NANAK PRODUCE & MARKETING, INC. v. SOUTHERN SUN, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: NANAK PRODUCE & MARKETING, INC.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: PAUL G. ROSS and SOUTHERN SUN, LLC.
3Rd Party Defendant: Farm Fresh, Inc., Rennen Victor, Parminder Singh and MANBIR SINGH
Case Number: 1:2018cv15448
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph H Rodriguez
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject-Matter). Motion set for 1/22/2019 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
December 24, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject-Matter) by Farm Fresh, Inc., NANAK PRODUCE & MARKETING, INC., MANBIR SINGH, Parminder Singh. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order - Granting Motion)(STONBERG, MICHAEL)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER regarding funds available for the Court's consideration as to distribution. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 12/20/2018. (dmr)
December 20, 2018 Filing 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez: Show Cause Hearing held on 12/20/2018. Hearing on why defendant Paul G. Ross shall not be held in contempt for violating this courts order on November 2nd, 2018. Text Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder Karen Friedlander.) (dmr)
December 19, 2018 Filing 33 CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by PAUL G. ROSS re #26 Emergency MOTION to Compel Defendants to Comply with TRO, and to Comply with Order Compelling them to Provide a "Complete Accounting" (ISAACSON, NANCY)
December 18, 2018 Filing 32 BRIEF in Opposition filed by NANAK PRODUCE & MARKETING, INC., Parminder Singh re #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(STONBERG, MICHAEL)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's #30 Motion for Order to Show Cause; The Defendant Paul Ross shall appear before the Court to show cause why he should not be cited for contempt of Court for violating the Cort's Order #6 , etc. on 12/20/2018 at 10;00 AM in Courtroom 5D. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 12/18/2018. (dmr)
December 18, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #30 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause re Failure to Comply with Restraining Order and Failure to Provide a "Complete Accounting". Motion set for 1/22/2019 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
December 17, 2018 Filing 30 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause re Failure to Comply with Restraining Order and Failure to Provide a "Complete Accounting" by NANAK PRODUCE & MARKETING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- F, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(STONBERG, MICHAEL)
December 11, 2018 Filing 29 ANSWER to Counterclaim by NANAK PRODUCE & MARKETING, INC..(STONBERG, MICHAEL)
December 10, 2018 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/10/2018. (Court Reporter/Recorder Carol Farrell.) (rtm, )
December 9, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE by NANAK PRODUCE & MARKETING, INC. of Filing a Proposed Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(STONBERG, MICHAEL)
December 6, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #26 Emergency MOTION to Compel Defendants to Comply with TRO, and to Comply with Order Compelling them to Provide a "Complete Accounting". Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
December 5, 2018 Filing 26 Emergency MOTION to Compel Defendants to Comply with TRO, and to Comply with Order Compelling them to Provide a "Complete Accounting" by NANAK PRODUCE & MARKETING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A, #2 Exhibit - B, #3 Exhibit - C, #4 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(STONBERG, MICHAEL)
December 4, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by SOUTHERN SUN, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Paul Ross, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ISAACSON, NANCY)
December 3, 2018 Filing 24 Letter from Robert Goldman re #23 Letter. (STONBERG, MICHAEL)
December 3, 2018 Filing 23 Letter from Nancy Isaacson on behalf of Southern Sun LLC re #13 MOTION to Vacate #6 Order on Motion for TRO,, . (Attachments: #1 Certification of Paul Ross)(ISAACSON, NANCY)
December 3, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS ON THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT ISSUED as to Farm Fresh, Inc., MANBIR SINGH, Parminder Singh, Rennen Victor. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dmr)
November 30, 2018 Filing 21 Request for Summons to be Issued by SOUTHERN SUN, LLC., PAUL G. ROSS as to Farm Fresh, Inc., MANBIR SINGH, Parminder Singh, Rennen Victor. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Parminder Singh, #2 Summons to Rennan Victor, #3 Summons to Manbir Singh)(ISAACSON, NANCY)
November 27, 2018 Telephone conference scheduled for Monday, December 10th, 2018 at 10:00 am. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call. (db, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 20 Certification on behalf of PAUL G. ROSS Re #13 Motion to Vacate. (ISAACSON, NANCY)
November 26, 2018 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez: Telephone Status Conference held on 11/26/2018. (Court Reporter/Recorder Karen Friedlander.) (dmr)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Initial Conference set for 1/24/2019 at 11:30 AM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/21/2018. (dmr)
November 20, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against NANAK PRODUCE & MARKETING, INC., MANBIR SINGH, Rennen Victor, Parminder Singh, Farm Fresh, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against NANAK PRODUCE & MARKETING, INC. by PAUL G. ROSS, SOUTHERN SUN, LLC..(ISAACSON, NANCY)
