STANWYCK GLEN FARMS, LLC et al v. WILMINGTON TRUST OF PENNSYLVANIA et al
Plaintiff: STANWYCK GLEN FARMS, LLC, THOMAS E. MORELLO and DENISE G. MORELLO
Defendant: GEOSTAR CORPORATION, ClassicStar, LLC, TONY FERGUSON, S. DAVID PLUMMER, WILMINGTON TRUST FSB, NATIONAL EQUINE LENDING COMPANY, LLC, WILMINGTON TRUST OF PENNSYLVANIA, HANDLER, THAYER, DUGGAN, LLC., WILMINGTON TRUST CORPORATION, DAVID S. FORMAN, PRIVATE CONSULTING GROUP, INC., GEOSTAR FINANCIAL SERVICES CORPORATION and SPENCER PLUMMER
Case Number: 1:2019cv05924
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (rss, )
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER Dismissing case; Directing Clerk to close this case, etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/13/2019. (rss, )
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 TEXT ORDER: In light of Plaintiffs' letter [D.I. 196], the telephone conference on 3/7/2019 shall be, and is hereby, adjourned without date. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 3/4/2019. (slc)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 TEXT ORDER The Court has reviewed #196 letter from Plaintiffs' counsel requesting an order of dismissal because Plaintiffs state they do not wish to pursue their claims against any of the remaining defendants. In light of Plaintiffs' representation in the letter that there are answering Defendants who have not settled, the Court declines to issue the requested Order. Plaintiffs shall kindly file an appropriate stipulation of dismissal. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 02/28/2019. (Costigan, Roberta)
February 27, 2019 Filing 196 Letter from Joseph M. Garemore. (GAREMORE, JOSEPH)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 3/7/2019 at 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the telephone call and shall advise all parties of the conference. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 2/21/2019. (slc)
February 15, 2019 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 194 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Eastern; Case Number 5:09-cv-00015. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 4, 2019 Filing 193 INCORRECTLY FILED NOTICE by John Goyak and Associates, Incorporated, Jupiter Ranches, LLC Notice of Withdrawing [Dkt] 2652 Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Schonfeld, Richard) Modified on 2/5/2019 (STC).
February 4, 2019 Filing 192 INCORRECTLY FILED NOTICE by Dana Goyak, John Goyak, John Goyak and Associates, Incorporated, Jupiter Ranches, LLC Notice of Designation of Contents of The Record to Be Remanded in The Event of A Remand Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Schonfeld, Richard) Modified on 2/5/2019 (STC).
February 4, 2019 Filing 191 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER FINALIZED re (2642 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 189 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) Suggestion of Remand, (2641 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 299 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH) Suggestion of Remand. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(STC)cc: COR
January 30, 2019 Filing 190 INCORRECTLY FILED NOTICE by Jupiter Ranches, LLC Notice of Opposition to Conditional Remand Order Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Schonfeld, Richard) Modified on 1/30/2019 (STC).
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER/SUGGESTION OF REMAND: Court suggests that this action be remanded to the transferor district court. Consolidated pretrial proceedings, including facilitation of discovery, are concluded in this action, and the case is ready for return to the transferor district for remaining proceedings and trial. The parties shall furnish, within fourteen (14) days of this Order, a designation of the contents of the record to be remanded. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 1/19/2019.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(STC)cc: COR,MDL
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER: The Court, on its own motion, and to reflect the current status, rescinds the referrals to the undersigned on all referred civil cases. The presiding District Judge may enter a substitute referral, or issue other appropriate Orders, in his or her discretion. The Clerk shall docket this Order in all appropriate cases. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 6/13/2018.(JJ)cc: COR
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting (2606) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (2607) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (2611) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason W. Crowell and Gloria S. Hong terminated in case 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW; granting (256) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (257) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (259) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason W. Crowell and Gloria S. Hong terminated in case 5:07-cv-00349-JMH-REW; granting (291) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (292) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (294) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason W. Crowell and Gloria S. Hong terminated in case 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW; granting (484) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (485) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (486) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason W. Crowell and Gloria S. Hong terminated in case 5:08-cv-00053-JMH-REW; granting (238) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.(239) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (240) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason W. Crowell and Gloria S. Hong terminated in case 5:08-cv-00321-JMH-REW; granting (184) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason W. Crowell and Gloria S. Hong terminated; (185) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (186) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason W. Crowell and Gloria S. Hong terminated in case 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW; granting (160) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (161) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (163) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason W. Crowell and Gloria S. Hong terminated in case 5:09-cv-00167-JMH-REW. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 10/10/2017. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(STC)cc: COR
