VISCONTI v. TRANS UNION, LLC et al
Plaintiff: PAULA VISCONTI
Defendant: CELTIC BANK CORP., CHASE BANK (USA), N.A., EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICE LLC, WORLD GLOBAL CAPITAL, LLC, CAPITAL ONE BANK (U.S.A.), N.A., DISCOVER BANK N.A., EXPERIAN INFORMATION SERVICES LLC, TRANS UNION LLC, KABBAGE, INC, Intersections, Inc., BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, CITI CORP., DISCOVER CAPITAL ONE, CHASE BANK, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, TRANS UNION, LLC, INTERSECTIONS INC., KABBAGE INC., BANK OF AMERICA, CITI CORP and EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00581
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER ORDERED that the Order Administratively Terminating Action #17 be, and the same hereby is, VACATED. So Ordered by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 3/12/2019. (gn)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement.( Administrative Termination deadline set for 5/10/2019). Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 3/8/2019. (tf, )
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting Defendant's #15 letter request for an additional 2 week extension up to 3/21/2019 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 3/8/2019. (rss, )
March 7, 2019 Filing 15 Letter from Defendant, Citibank, N.A.. (REILEY, WILLIAM)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that deadline for Citibank to answer, move, or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint is extended to March 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 2/25/2019. (tf, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM PATRICK REILEY on behalf of CITI CORP (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(REILEY, WILLIAM)
February 21, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Defendant, Citibank, N.A.. (REILEY, WILLIAM)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHASE BANK. CHASE BANK waiver sent on 2/6/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (SCHOENFELD, ALAN)
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHASE BANK identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co. as Corporate Parent.. (SCHOENFELD, ALAN)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ALAN E. SCHOENFELD on behalf of CHASE BANK (SCHOENFELD, ALAN)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW MICHELE CAROBUS on behalf of CITI CORP (CAROBUS, ANDREW)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW MICHELE CAROBUS on behalf of DISCOVER CAPITAL ONE (CAROBUS, ANDREW)
February 8, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CITI CORP has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/21/2019. (tf, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Citi Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(MCKENNA, DANIEL)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J.T. MCKENNA on behalf of CITI CORP (MCKENNA, DANIEL)
February 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 3/4/2019 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by DISCOVER CAPITAL ONE. Responses due by 2/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Certificate of Service)(MCKENNA, DANIEL)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J.T. MCKENNA on behalf of DISCOVER CAPITAL ONE (MCKENNA, DANIEL)
January 17, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Nature of Suit,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BANK OF AMERICA, CAPITAL ONE BANK (U.S.A.), N.A., CELTIC BANK CORP., CHASE BANK, CITI CORP, DISCOVER CAPITAL ONE, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, INTERSECTIONS INC., KABBAGE INC., TRANS UNION, LLC, WORLD GLOBAL CAPITAL, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
January 16, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9312844) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PAULA VISCONTI. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(WARREN, BRUCE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VISCONTI v. TRANS UNION, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CELTIC BANK CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHASE BANK (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WORLD GLOBAL CAPITAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE BANK (U.S.A.), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISCOVER BANK N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANS UNION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KABBAGE, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intersections, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITI CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISCOVER CAPITAL ONE
Represented By: ANDREW MICHELE CAROBUS
Represented By: DANIEL J.T. MCKENNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHASE BANK
Represented By: ALAN E. SCHOENFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANS UNION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERSECTIONS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KABBAGE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITI CORP
Represented By: ANDREW MICHELE CAROBUS
Represented By: WILLIAM PATRICK REILEY
Represented By: DANIEL J.T. MCKENNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAULA VISCONTI
Represented By: BRUCE K. WARREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?