RAPKIN v. GAP, INC.

Plaintiff: PHYLLIS RAPKIN
Defendant: GAP, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv13890
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: New Jersey District Court
0 Judge: Jerome B Simandle
1 Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2018 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PHYLLIS RAPKIN. GAP, INC. waiver sent on 10/25/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (VANGURI, NEELIMA)
October 1, 2018 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHYLLIS RAPKIN. GAP, INC. served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018. (VANGURI, NEELIMA)
September 14, 2018 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GAP, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
September 14, 2018 Judge Jerome B. Simandle and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against GAP, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9023719) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PHYLLIS RAPKIN.(VANGURI, NEELIMA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAPKIN v. GAP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYLLIS RAPKIN
Represented By: NEELIMA VANGURI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?