MORAN v. BOATU.S. MARINE INSURANCE et al
Plaintiff: PETER V MORAN, JR. and PETER V. MORAN, JR.
Defendant: NATIONAL LIABILITY & FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, BoatU.S., Boat America Corporation, BOATU.S. MARINE INSURANCE, JOHN DOES (1-10) and ABC BUSINESS ENTITIES (1-10)
Case Number: 1:2018cv16730
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Robert B Kugler
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Initial Conference set for 3/5/2019 10:00 AM in Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/23/2019. (rss, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by BOAT AMERICA CORPORATION, BOATU.S. MARINE INSURANCE, NATIONAL LIABILITY & FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.(STERN, MICHAEL)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by PETER V. MORAN, JR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Amended, #2 Exhibit)(GRUENEBERG, RUDI)
December 3, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Cause of Action,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BOAT AMERICA CORPORATION, BOATU.S. MARINE INSURANCE, NATIONAL LIABILITY & FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
November 30, 2018 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (bf, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9209495) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PETER V MORAN, JR.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(GRUENEBERG, RUDI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MORAN v. BOATU.S. MARINE INSURANCE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL LIABILITY & FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: MICHAEL E. STERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BoatU.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boat America Corporation
Represented By: MICHAEL E. STERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOATU.S. MARINE INSURANCE
Represented By: MICHAEL E. STERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC BUSINESS ENTITIES (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER V MORAN, JR.
Represented By: RUDI GRUENEBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER V. MORAN, JR.
Represented By: RUDI GRUENEBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?