NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION et al v. SL INDUSTRIES, INC. et al

Plaintiff: THE ADMINISTRATOR OF THE NEW JERSEY SPILL COMPENSATION FUND, THE COMMISSIONER OF THE NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION and NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION
Defendant: "ABC CORPORATIONS" 1-10, "JOHN DOES" 1 THROUGH 10 and SL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00277
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
0 Judge: Robert B Kugler
1 Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (dmr)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Camden County Hall of Justice 101 South Fifth Street Camden, NJ 08103 State No: CAM L 4572 18. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (dmr)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #5 Motion to Withdraw Notice of Removal; ORDERED that this matter is remanded to the New Jersey Superior Court Camden County Vicinage Law Division; ORDERED that Defendant's #4 Motion to Dismiss is withdrawn as moot. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 2/25/2019. (dmr)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER Due to a scheduling conflict, the Court hereby reschedules the in-person Initial Conference previously set for February 28, 2019. The new date adn time of the in-person Initial conference is March 14, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. in Room 2040 - Camden. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 2/13/19. (nar)
January 24, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Withdraw #1 Notice of Removal, . Motion set for 2/19/2019 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Withdraw #1 Notice of Removal, by SL INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(MCGAHREN, JOHN)
January 17, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 2/19/2019 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by SL INDUSTRIES, INC.. Responses due by 2/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of Stephanie R. Feingold, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 2, continued, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Brief)(FEINGOLD, STEPHANIE)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE REBECCA FEINGOLD on behalf of SL INDUSTRIES, INC. (FEINGOLD, STEPHANIE)
January 9, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (cry, )
January 9, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Initial Conference set for 2/28/2019 09:30 AM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 1/9/2019. (cry, )
January 9, 2019 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SL Industries, Inc. from Camden County Superior Court, case number CAM-L-4572-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9293307), filed by SL Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(MCGAHREN, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION et al v. SL INDUSTRIES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "ABC CORPORATIONS" 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "JOHN DOES" 1 THROUGH 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JOHN MCGAHREN
Represented By: STEPHANIE REBECCA FEINGOLD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE ADMINISTRATOR OF THE NEW JERSEY SPILL COMPENSATION FUND
Represented By: LOUIS G. KARAGIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE COMMISSIONER OF THE NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION
Represented By: LOUIS G. KARAGIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION
Represented By: LOUIS G. KARAGIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?