CLAYTON v. CAMPBELL SOUP COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: CHARLES W. CLAYTON
Defendant: CAMPBELL SOUP COMPANY, DENISE M. MORRISON and ANTHONY P. DISILVESTRO
Case Number: 1:2018cv16476
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (tf, )
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ORDER granting 4 Motion for Consolidation of related actions, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel. (18-14385). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/7/2019. (tf, )
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER -- The Court having received notice that Ironworkers Locals 40, 361 and 417 Union Security Funds withdraws its motion and does not object to the motion filed by Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System [Doc. No. 17]; and good cause existing for the entry of this Order, it is hereby ORDERED as follows: (1) Oklahoma Firefighters' motion will be granted in a separate Order, (2) oral argument on February 1, 2019 is POSTPONED, and (3) the request to dispense with the requirement for the parties to meet and confer about any opposition to the outstanding motions is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that by January 29, 2019, the parties shall serve a Joint Stipulation with their proposed schedule. See C.A. No. 18-14385, Doc. No. 11. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/7/19. (Schneider, Joel)
January 4, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from James E. Cecchi to the Hon. Noel L. Hillman, U.S.D.J. and the Hon. Joel Schneider, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER -- As to C.A. Nos. 18-14385, 15694 and 16476, the Court having received the January 2, 2019 letter from counsel for Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, it is hereby ORDERED that by close of business on January 4, 2019, counsel for Ironworkers Locals 40, 361 and 417 Union Security Funds shall advise the Court if they agree that Oklahoma Firefighters' motions are unopposed and that they should be granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/3/19. (Schneider, Joel)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from James E. Cecchi to the Hon. Joel Schneider, U.S.M.J.. (CECCHI, JAMES)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER -- As to C.A. Nos. 18-14385, 15694 and 16476, it is hereby ORDERED oral argument on the motions to appoint lead counsel, liaison counsel, lead plaintiff and approval of selection of counsel, and the motion to consolidate, will take place in Courtroom 3C on Friday February 1, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. It is further ORDERED that by no later than January 25, 2019, counsel in these three (3) matters shall meet and confer in person or by phone to determine if there is opposition to any of the filed motions and shall so advise the Court. If there is no opposition the Court will consider holding oral argument by phone instead of in-person. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/2/19.
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending time for Defendant's to answer the complaint until after the Court appoints a lead Plaintiff and lead Counsel and the lead plaintiff serves a consolidated amended complaint or designates a complaint as the operative complaint, etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 12/14/2018. (rtm, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, (with Proposed Order) by All Defendants. (MINTZ, ROBERT)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAMPBELL SOUP COMPANY. (MINTZ, ROBERT)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT A. MINTZ on behalf of All Defendants (MINTZ, ROBERT)
November 29, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CAMPBELL SOUP COMPANY, ANTHONY P. DISILVESTRO, DENISE M. MORRISON. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
November 27, 2018 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHARLES W. CLAYTON. (ROSEN, LAURENCE)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by CHARLES W. CLAYTON as to CAMPBELL SOUP COMPANY, ANTHONY P. DISILVESTRO, DENISE M. MORRISON. (ROSEN, LAURENCE)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAMPBELL SOUP COMPANY, ANTHONY P. DISILVESTRO, DENISE M. MORRISON ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9196859) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CHARLES W. CLAYTON. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ROSEN, LAURENCE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLAYTON v. CAMPBELL SOUP COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMPBELL SOUP COMPANY
Represented By: ROBERT A. MINTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENISE M. MORRISON
Represented By: ROBERT A. MINTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY P. DISILVESTRO
Represented By: ROBERT A. MINTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES W. CLAYTON
Represented By: LAURENCE M. ROSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?