DAVIDSON v. PROBATION CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: RAYMOND J. DAVIDSON, SR.
Defendant: PSI SECURITY & INVESTIGATIONS, PROBATION CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES, BURLINGTON COUNTY FINANCIAL DIVISION, NEW JERSEY STATE DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES and CAMDEN COUNTY PROBATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv15709
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 16 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney RAGNER E. JAEGER terminated. Attorney SHMUEL BUSHWICK for CAMDEN COUNTY PROBATION,SHMUEL BUSHWICK for NEW JERSEY STATE DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES added.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BUSHWICK, SHMUEL)
December 28, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RAYMOND J. DAVIDSON, SR. CAMDEN COUNTY PROBATION served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019.(cry, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CAMDEN COUNTY PROBATION, PSI SECURITY & INVESTIGATIONS with answer to complaint due within 21 days. (rtm, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by SHMUEL BUSHWICK on behalf of BURLINGTON COUNTY FINANCIAL DIVISION, PROBATION CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BUSHWICK, SHMUEL)
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (rtm, )
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED ORDER Granting the Plaintiff's Application to proceed without prepayment of fees. Directing the Clerk to file the complaint and to file the USM 285 form for service of summons by the United States Marshal Service. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 12/11/2018. (rtm, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 10 Letter from Clerk's Office to plaintiff regarding return of USM 285 forms. (Mailed to plaintiff with USM 285 forms and attachments via US Postal Service First Class Mail) (dd )
December 5, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NEW JERSEY STATE DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES. NEW JERSEY STATE DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES waiver sent on 12/5/2018, answer due 2/4/2019. (JAEGER, RAGNER)
December 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by RAGNER E. JAEGER on behalf of NEW JERSEY STATE DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES (JAEGER, RAGNER)
December 4, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono. Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel by RAYMOND J. DAVIDSON, SR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(rtm, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BURLINGTON COUNTY FINANCIAL DIVISION, NEW JERSEY STATE DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, PROBATION CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES, PSI SECURITY & INVESTIGATIONS, adding Defendant CAMDEN COUNTY PROBATION with civil and criminal statutes, filed by RAYMOND J. DAVIDSON, SR.(rtm, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by RAYMOND J. DAVIDSON, SR. (rtm, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BURLINGTON COUNTY FINANCIAL DIVISION, NEW JERSEY STATE DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, PROBATION CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES, PSI SECURITY & INVESTIGATIONS with answer to complaint due within 21 days. (cry, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT #1 against BURLINGTON COUNTY FINANCIAL DIVISION, NEW JERSEY STATE DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, PROBATION CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES, PSI SECURITY & INVESTIGATIONS with JURY DEMAND, filed by RAYMOND J. DAVIDSON, SR.(cry, )
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting Plaintiff's IFP. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 11/06/2018. (cry,N.M)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Application IFP, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Exhibit, #6 Email Consent Form)(ssp, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2018: #7 additional page to exhibit #2) (rtm, ). Modified on 11/28/2018 (rtm, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIDSON v. PROBATION CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND J. DAVIDSON, SR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PSI SECURITY & INVESTIGATIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROBATION CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT SERVICES
Represented By: SHMUEL BUSHWICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURLINGTON COUNTY FINANCIAL DIVISION
Represented By: SHMUEL BUSHWICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY STATE DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: RAGNER E. JAEGER
Represented By: SHMUEL BUSHWICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMDEN COUNTY PROBATION
Represented By: SHMUEL BUSHWICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?