March 23, 2015 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (486 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH-REW, 259 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH-REW, 240 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH-REW, 163 in 5:09-cv-00167-JMH-REW, 186 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW, 2611 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 294 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(STC)
March 20, 2015 Filing 186 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Declaration)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Crowell, Jason)
October 14, 2014 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (485 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH-REW, 239 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH-REW, 2607 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 292 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW, 185 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW, 161 in 5:09-cv-00167-JMH-REW, 257 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH-REW) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Spencer Plummer, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Zeus Investments, LLC Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(STC)
October 13, 2014 Filing 185 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Spencer Plummer, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Zeus Investments, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Jason W. Crowell)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Crowell, Jason)
October 8, 2014 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (2606 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 184 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW, 291 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW, 256 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH-REW, 160 in 5:09-cv-00167-JMH-REW, 238 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH-REW, 484 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH-REW) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by S. David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, David Plummer, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Zeus Investments, LLC and Substitution as Counsel Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(STC)
October 7, 2014 Filing 184 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by S. David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, David Plummer, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Zeus Investments, LLC and Substitution as Counsel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Crowell, Jason)
April 29, 2014 Filing 183 INCORRECTLY FILED NOTICE OF FILING by Arbor Farms, LLC, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC re (2581 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) Sealed Document,, Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Webb, Robert) Modified on 4/30/2014 (STC).
April 29, 2014 Filing 182 INCORRECTLY FILED SEALED DOCUMENT Sealed pursuant to PROTECTIVE ORDER re (1029 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 1029 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 376 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH-REW, 376 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH-REW) Protective Order, Terminate Motions by Arbor Farms, LLC, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant Geostar's Motion to Withdrawl)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al. (Webb, Robert) Modified on 4/30/2014 (STC).
April 29, 2014 Filing 181 INCORRECTLY FILED RESPONSE in Opposition re (858 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH-REW, 2571 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) SECOND MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by GeoStar Corporation filed by Arbor Farms, LLC, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Webb, Robert) Modified on 4/30/2014 (STC).
January 15, 2014 Filing 180 INCORRECTLY FILED RESPONSE in Opposition re (851 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH-REW) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by GeoStar Corporation filed by Arbor Farms, LLC, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Webb, Robert) Modified on 1/16/2014 (STC).
January 13, 2014 Filing 179 INCORRECTLY FILED NOTICE to Take Deposition of GeoStar Corporation on 02/13/14 9:00 a.m. by Arbor Farms, LLC, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Webb, Robert) Modified on 1/14/2014 (STC).
September 6, 2013 Filing 178 INCORRECTLY FILED NOTICE by Arbor Farms, LLC, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC Notice of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoenas)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Webb, Robert) Modified on 9/6/2013 (STC).
September 4, 2013 Filing 177 NOTICE OF FILING by S. David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, David Plummer, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, Inc., Strategic Opportunity Solutions, S. David Plummer, II, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Zeus Investments, LLC, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown) re (152 in 5:09-cv-00167-JMH-REW) Notice, (Attachments: #1 Appendix Corrected Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Crowell, Jason)
September 3, 2013 Filing 176 NOTICE of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel by S. David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, S. David Plummer, II, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Zeus Investments, LLC, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown) Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Crowell, Jason) Modified on 9/4/2013 (STC).
April 27, 2012 Filing 175 INCORRECTLY FILED NOTICE by Sandra N Tillotson Family Trust, Sandra N Tillotson Notice of Removal from Service List Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Denney, Nathan) Modified on 4/27/2012 (STB).
