BALTER v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: RICHARD BALTER
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2018cv16681
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jerome B Simandle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by RICHARD BALTER re #2 First MOTION to Dismiss Motion under 18 U.S.C. 2255 (tf, )
December 28, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #2 First MOTION to Dismiss Motion under 18 U.S.C. 2255. Motion set for 1/22/2019 before Judge Jerome B. Simandle. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 First MOTION to Dismiss Motion under 18 U.S.C. 2255 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (GROSS, NORMAN)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 93-536, filed by RICHARD BALTER. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Motion, #2 Envelope)(ssp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BALTER v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: NORMAN JOEL GROSS
Represented By: MATTHEW J. SKAHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RICHARD BALTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?