HICKS v. LOURDES HEALTH SERVICES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DIANA HICKS
Defendant: OUR LADY OF LOURDES MEDICAL CENTER, INC., LOURDES CARDIOLOGY SERVICES, OUR LADY OF LOURDES HEALTH SERVICES, INC., LOURDES HEALTH SERVICES, INC. and DAVENDER AKULA AND ASSOCIATED CARDIOVASCULAR CONSULTANTS
Case Number: 1:2018cv15256
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph H Rodriguez
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER Upon letter application of counsel, the Court has rescheduled the Initial Scheduling Conference originally scheduled on December 19, 2018. The new date and time for in-person Initial Scheduling Conference is January 8, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on December 3, 2018. (jk)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Initial Conference set for 12/19/2018 11:00 AM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 11/26/2018. (rtm, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by DAVENDER AKULA AND ASSOCIATED CARDIOVASCULAR CONSULTANTS, LOURDES CARDIOLOGY SERVICES, LOURDES HEALTH SERVICES, INC., OUR LADY OF LOURDES HEALTH SERVICES, INC., OUR LADY OF LOURDES MEDICAL CENTER, INC..(TALVACCHIA, JOHN)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 Notice to MU'MIN FARUQ ISLAM re mandatory eFiling. (cry, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DAVENDER AKULA AND ASSOCIATED CARDIOVASCULAR CONSULTANTS, LOURDES CARDIOLOGY SERVICES, LOURDES HEALTH SERVICES, INC., OUR LADY OF LOURDES HEALTH SERVICES, INC., OUR LADY OF LOURDES MEDICAL CENTER, INC. with answer to complaint due within 21 days. (cry, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DAVENDER AKULA AND ASSOCIATED CARDIOVASCULAR CONSULTANTS, LOURDES CARDIOLOGY SERVICES, LOURDES HEALTH SERVICES, INC., OUR LADY OF LOURDES HEALTH SERVICES, INC., OUR LADY OF LOURDES MEDICAL CENTER, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number CAM010023) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DIANA HICKS. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt)(cry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HICKS v. LOURDES HEALTH SERVICES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANA HICKS
Represented By: MU'MIN FARUQ ISLAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OUR LADY OF LOURDES MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: JOHN A. TALVACCHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOURDES CARDIOLOGY SERVICES
Represented By: JOHN A. TALVACCHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OUR LADY OF LOURDES HEALTH SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: JOHN A. TALVACCHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOURDES HEALTH SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: JOHN A. TALVACCHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVENDER AKULA AND ASSOCIATED CARDIOVASCULAR CONSULTANTS
Represented By: JOHN A. TALVACCHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?