April 4, 2012 Filing 174 JUDGMENT: 1) Plas entered into agreements w ClassicStar. 2) 1/12/2009, action was transferred to the above-captioned Court and made part of this MDL. 3) Plas and ClassicStar have agreed to resolve all disputes btwn them. 4) Plas have filed proof of claim no 48 in ClassicStar's title 11 proceeding pending in US Bankruptcy Court. 5) Judgment is GRANTED to Plas against ClassicStar, a) in the amt of $320,000 which shall take solely the form of the Amended Proof of Claim. 6) All claims and causes asserted in this action by Plas against ClassicStar are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/4/2012.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW(SCD)cc: COR,MDL
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER: 1) All claims asserted by Plas against Dfts Wilmington Trust of PA, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation, GeoStar Corporation, GeoStar Financial Services Corporation, and Tony Ferguson are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own costs. 2) Those motions seeking relief in this matter and filed by the above-referenced Dfts and otherwise requesting relief against these Dfts by Plas (DE #76 , #130 . #132 , and #151 ) are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/4/2012.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW(SCD)cc: COR,MDL
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) Plas' Motion for Sanctions and the Motion to Join that Motion for Sanctions are GRANTED as set forth below. 2) That GeoStar Corporation is precluded from disputing the authenticity of documents appearing to have been created or received by GeoStar or its agents. 3) That the testimony offered by GeoStar Corporation's designee may be used by any party only insofar as it contains admissions against GeoStar itself and as offered against GeoStar. 4) GeoStar Corporation is estopped from denying the assertions set forth by Plas and other parties to this motion in paragraphs (a) through (s) of Pla's Memo in Support of its Motion for Sanctions and paragraphs (1) through (13) in the Memo in Support of the Joinder in Plas' Motion. 5) Motions as filed in 09-cv-15 (DE #76 and #78 ) are DENIED AS MOOT. 6) Plummer parties' Motion is STRICKEN from 09-cv-167 (DE #14 ) as it appears that the parties did not intend to file the motion in that individual case. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/4/2012.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(SCD)cc: COR
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: It is ordered that the ( 1065 in 5:07-cv-353) Motion of Defendants S. David Plummer and Spencer D. Plummer III to Compel Production of Audit Report is DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/4/2012.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(SCD)cc: COR
March 14, 2012 Filing 170 INCORRECTLY FILED NOTICE OF FILING REMOVAL by Sandra N Tillotson Family Trust, Sandra N Tillotson Notice of Removal from Service List Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Denney, Nathan) Modified on 3/15/2012 (STB).
February 2, 2012 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (169 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH -REW, 2403 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Stipulated Judgment by Denise G. Morello, Thomas E. Morello, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, James D. Lyon, (129 in 5:09-cv-00167-JMH -REW, 2404 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH -REW, 5:09-cv-00167-JMH -REW(STB)
February 1, 2012 Filing 169 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Stipulated Judgment by Denise G. Morello, Thomas E. Morello, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, James D. Lyon. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH -REW(Forte, Earl)
January 3, 2012 Filing 168 NOTICE by Arkoma Basin Development, Inc., Associated Geophysical Services, Inc., BNG Producing & Drilling, Brookstone Development, Ltd., CBM Resources Pty, Ltd., Cadillac Farms, Inc., ClassicStar 2004, LLC, ClassicStar Farms, Inc., ClassicStar Thoroughbreds of Kentucky, LLC, ClassicStar Thoroughbreds, LLC, Conquest Exploration, Inc., Conquest Group Operating Company, Tony P. Ferguson, First Source Bossier, L.L.C., First Source Texas, Inc., First Source Wyoming, Inc., First Texas Gas, LP, GeoStar Corporation, GeoStar Financial Services Corporation, Geostar Equine Energy, Inc., Geostar Financial Corporation, Geostar Leasing Corporation, Frederick J. Lambert, Thomas E. Robinson, Royalty Acquisition Company, Boyce J. Sanderson, Squaw Creek Development, Inc., Squaw Creek, Inc., Tartan Business, L.C., West Virginia Development, Inc., West Virginia Gas Corporation Notice of Change of Law Firm Name Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW et al.(Johnson, Brian)
November 1, 2011 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (2334 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 211 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH -REW) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Dismissal,,, (2335 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 250 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH -REW) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Dismissal, (160 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH -REW, 2333 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Dismissal, (167 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH -REW, 2332 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Dismissal, (300 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH -REW, 2331 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Dismissal, Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW et al.(STB)
October 31, 2011 Filing 167 PROPOSED AGREED ORDER/STIPULATION of Dismissal by Tony Ferguson, GeoStar Corporation, Denise G. Morello, Thomas E. Morello, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, GeoStar Financial Services Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH -REW(Johnson, Brian) Modified on 11/1/2011 (STB).
May 16, 2011 Filing 166 INCORRECTLY FILED SEALED DOCUMENT Sealed pursuant to PROTECTIVE ORDER re (353 in 5:09-cv-00215-JMH -REW, 271 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH -REW, 2186 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 703 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH -REW) RESPONSE, (1029 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 1029 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 376 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH -REW, 376 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH -REW) Protective Order, Terminate Motions by James D. Lyon (Attachments: #1 Tax Records Submissions By Defendants (Continuation 2), #2 Tax Records Submissions By Defendants (Continuation 3))Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW et al. (Forte, Earl) Modified on 5/17/2011 (SCD).
