FISCHER et al v. NEW JERSEY EDUCATION ASSOCIATION et al
Plaintiff: SUSAN G FISCHER and JEANETTE SPECK
Defendant: NEW JERSEY EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, TOWNSHIP OF OCEAN EDUCATION ASSOCIATION and GOVERNOR PHIL MURPHY
Case Number: 1:2018cv15628
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Eric Harrington, Esq., #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Leon Dayan, #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adam Bellotti, Esq.. Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Eric Harrington, Esq. by NEW JERSEY EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, TOWNSHIP OF OCEAN EDUCATION ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Certification Eric Harrington, Esq., #2 Certification of Robert A. Fagella, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Statement Why No Brief if Necessary, #5 Certificate of Service)(FAGELLA, ROBERT)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Leon Dayan by NEW JERSEY EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, TOWNSHIP OF OCEAN EDUCATION ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Leon Dayan, #2 Certification of Robert A. Fagella, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Statement Way No Brief is Necessary, #5 Certificate of Service)(FAGELLA, ROBERT)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adam Bellotti, Esq. by NEW JERSEY EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, TOWNSHIP OF OCEAN EDUCATION ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Adam Bellotti, Esq., #2 Certification of Robert A. Fagella, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Statement Why No Brief is Necessary, #5 Certificate of Service)(FAGELLA, ROBERT)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT ORDER For Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by 1/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/28/2018. (dmr)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 Letter from Lauren A. Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order for Extension of Time)(JENSEN, LAUREN)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN AMY JENSEN on behalf of PHIL MURPHY (JENSEN, LAUREN)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by FLAVIO L. KOMUVES on behalf of NEW JERSEY EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, TOWNSHIP OF OCEAN EDUCATION ASSOCIATION (KOMUVES, FLAVIO)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT A. FAGELLA on behalf of NEW JERSEY EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, TOWNSHIP OF OCEAN EDUCATION ASSOCIATION (FAGELLA, ROBERT)
November 14, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #3 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William L. Messenger. Motion set for 12/17/2018 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice William L. Messenger by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification in support of motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(LAFFEY, MICHAEL)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PHIL MURPHY, NEW JERSEY EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, TOWNSHIP OF OCEAN EDUCATION ASSOCIATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
November 6, 2018 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, )
November 6, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
November 5, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
November 2, 2018 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9145247), filed by SUSAN G FISCHER, JEANETTE SPECK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(LAFFEY, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FISCHER et al v. NEW JERSEY EDUCATION ASSOCIATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY EDUCATION ASSOCIATION
Represented By: FLAVIO L. KOMUVES
Represented By: ROBERT A. FAGELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWNSHIP OF OCEAN EDUCATION ASSOCIATION
Represented By: FLAVIO L. KOMUVES
Represented By: ROBERT A. FAGELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOVERNOR PHIL MURPHY
Represented By: LAUREN AMY JENSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN G FISCHER
Represented By: MICHAEL P. LAFFEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEANETTE SPECK
Represented By: MICHAEL P. LAFFEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?