CINTRON v. COMPLETECARE et al
Plaintiff: MARISELA CINTRON
Defendant: JOHN DOES (1-100), COMPLETECARE DENTAL PROFESSIONALS, COMPLETECARE HEALTH NJ, COMPLETECARE HEALTH NETWORK, COMPLETECARE, ABC INC.(S) (1-100), JANE DOE(S) (1-100) and JOHN DOE(S) (1-100)
Case Number: 1:2019cv00235
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph H Rodriguez
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Initial Conference held on 2/13/2019. (se, )
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 4/12/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 2/13/2019. (dmr)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the TIME of the Initial Conference set for 2/13/2019 has been changed 12:00 PM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/9/2019. (se, )
January 9, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ssp, )
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Initial Conference set for 2/13/2019 02:00 PM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/9/19. (ssp, )
January 9, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ssp, )
January 8, 2019 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COMPLETECARE HEALTH NJ, COMPLETECARE, COMPLETECARE HEALTH NETWORK, COMPLETECARE DENTAL PROFESSIONALS from NEW JERSEY SUPERIOR COURT, LAW DIVISION, GLOUCESTER COUNTY, case number GLO-L-1058-18., filed by COMPLETECARE HEALTH NJ, COMPLETECARE, COMPLETECARE HEALTH NETWORK, COMPLETECARE DENTAL PROFESSIONALS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service)(PASCAL, ELIZABETH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CINTRON v. COMPLETECARE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARISELA CINTRON
Represented By: MICHAEL J. GLASSMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES (1-100)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMPLETECARE DENTAL PROFESSIONALS
Represented By: ELIZABETH ANN PASCAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMPLETECARE HEALTH NJ
Represented By: ELIZABETH ANN PASCAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMPLETECARE HEALTH NETWORK
Represented By: ELIZABETH ANN PASCAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMPLETECARE
Represented By: ELIZABETH ANN PASCAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC INC.(S) (1-100)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE(S) (1-100)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE(S) (1-100)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?