May 2, 2011 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (2177 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 165 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW) Stipulation and Consent Order Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW(STB)
April 29, 2011 Filing 165 STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER by Denise G. Morello, Thomas E. Morello, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Wilmington Trust Corporation, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW(Klehr, Benjamin)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER: (1) Motions in 06-cv-243 DENIED AS MOOT: DE 326, 386, 389, 447, 451, 475, 476, 477, 478, 494, 497, 508, 510, 511, 531, 534, 552, 578, 579, 580, 581, 593, and 594; (2) motions in 07-cv-347 DENIED AS MOOT: DE 143, 144, 175, 194,198, 222, 231, 237; (3) motions in 07-cv-353 DENIED AS MOOT: DE 877, 1058, 1063, 1069, 1072, 1213, 1268, 1320, 1425, 1453, 1480, 1488, 1603, 1613, 1686, 1687, 1688, 1689, 1690, 1691, 1692, 1693, 1708, 1739, 1751, 1766, 1769, 1777, 1783, 1785, 1786, 1831, 1836, 1837, 1858, 1859, 1860, 1861, 1892, 1895, 1899, 1909, 1936, 1937, 1972, 1979, 1980, 1982, 1983, 1984, 1985, 2000, 2015, 2016; (4) motions in 07-cv-419 DENIED AS MOOT: DE 173, 174, 189, 190, 191, 192, 203, and 204; (5) motions in 08-cv-53 DENIED AS MOOT: DE 290, 318, 324, 328, 359, 364, 381, and 421; (6) motions in 09-cv-79 DENIED AS MOOT: DE 61, 65, 126, 130, 132, 170, 171, 188, 189, 190, and 194; (7) motions in 09-cv-15 DENIED AS MOOT: DE 146; (8) motions in 09-cv-215 DENIED AS MOOT: DE 47, 104, 114, 151,154, 165, 182, 195, 221, 222, 223, 224, 225, 226, 238, 247, and 248. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 3/24/2011.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW et al.(STB)cc: COR,MDL
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Gastar's (269 in 5:09-cv-00215-JMH -REW, 162 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW, 2054 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW, 211 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH-REW, 608 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH-REW, 261 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH-REW, 449 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH-REW, 243 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH-REW) CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss GRANTED; All claims by any plt against Gastar Exploration Ltd., Gastar Exploration New South Wales, Inc., Gastar Exploration Power Pty, Ltd., Gastar Exploration Texas LLC, Gastar Exploration Texas, Inc., Gastar Exploration Texas, LP, Gastar Exploration USA, Inc. DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; plts & Gastar Dfts each bear own fees & costs; Until payments re settlement made, Court retains jurisdiction; Order does not address claims asserted against other dfts; all relief not granted herein is DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 12/17/2010.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW et al.(STB)cc: COR,MDL
December 17, 2010 Filing 162 CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss by Gastar Exploration Ltd., Gastar Exploration New South Wales, Inc., Gastar Exploration Power Pty, Ltd., Gastar Exploration Texas LLC, Gastar Exploration Texas, Inc., Gastar Exploration Texas, LP, Gastar Exploration USA, Inc., Gastar Exploration Victoria, Inc. with prejudice pursuant to settlement (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH -REW et al.(Powers, Jason)
October 4, 2010 Filing 161 INCORRECTLY FILED NOTICE by Beechglen Farms, John Hales, Dumar Horses, L.C. of Withdrawal Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Kennedy, Ellen) Modified text on 10/5/2010 (STB).
June 29, 2010 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (146 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW, 1613 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) MOTION to Dismiss by Gastar Exploration Ltd. Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW(STB)
June 28, 2010 Filing 160 REPLY to (146 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW, 1613 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) in support of Gastar Exploration's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Gastar Exploration Ltd.. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW(Powers, Jason)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER: It is ordered 1) Motions for leave to submit pleadings which exceed the page limits and motions to file under seal (DE 479 , 481 in case 5:06-cv-00243-JMH-REW; DE 1653 , 1685 , 1694 , 1697 , 1700 , 1706 in case 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW; DE 223 in case 5:07-cv-00347-JMH-REW; DE 360 , 362 in case 5:08-cv-00053-JMH-REW; DE #172 in case 5:08-cv-00079-JMH-REW; DE #141 in case 5:08-cv-00496-JMH-REW; DE #154 in case 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW; DE #140 in case 5:09-cv-00215-JMH-REW) are GRANTED. 2) Clerk shall file those pleadings tendered by these parties which are subject to this order in the records of these matters and said filings shall be made under seal, if so requested. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 5/21/2010. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(SCD)cc: COR,MDL
June 21, 2010 Filing 158 INCORRECTLY FILED DEMAND for Trial by Jury by James D. Lyon. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW et al.(Goldman, Jonathan) Modified on 6/22/2010 (SCD).
