLE v. REGAL IDEAS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JOSEPH PELLE
Defendant: Regal Ideas, Inc., JOHN DOE I-VIII, DIAL ACQUISITIONS PRODUCTS, REGAL ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC., NORMAN LIEFKO, TELESTEPS LIMITED, LIBERTY SURPLUS INSURANCE CORPORATION, TELESTEPS, THE HARTFORD, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE GROUP, HULTSTEG AB, TELESTEPS, INC., DIAL INDUSTRIAL SALES, INC., HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, TELESCOPIC WORLDWIDE INCORPORATED and TELESTEPS AB
Case Number: 1:2018cv12824
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Atlantic
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER Upon letter application of counsel, the Court has postponed the Initial Scheduling Conference originally scheduled on October 22, 2018. The Initial Scheduling Conference will be rescheduled, if necessary, after the motion to remand [Doc. No. 22], is decided. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on October 9, 2018. (jk)
October 5, 2018 Filing 23 Letter from Craig R. Rygiel. (RYGIEL, CRAIG)
September 28, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #22 Second MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 11/5/2018 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 22 Second MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memo of Law, #2 Certificate of Service Cert. of Service, #3 Exhibit Exh. A, #4 Exhibit Exh. B, #5 Exhibit Exh. C, #6 Exhibit Exh. D, #7 Exhibit Exh. E, #8 Exhibit Exh. F)(MONACO, JOSEPH)
September 26, 2018 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Renee Marie Bumb: Pre-Motion Telephone Conference held on 9/26/2018. (Court Reporter Ted Formaroli) (ar1, )
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER. Due to counsel's scheduling conflict, the telephone conference will be held at 2:15 p.m. on September 26, 2018. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 9/19/2018. (Bumb, Renee)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER. Due to a scheduling conflict, the telephone conference currently scheduled for September 24, 2018 is adjourned to September 26, 2018 at 9:15 a.m. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 9/19/2018. (Bumb, Renee)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER THIS MATTER comes before the Court upon letters from Defendant Hartford Casualty and Plaintiff Joseph Pelle, concerning Hartford's proposed motion to dismiss and Pelle's proposed motion to remand. [Dkt Nos 9, 12, 14 and 16] Having read those letters, the Court hereby orders that all parties appear for a telephonic pre-motion conference to be held on September 24, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall kindly initiate the call. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 09/14/2018. (Costigan, Roberta)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER Upon letter application of counsel, the Court has rescheduled the Initial Scheduling Conference originally scheduled on September 19, 2018. The new date and time for the in-person Initial Scheduling Conference is October 22, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on September 10, 2018. (jk)
September 10, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE re #14 Letter. (SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
September 6, 2018 Filing 15 Letter from Plaintiff. (MONACO, JOSEPH)
September 6, 2018 Filing 14 Letter from Plaintiff. (MONACO, JOSEPH)
September 6, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by REGAL IDEAS, INC.. (SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
September 5, 2018 Filing 12 Letter from Plaintiff re #9 Letter. (MONACO, JOSEPH)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER This matter comes before the Court upon a Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff Joseph Pelle [Dkt. No. 10]. The motion is ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED. Pursuant to the Court's Individual Rules and Procedures I.A., "[i]n an effort to resolve cases expeditiously, before bringing a... motion to remand... a party must submit a letter" described therein. A link to the Court's Individual Rules and Procedures may be found at the docket entry made on August 16, 2018. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 09/04/2018. (Costigan, Roberta)
September 4, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #10 First MOTION to Remand to Superior Court of New Jersey Atlantic City Vincinage. Motion set for 10/1/2018 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
August 31, 2018 Filing 10 First MOTION to Remand to Superior Court of New Jersey Atlantic City Vincinage by JOSEPH PELLE. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memo of Law, #2 Certification Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F)(MONACO, JOSEPH)
August 30, 2018 Filing 9 Letter from Craig R. Rygiel. (RYGIEL, CRAIG)
August 30, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (RYGIEL, CRAIG)
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by CRAIG R. RYGIEL on behalf of HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, THE HARTFORD (RYGIEL, CRAIG)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 9/12/2018. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/29/2018. (rtm, )
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by REGAL IDEAS, INC..(SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by REGAL IDEAS, INC.. (SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINA LYNN SAVERIANO on behalf of REGAL IDEAS, INC. (SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
August 16, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Cause of Action,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (rss, )
August 16, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (rss, )
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Initial Conference set for 9/19/2018 02:30 PM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/16/2018. (rss, )
August 16, 2018 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (rss, )
August 16, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (rss, )
August 15, 2018 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (mmb, )
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Regal Ideas, Inc. from Atlantic, case number 1399-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8957140), filed by Regal Ideas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification Notice of Filing of Removal, #2 Certificate of Service)(MARASCO, SUZANNE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PELLE v. REGAL IDEAS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regal Ideas, Inc.
Represented By: SUZANNE M. MARASCO
Represented By: CHRISTINA LYNN SAVERIANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE I-VIII
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIAL ACQUISITIONS PRODUCTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REGAL ALUMINUM PRODUCTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORMAN LIEFKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELESTEPS LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY SURPLUS INSURANCE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELESTEPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HARTFORD
Represented By: CRAIG R. RYGIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HULTSTEG AB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELESTEPS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIAL INDUSTRIAL SALES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTFORD CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: CRAIG R. RYGIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELESCOPIC WORLDWIDE INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELESTEPS AB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH PELLE
Represented By: JOSEPH MONACO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?