MCCANN v. THE PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. et al

Plaintiff: Nathan McCann
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10 and THE PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv13909
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: New Jersey District Court
0 Judge: Robert B Kugler
1 Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2018 8 Featured Case TEXT ORDER Upon letter application dated November 1, 2018 from Scott Rabe, Esquire, counsel for defendant, and it appearing that all counsel consent to the request to reschedule the in-person Initial Conference previously set for November 8, 2018, the Court hereby GRANTS the request. The new date and time of the in-person Initial Conference is December 5, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. in Room 2040 - Camden. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/6/18. (nar)
November 2, 2018 7 Letter from Scott Rabe, Esq. requesting that the Scheduling Conference currently set for November 8, 2018 at 11:30 a.m. be adjourned to the first week of December 2018. (RABE, SCOTT)
November 1, 2018 6 Featured Case TEXT ORDER The parties shall submit a Joint Discovery Plan to the Court no later than the time period provided for in L.Civ.R. 26.1(b)(2). The form to be used for the Joint Discovery Plan can be retrieved from: http://www.njd.uscourts.gov/sites/njd/files/R16DiscoveryPlanCamONLY.pdf. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/1/18. (nar)
September 21, 2018 5 ANSWER to Complaint by THE PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC..(RABE, SCOTT)
September 17, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Cause of Action,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
September 17, 2018 4 Featured Case Order Initial Conference set for 11/8/2018 11:30 AM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 9/17/2018. (cry, )
September 14, 2018 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
September 14, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT RABE on behalf of THE PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. (RABE, SCOTT)
September 14, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC.. (RABE, SCOTT)
September 14, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. from Superiot Court of Camden County, case number CAM-L-003036-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9025929), filed by THE PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-F, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(RABE, SCOTT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCANN v. THE PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan McCann
Represented By: ZACHARY R. WALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PNC FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Represented By: SCOTT RABE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?