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 157 AGREED ORDER EXTENDING CERTAIN DEADLINES: (1) Gastar to file reply re (146 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW, 1613 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) MOTION to Dismiss by Gastar Exploration Ltd. Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by 6/28/2010; (2) Plts' deadline to respond to Gastar's First RPOD and First set of INT extended to 6/28/2010. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/15/2010.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW(STB)cc: COR,MDL
June 9, 2010 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (156 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW, 1680 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) PROPOSED AGREED ORDER for Extension of Time by Gastar Exploration Ltd., Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC by Agreed Order to Extend Deadlines for Defendants' Reply in support of motion to dismiss and Plaintiffs' Discovery Responses Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW(STB)
June 8, 2010 Filing 156 PROPOSED AGREED ORDER for Extension of Time by Gastar Exploration Ltd., Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC by Agreed Order to Extend Deadlines for Defendants' Reply in support of motion to dismiss and Plaintiffs' Discovery Responses Motions referred to Robert E. Wier. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW(Powers, Jason) Modified text on 6/9/2010 (STB).
May 24, 2010 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (1655 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 66 in 5:08-cv-00418-JMH-REW) MOTION for Order by C. Edward Cunningham to Permit Counsel to Appear by Telephone or Excuse Appearance at 06/07/10 Status Conference, (1604 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 151 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH-REW) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Count 1 of the First Amended Complaint by AA-J Breeding, LLC, (154 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW, 1653 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Denise G. Morello, Thomas E. Morello, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, (1658 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 165 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH-REW) MOTION for Leave to File by AA-J Breeding, LLC to Supplement the Affidavit of Joseph Fleishon Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:08-cv-00079-JMH-REW, 5:08-cv-00418-JMH-REW, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW(STB)
May 21, 2010 Filing 155 NOTICE OF FILING by Denise G. Morello, Thomas E. Morello, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC re (154 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW, 1653 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Denise G. Morello, Thomas E. Morello, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC (Attachments: #1 Corrected Declaration, #2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW(Defeo, Stephen)
May 20, 2010 Filing 154 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Denise G. Morello, Thomas E. Morello, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC Motions referred to Robert E. Wier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Memo of Law in Opposition to Gastar's Motion to Dismiss, #4 Declaration of Joseph Garemore, #5 Ex A to Declaration, #6 Ex B to Declaration, #7 Ex C to Declaration, #8 Ex D to Declaration, #9 Ex E to Declaration, #10 Ex F to Declaration, #11 Ex G to Declaration, #12 Ex H to Declaration, #13 Ex I to Declaration, #14 Ex J to Declaration, #15 Ex K to Declaration, #16 Certificate of Service re Memo of Law, et al.)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW(Defeo, Stephen)
May 17, 2010 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (153 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW, 1648 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 223 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH-REW) Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel, (1649 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 160 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH-REW) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation, Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:07-cv-00349-JMH-REW, 5:08-cv-00079-JMH-REW, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW(STB)
May 14, 2010 Filing 153 NOTICE by David S. Forman of Withdrawal of Counsel Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-REW, 5:07-cv-00349-JMH-REW, 5:07-cv-00352-JMH-REW, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH-REW(Perlman, Pamela)
May 12, 2010 NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Magistrate Judge James B Todd is no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert E. Wier for all further proceedings pursuant to General Order No. 10-08. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT et al.(STB)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER re (146 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1613 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT) MOTION to Dismiss by Gastar Exploration Ltd. Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Gastar Exploration Ltd., Plts Responses due by 5/20/2010, Replies due by 6/15/2010. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 5/7/2010.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(STB)cc: COR,MDL
April 20, 2010 Filing 151 MOTION to Compel by Wilmington Trust Corporation, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania David S. Forman to Comply with His Discovery Obligations Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit "A" Req Prod of Docs, #3 Exhibit "B" 3/9/10 email to S. Forman, #4 Exhibit "C" 3/10/10 Ltr to S. Forman, #5 Exhibit "D" 3/17/10 Fax to B. Klehr, #6 Exhibit "E" 3/17/10 Ltr to S. Forman, #7 Exhibit "F" 4/5/10 Ltr to Magistrate Judge Todd, #8 Proposed Order, #9 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Klehr, Benjamin) Modified text on 4/21/2010 (STB).
