ALESHIRE v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: JOCELYN ALESHIRE
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2018cv14239
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jose L Linares
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by JOCELYN ALESHIRE.. (TOVINSKY, LAUREN)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing parties to follow submission schedule. So Ordered by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 11/14/2018. (eh, )
November 14, 2018 Proposed Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge for a Social Security Appeal ISSUED to Plaintiff. Pursuant to #Standing Order 18-2, Plaintiff may consent to have this case assigned to a Recall Magistrate Judge for the purpose of deciding his/her Social Security Appeals. If Plaintiff elects to consent to this assignment, please complete this form and return within 30 days from the issuance of this #Consent Form. (eh, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 Administrative Record Filed - Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9)(DIVITO, KENNETH)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by KENNETH DIVITO on behalf of COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (DIVITO, KENNETH)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOCELYN ALESHIRE. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY served on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service on U S Attorney Fitzpatrick, #2 Proof of Service on General Counsel, #3 Proof of Service on U S Attorney General)(TOVINSKY, LAUREN)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed, see #1 . (dam, )
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. It is ordered that the Clerk file the Complaint, the Clerk shall issue a summons, and the U.S. Marshal serve a copy of the Complaint, Summons and this order upon the defendant(s) as directed by the plaintiff(s). etc. Signed by Chief Judge Jose L. Linares on 9/26/2018. (dam, )
September 25, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint entered by JOCELYN ALESHIRE on 09/25/2018 was submitted with an Application for In forma pauperis (IFP). For future filings of complaints with an IFP application please use the event COMPLAINT RECEIVED, which can be found under Service of Process. This message is for informational purposes only. (cry, )
September 25, 2018 Chief Judge Jose L. Linares added. (dd, )
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by JOCELYN ALESHIRE. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)(TOVINSKY, LAUREN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALESHIRE v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOCELYN ALESHIRE
Represented By: LAUREN S. TOVINSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: KENNETH DIVITO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?