HELLER v. NEW PENN MOTOR EXPRESS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: WILLIAM HELLER
Defendant: NEW PENN MOTOR EXPRESS, INC., YRC WORLDWIDE, INC., NATE HERBER, WAYNE SCHWANKE, ABC CORPORATIONS (fictitious names describing presently unidentified business entities), JOHN DOES (fictitious names describing presently unidentified business individuals), ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5 and JOHN DOES 1-5
Case Number: 1:2019cv05669
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: In-Person Initial Conference held on 3/21/2019. (nar)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Settlement Conference set for 4/15/2019 01:30 PM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 3/21/2019. (rtm, )
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER The parties shall submit a Joint Discovery Plan to the Court no later than the time period provided for in L.Civ.R. 26.1(b)(2). The form to be used for the Joint Discovery Plan can be retrieved from: http://www.njd.uscourts.gov/sites/njd/files/R16DiscoveryPlanCamONLY.pdf. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 3/19/19. (nar)
March 13, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - the Order Scheduling the Initial Conference #3 for 3/21/2019 at 11:00 A.M. in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams remains in effect. Please disregard document #7 . (rtm, )
March 12, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the Order Initial Scheduling Conference attached to docket entry #7 filed by the Clerk's office on 3/8/2019 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (rtm, )
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Initial Conference set for 4/4/2019 11:30 AM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 3/8/2019. (rtm, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by NATE HERBER, NEW PENN MOTOR EXPRESS, INC., WAYNE SCHWANKE, YRC WORLDWIDE, INC..(JOHNSON, TERRY)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEW PENN MOTOR EXPRESS, INC., YRC WORLDWIDE, INC. identifying YRCW as Corporate Parent.. (GOODMAN, JAKE)
March 4, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (dmw)
February 19, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by WAYNE SCHWANKE, WILLIAM HELLER, YRC WORLDWIDE, INC., NEW PENN MOTOR EXPRESS, INC., NATE HERBER has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/6/2019. (rtm, )
February 18, 2019 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (GOODMAN, JAKE)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 3/21/2019 11:00 AM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 2/4/2019. (ssp, )
February 13, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JAKE F. GOODMAN on behalf of NATE HERBER, NEW PENN MOTOR EXPRESS, INC., WAYNE SCHWANKE, YRC WORLDWIDE, INC. (GOODMAN, JAKE)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WAYNE SCHWANKE, YRC WORLDWIDE, INC., NEW PENN MOTOR EXPRESS, INC., NATE HERBER from Superior Court of New Jersey, case number L-000047-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9414606), filed by WAYNE SCHWANKE, YRC WORLDWIDE, INC., NEW PENN MOTOR EXPRESS, INC., NATE HERBER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(JOHNSON, TERRY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HELLER v. NEW PENN MOTOR EXPRESS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW PENN MOTOR EXPRESS, INC.
Represented By: JAKE F. GOODMAN
Represented By: TERRY DAVON JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC WORLDWIDE, INC.
Represented By: JAKE F. GOODMAN
Represented By: TERRY DAVON JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATE HERBER
Represented By: JAKE F. GOODMAN
Represented By: TERRY DAVON JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAYNE SCHWANKE
Represented By: JAKE F. GOODMAN
Represented By: TERRY DAVON JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS (fictitious names describing presently unidentified business entities)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES (fictitious names describing presently unidentified business individuals)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM HELLER
Represented By: MATTHEW A. LUBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?