April 19, 2010 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (132 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1545 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT) MOTION to Dismiss by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(STB)
April 19, 2010 Filing 150 REPLY to Response to Motion re (1545 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 132 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION to Dismiss by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), filed by Wilmington Trust Corporation, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Filed pursuant to QC of 1619 )Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(STB)
April 16, 2010 Filing 149 INCORRECTLY FILED RESPONSE in Support re (132 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION to Dismiss by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Wilmington Trust Corporation, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Certifice of Service)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Freed, Eric) Modified on 4/19/2010 (STB).
April 14, 2010 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (147 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1616 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation, Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(STB)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 4/13/2010 before Magistrate Judge James B Todd: Should dft Foreman fail to provide discovery responses by 4/15/2010, Dft Wilmington Trust may file MOtion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B Todd on 4/13/2010. (Court Reporter None.) Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Todd. (STB)cc: COR,MDL
April 13, 2010 Filing 147 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by Denise G. Morello, Thomas E. Morello, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Gastar Exploration Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Garemore, Joseph)
April 5, 2010 Filing 146 MOTION to Dismiss by Gastar Exploration Ltd. Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of J. Russell Porter, #3 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Powers, Jason)
April 1, 2010 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (145 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1602 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD)
March 31, 2010 Filing 145 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Denise G. Morello, Thomas E. Morello, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Wilmington Trust Corporation, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Freed, Eric)
March 29, 2010 Filing 144 RESPONSE in Opposition re ( 1545 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, #132 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation filed by Denise G. Morello, Thomas E. Morello, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD) (Filed pursuant to 1599 Order in 5:07-cv-353)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER: It is ordered that the 1594 in 07-cv-353 and #140 in 09-cv-15 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits of Local Rule 7.1(d) is GRANTED. The tendered brief is accepted. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 3/29/2010. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD)cc: COR,MDL
March 29, 2010 Filing 142 INCORRECTLY FILED INITIAL DISCLOSURES by James D. Lyon.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT et al.(Forte, Earl) Modified on 3/30/2010 (SCD).
March 24, 2010 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (1539 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 130 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION to Dismiss by GeoStar Corporation, GeoStar Financial Services Corporation, Tony Ferguson Motion for Partial Dismissal of Amended Complaint Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(STB)
March 23, 2010 Filing 141 REPLY to Response to Motion re (130 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1539 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT) MOTION to Dismiss by GeoStar Corporation, GeoStar Financial Services Corporation, Tony Ferguson filed by Tony Ferguson, GeoStar Corporation, GeoStar Financial Services Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Johnson, Brian)
March 22, 2010 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (146 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH-JBT, 1593 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT) REPLY,,, ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (1594 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 140 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION for Leave by Denise G. Morello, Thomas E. Morello, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC to Exceed Page Limits of Local Rule 7.1(d) Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 5:08-cv-00079-JMH-JBT, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(STB)
March 19, 2010 Filing 140 MOTION for Leave by Denise G. Morello, Thomas E. Morello, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC to Exceed Page Limits of Local Rule 7.1(d) Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave, #2 Certificate of Service re Motion for Leave, #3 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion for Dismissal by Wilmington Trust, #4 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss, #5 Certificate of Service re Memo of Law)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Defeo, Stephen)
March 11, 2010 Filing 139 RESPONSE in Opposition re (130 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1539 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT) MOTION to Dismiss by GeoStar Corporation, GeoStar Financial Services Corporation, Tony Ferguson filed by Denise G. Morello, Thomas E. Morello, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH-JBT, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Garemore, Joseph)
February 25, 2010 Filing 138 INCORRECTLY FILED NOTICE OF FILING by James Tracy, Shelli Tracy re (20 in 5:09-cv-00338-JMH) MOTION for Summary Judgment by James Tracy, Shelli Tracy in Connection with GeoStar's Breach of the Purchase Agreement and GeoStar's Counterclaim Regarding the Purchase Agreement, (1585 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION for Summary Judgment by James Tracy, Shelli Tracy (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Summary)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Oermann, David) Modified on 2/26/2010 (STB).
