MCMAHON v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE

Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Petitioner: MR. ISIAH H. MCMAHON, JR.
Case Number: 1:2018cv13797
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: New Jersey District Court
0 Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
1 Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2018 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: In-person Intial Conference held on the record on 11/2/2018. In-Person Status Conference set for December 4, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 5C. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (dmr)
November 2, 2018 10 Featured Case TEXT ORDER The Court has scheduled an On the Record In-Person Status Conference for December 4, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. in Camden - Courtroom 5C. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/2/18. (nar)
November 2, 2018 9 Letter from ISIAH H. MCMAHON requesting change of address. (cry, )
November 1, 2018 8 Featured Case TEXT ORDER The parties shall submit a Joint Discovery Plan to the Court no later than the time period provided for in L.Civ.R. 26.1(b)(2). The form to be used for the Joint Discovery Plan can be retrieved from: http://www.njd.uscourts.gov/sites/njd/files/R16DiscoveryPlanCamONLY.pdf. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/1/18. (nar)
October 1, 2018 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to ISIAH H. MCMAHON, JR. re: text order 3 (rss, )
October 1, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - ISIAH H. MCMAHON, JR. does not appear to have a correct mailing address listed with the court and may not be receiving his/her documents in this case. Pursuant to local rule 10.1, unrepresented parties must advise the Court of any change in their address within seven days of being apprised of such change by filing a notice of said change with the Clerk. Failure to file a notice of address change may result in the imposition of sanctions by the Court. (dmw)
September 24, 2018 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to ISIAH H. MCMAHON. re Initial Conference NEF & Text Order. (Re-Sent to updated address). (cry, )
September 21, 2018 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to MR. ISIAH H. MCMAHON, JR. re Text Order (Re-sent to updated address) (dmr)
September 18, 2018 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable with Schedule of Initial Conference. Mail resent to ISIAH H. MCMAHON with apartment number listed. (cry, )
September 12, 2018 3 Featured Case TEXT ORDER Due to a scheduling conflict, the Court hereby reschedules the in-person Initial Conference previously set for November 1, 2018. The new date and time of the in-person Initial Conference is November 2, 2018 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 5C - Camden. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 9/12/18. (nar)
September 12, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Jurisdiction, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
September 12, 2018 2 Featured Case Order Initial Conference set for 11/1/2018 11:30 AM in Camden - Courtroom 5C before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 9/12/2018. (cry, )
September 12, 2018 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, )
September 12, 2018 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
September 12, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE from NEW JERSEY SUPERIOR COURT, LAW DIVISION, SMALL CLAIMS COURT, case number SC-1105-18., filed by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service)(PASCAL, ELIZABETH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCMAHON v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MR. ISIAH H. MCMAHON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Represented By: ELIZABETH ANN PASCAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?