BROWN et al v. WIRTGEN GROUP et al

Plaintiff: DERRICK BROWN and LYNN BROWN
Defendant: WIRTGEN AMERICA, INC., WIRTGEN GROUP, BENDIX COMMERCIAL VEHICLE SYSTEMS, LLC, JOHN DOES 1-50, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-50 and CATERPILLAR INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv16004
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 conference will be held in Courtroom 3C on 3/15/2019 at 11:00 a.m., etc. Attorney BENJAMIN FOLKMAN terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 12/17/2018. (rss, n.m.)
December 17, 2018 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Motion Hearing held on 12/17/2018 re #10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Ordered Courtroom and portion of transcript UNDER SEAL. Ordered Courtroom and portion of transcript UNSEALED. Ordered Motion GRANTED. Order to be entered. filed by DERRICK BROWN, LYNN BROWN. (Court Reporter/Recorder Electronic Court Recorder.) (rss, )
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER At the parties letter request, the Court has postponed the Initial Scheduling conference originally scheduled on December 12, 2018 at 11:00 a.m.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on December 3, 2018. (jk)
November 30, 2018 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by CATERPILLAR INC..(KEALE, JAMES)
November 30, 2018 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by WIRTGEN AMERICA, INC..(TORTORA, NEIL)
November 30, 2018 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against ABC CORPORATIONS 1-50, CATERPILLAR INC., JOHN DOES 1-50, WIRTGEN AMERICA, INC., WIRTGEN GROUP by BENDIX COMMERCIAL VEHICLE SYSTEMS, LLC.(O'HARA, JEFFREY)
November 29, 2018 Filing 25 Letter from Benjamin Folkman re #3 Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden). (FOLKMAN, BENJAMIN)
November 19, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WIRTGEN AMERICA, INC. from Burlington County, case number BUR-L-2120-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9180020), filed by WIRTGEN AMERICA, INC..(TORTORA, NEIL)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 LETTER ORDER authorizing Plaintiffs to participate in the 12/17/2018 at 10:30am hearing via phone, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 11/16/2018. (rss, ) Modified on 11/19/2018 (se).
November 16, 2018 Filing 22 Exhibit to #20 Exhibit (to Document) SECOND AMENDED CONSENT AND JOINDER TO REMOVAL by BENDIX COMMERCIAL VEHICLE SYSTEMS, LLC. (O'HARA, JEFFREY)
November 15, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #21 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by BENDIX COMMERCIAL VEHICLE SYSTEMS, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/30/2018. (rss, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 21 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for an Extenstion of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead Pursuant to Local Civil Rules 6.1(b))(O'HARA, JEFFREY)
November 15, 2018 Filing 20 Exhibit to #19 Notice (Other) AMENDED CONSENT AND JOINDER TO REMOVAL by BENDIX COMMERCIAL VEHICLE SYSTEMS, LLC. (O'HARA, JEFFREY)
November 15, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice #19 submitted by BRYAN COUCH on 11/15/2018 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE SIGNATURE PAGE ONLY WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Attorney's Name.) Using the event EXHIBIT TO DOCUMENT found under OTHER DOCUMENTS and link this submission to the NOTICE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (rss, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE by BENDIX COMMERCIAL VEHICLE SYSTEMS, LLC AMENDED CONSENT AND JOINDER TO REMOVAL (COUCH, BRYAN)
November 15, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #18 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by WIRTGEN AMERICA, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/30/2018. (rss, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 18 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Wirtgen.. (TORTORA, NEIL)
November 15, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER #16 filed by NEIL TORTORA on 11/15/2018 was submitted incorrectly as a MOTION. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE APPLICATION USING the event APPLICATION FOR CLERK ORDER TO EXT ANSWER/PROPOSED ORDER found under OTHER DOCUMENTS This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (rss, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise move by WIRTGEN AMERICA, INC., WIRTGEN GROUP. (TORTORA, NEIL)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LETTER ORDER from Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider re: Oral argument on Plaintiffs' #10 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel scheduled on 12/17/2018 at 10:30am in Courtroom 3C, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 11/14/2018. (rss, )
November 14, 2018 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #15 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CATERPILLAR INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/30/2018. (rss, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 15 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (KEALE, JAMES)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Defendant Wirtgen America, Inc. shall have fifteen (15) days to amend its notice of removal, etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 11/14/2018. (rss, )
November 13, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . Motion set for 12/17/2018 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by ALYRA N. LIRIANO on behalf of BENDIX COMMERCIAL VEHICLE SYSTEMS, LLC (LIRIANO, ALYRA)
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN PAUL COUCH on behalf of BENDIX COMMERCIAL VEHICLE SYSTEMS, LLC (COUCH, BRYAN)
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY L. O'HARA on behalf of BENDIX COMMERCIAL VEHICLE SYSTEMS, LLC (O'HARA, JEFFREY)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(FOLKMAN, BENJAMIN)
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 Letter from Benjamin Folkman re #3 Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden). (FOLKMAN, BENJAMIN)
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by BENDIX COMMERCIAL VEHICLE SYSTEMS, LLC Consent to Removal (O'HARA, JEFFREY)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BENDIX COMMERCIAL VEHICLE SYSTEMS, LLC identifying Knorr Brake Holding Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (O'HARA, JEFFREY)
November 12, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CATERPILLAR INC. identifying Caterpillar Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (KEALE, JAMES)
November 12, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by CATERPILLAR INC. re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEALE, JAMES)
November 12, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES HOLSEY KEALE on behalf of CATERPILLAR INC. (KEALE, JAMES)
November 9, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (cry, )
November 9, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Cause of Action,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 12/12/2018 11:00 AM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 11/09/2018. (cry, )
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, no later than the first Rule 16 conference.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 11/09/2018. (cry, )
November 9, 2018 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WIRTGEN GROUP, Wirtgen America Inc.. (TORTORA, NEIL)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WIRTGEN GROUP from Burlington County, case number BUR-L-2120-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9163189), filed by WIRTGEN GROUP.(TORTORA, NEIL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWN et al v. WIRTGEN GROUP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WIRTGEN AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: NEIL A. TORTORA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WIRTGEN GROUP
Represented By: NEIL A. TORTORA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENDIX COMMERCIAL VEHICLE SYSTEMS, LLC
Represented By: JEFFREY L. O'HARA
Represented By: ALYRA N. LIRIANO
Represented By: BRYAN PAUL COUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATERPILLAR INC.
Represented By: JAMES HOLSEY KEALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERRICK BROWN
Represented By: BENJAMIN FOLKMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYNN BROWN
Represented By: BENJAMIN FOLKMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?