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (1545 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 132 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION to Dismiss by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). Time for Plts to respond extended to 3/19/2010. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 2/12/2010.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(STB)cc: COR,MDL Modified on 2/12/2010 (STB).
February 12, 2010 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (136 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1572 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation, Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(STB)
February 11, 2010 Filing 136 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello, Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Garemore, Joseph)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 135 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (130 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1539 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION to Dismiss by GeoStar Corporation, GeoStar Financial Services Corporation, Tony Ferguson filed by GeoStar Corporation, GeoStar Financial Services Corporation, Tony Ferguson: time for plt to file response extended to 3/11/2010. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 2/10/2010.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(STB)cc: COR,MDL
February 9, 2010 Filing 134 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Tony P. Ferguson, GeoStar Financial Financial Services Corp., Geo Star Corporation, GeoStar Financial Services Corporation, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello, Geostar Corp., GeoStar Corporation, Tony Ferguson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Garemore, Joseph)
February 2, 2010 Filing 133 DISCLOSURES Pursuant to Rule 26(A) by Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation, Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Klehr, Benjamin)
January 29, 2010 Filing 132 MOTION to Dismiss by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support to Motion of Defendants Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, and Wilmington Trust Corporation to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), #2 Exhibit "A" Part 1 of Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit "A" Part 2 of Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit "A" Part 3 of Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit "A" Part 4 of Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit "B" - Investment Agreement, #7 Exhibit "C" Part 1 of West Hills Farm Docket, #8 Exhibit "C" Part 2 of West Hills Farm Docket, #9 Exhibit "C" Part 3 of West Hills Farm Docket, #10 Exhibit "C" Part 4 of West Hills Farm Docket, #11 Proposed Order, #12 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Freed, Eric)
January 25, 2010 Filing 131 JOINT ANSWER to #129 Amended Complaint by S. David Plummer, Spencer Plummer. (Filed in Master File and refiled herein for case management purposes. Due to computer error, document did not spread)(STB)
January 22, 2010 Filing 130 MOTION to Dismiss by GeoStar Corporation, GeoStar Financial Services Corporation, Tony Ferguson Motion for Partial Dismissal of Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Johnson, Brian)
January 8, 2010 Filing 129 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ClassicStar, LLC, S. David Plummer, David S. Forman, GeoStar Corporation, Tony P. Ferguson, GeoStar Financial Services Corporation, National Equine Lending Company, LLC, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation, Gastar Exploration, Ltd., Spencer Plummer, Private Consulting Group, Inc., GeoStar Corporation, Tony Ferguson, Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, filed by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Part 2) (Ordered filed pursuant to 1504 ) Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(STB)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER: (1) Plt's (126 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1486 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION to Amend/Correct (1 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) Complaint, GRANTED; (2) Clerk shall FILE tendered Amended Complaint; (3) pending motions to dismiss (30 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 762 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION to Dismiss by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), (34 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 781 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION to Dismiss by David S. Forman, (87 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1114 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION to Dismiss by GeoStar Corporation, Tony Ferguson, DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 1/8/2010.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(STB)cc: COR,MDL
December 22, 2009 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (127 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1490 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD)
December 21, 2009 Filing 127 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Geo Star Corporation, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello, Tony Ferguson. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Defeo, Stephen)
December 17, 2009 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (126 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1486 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION to Amend/Correct (1 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) Complaint,, by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD)
December 16, 2009 Filing 126 MOTION to Amend/Correct (1 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) Complaint,, by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello with Consent of Answering Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 1 - Amended Complt, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Part 2 - Amended Complt continued, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Defeo, Stephen)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER: (1) MOTION for Joinder (114 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1288 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) is GRANTED; (2) MOTION to Strike Amended Complaint (1267 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 109 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) is GRANTED; (3) Clerk shall STRIKE TENDERED AMENDED COMPLAINT (108 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1262 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH); (4) Plts Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas Morello, & Denise G. Morello have 21 days to respond to Dft GeoStar & T. Ferguson's Mtn to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 12/1/2009. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 12/1/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(STB)cc: COR
November 3, 2009 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (124 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1426 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD)
November 2, 2009 Filing 124 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Geo Star Corporation, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello, Tony Ferguson, GeoStar Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Garemore, Joseph)
September 18, 2009 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (123 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1370 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Stipulation and Proposed Order. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD)
September 17, 2009 Filing 123 STIPULATION and Proposed Order re (87 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1114 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION to Dismiss by GeoStar Corporation, Tony Ferguson by GeoStar Corporation, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello, Tony Ferguson, GeoStar Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Garemore, Joseph) Modified to add text on 9/18/2009 (SCD).