November 19, 2018 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez: Telephone Status Conference held on 11/19/2018. (Court Reporter/Recorder Karen Friedlander.) (dmr) (
November 19, 2018 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number CAM010073 as ti Robert E. Goldman. (dmr)
November 14, 2018 Telephone conference scheduled for Monday, November 19th, 2018 at 11:00 am. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call. (db, )
November 13, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Vacate #6 Order on Motion for TRO,, . Motion set for 12/17/2018 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
November 12, 2018 Filing 15 BRIEF in Opposition filed by NANAK PRODUCE & MARKETING, INC. re #13 MOTION to Vacate #6 Order on Motion for TRO,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A, #2 Exhibit - B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(STONBERG, MICHAEL)
November 12, 2018 Filing 14 Letter from Nancy Isaacson re #12 Letter. (ISAACSON, NANCY)
November 12, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Vacate #6 Order on Motion for TRO,, by PAUL G. ROSS, SOUTHERN SUN, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Paul Ross, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ISAACSON, NANCY)
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 Letter from Robert E. Goldman, Esq. re #10 Motion Hearing,. (STONBERG, MICHAEL)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert E. Goldman. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 11/5/2018. (dmr)
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez: Application for Preliminary Injunction held on 11/5/2018. Hearing on plaintiff's application for Robert E. Goldman to appear Pro Hac Vice. Ordered application granted. Order to be entered. Hearing on plaintiff's application for Preliminary Injunction. Ordered temporary restraining order remains in effect while parties attempt to reach an agreement(Court Reporter/Recorder Karen Friedlander.) (dmr)
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by NANAK PRODUCE & MARKETING, INC. re #8 Certification - Reply to Declaration of Paul Ross (STONBERG, MICHAEL)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 Certification on behalf of PAUL G. ROSS, SOUTHERN SUN, LLC. Re #6 Order on Motion for TRO,,. (ISAACSON, NANCY)
November 5, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 12/3/2018 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
November 3, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by NANAK PRODUCE & MARKETING, INC. re #6 Order on Motion for TRO,, Service of Order on Defendants (STONBERG, MICHAEL)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for TRO; Show Cause Hearing set for Monday, November 5, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. Ordered Defendants shall file and serve any papers in advance of the Preliminary Injunction Hearing by 10:00 a.m. November 5, 2018; Ordered that Plaintiff shall file and serve any reply papers in advance of the Preliminary Injunction Hearing by 12:00p.m. November 5, 2018. Ordered that, pending the Preliminary Injunction Hearing, Defendants are Temporarily Restrained and Enjoined pursuant to Rule 65(b) until further order of the Court, etc. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 11/2/18. (dd, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by NANAK PRODUCE & MARKETING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification by REG, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(STONBERG, MICHAEL)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by NANAK PRODUCE & MARKETING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Affidavit of Parminder Singh, #3 Certification of Attorney re No Notice, #4 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(STONBERG, MICHAEL)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NANAK PRODUCE & MARKETING, INC.. (STONBERG, MICHAEL)
October 31, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (ssp, )
October 31, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ssp, )
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PAUL G. ROSS, SOUTHERN SUN, LLC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, )
October 30, 2018 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (mmb, )
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PAUL G. ROSS, SOUTHERN SUN, LLC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9134220) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NANAK PRODUCE & MARKETING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Southern Sun, LLC, #3 Summons Paul G. Ross)(STONBERG, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NANAK PRODUCE & MARKETING, INC. v. SOUTHERN SUN, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: PAUL G. ROSS
Represented By: NANCY ISAACSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: SOUTHERN SUN, LLC.
Represented By: NANCY ISAACSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANAK PRODUCE & MARKETING, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS STONBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Farm Fresh, Inc.
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS STONBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Rennen Victor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Parminder Singh
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS STONBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: MANBIR SINGH
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS STONBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?