September 15, 2009 Filing 122 NOTICE OF FILING by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation re (1356 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 121 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) Reply to Response to Motion,, to Strike Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(A) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Klehr, Benjamin)
September 15, 2009 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (1267 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 109 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION to Strike (108 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1262 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Amended Complaint. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD)
September 14, 2009 Filing 121 REPLY to Response to Motion re (1267 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 109 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION to Strike (108 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1262 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Amended Complaint filed by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1 Amended Complaint pages 1 - 39, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2 Amended Complaint pages 40 - 71)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD) (Filed pursuant to QC re: DE 1353 in 07-cv-353)
September 14, 2009 Filing 120 INCORRECTLY FILED RESPONSE in Support re (1267 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 109 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION to Strike (108 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1262 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Amended Complaint,, by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a) MOTION to Strike (108 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1262 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Amended Complaint,, by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a) MOTION to Strike (108 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1262 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Amended Complaint,, by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a) filed by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Part 1, #2 Exhibit A-Part 2)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Klehr, Benjamin) Modified on 9/15/2009 (Dawkins, Susan). SEE DE #121 FOR CORRECT ENTRY.
September 8, 2009 Filing 119 NOTICE OF FILING by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello re (117 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1318 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Response in Opposition to Motion, Certificate of Service Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Garemore, Joseph)
September 4, 2009 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (1288 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 114 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION for Joinder (1267 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 109 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION to Strike (108 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1262 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Amended Complaint. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD)
September 3, 2009 Filing 118 REPLY to (114 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1288 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) In Support of S. David Plummer II and Spencer D. Plummer III's Joinder In the Wilmington Trust Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 15(A) filed by Spencer D. Plummer, III, S. David Plummer, II, S. David Plummer, David Plummer, Spencer Plummer. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Sim, J.)
September 3, 2009 Filing 117 RESPONSE in Opposition re (114 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1288 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION for Joinder (1267 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 109 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION to Strike (108 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1262 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Amended Complaint filed by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Garemore, Joseph) Modified to remove extra text on 9/4/2009 (SCD).
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER/MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/27/2009, before Judge Joseph M. Hood (All Track II & III Cases): 1) Paragraph 11 of the Amended Track II Practice and Procedure Order is SET ASIDE and the STAY ON DISCOVERY IS LIFTED; 2) Individual matter 09-cv-215 shall proceed as the sole Track III case. Counsel shall submit a proposed discovery plan by COB on 9/4/2009. 1118 in 07-353 and #10 in 09-215 Motion for Change to Track I is DENIED; 3) Counsel have agreed that the Trustee's claims against Woodford Thoroughbreds should be transferred to the Bankruptcy Court for further proceedings. Counsel for Woodford Thoroughbreds shall prepare and submit an order effecting same to the Court; 4) Upon agreement of parties, discovery of Geostar server in the Track II cases may be obtained from those parties who have discovered the server in Track I by contacting Barry Hunter, Plas' liaison counsel in Track I. Parties requesting copies shall pay a share of the cost borne by Track I Plas for the production of the server materials. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood. (Court Reporter ANN BANTA.) Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al. (SCD)cc: COR,MDL
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER: It is ordered that the 1276 in 07-353 and #49 in 09-215 Motion for Order, 1281 in 07-353 and #112 in 09-15 Motion for Order, 1284 in 07-353 and #54 in 09-215 Motion for Order, 1285 in 07-353 and #113 in 09-15 Motion for Order, 1286 in 07-353 and #30 in 09-8 Motion for Order are DENIED; It is further ordered that counsel for Movants are excused from appearing. Said counsel and parties shall be bound by any deadlines established during the status conference. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/24/2009. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00008-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 5:09-cv-00215-JMH(SCD)cc: COR,MDL
August 25, 2009 Filing 114 MOTION for Joinder (1267 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 109 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION to Strike (108 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1262 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Amended Complaint,, by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a) MOTION to Strike (108 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1262 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Amended Complaint,, by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a) MOTION to Strike (108 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1262 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Amended Complaint,, by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a) by Spencer D. Plummer, III, S. David Plummer, Spencer Plummer (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of S. David Plummer II and Spencer D. Plummer III's Joinder in the Wilmington Trust Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, #2 Declaration of Gloria S. Hong In Support of Plummers Joinder in Wilmington Defendants' Motion to Strike Amended Complaint, #3 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Hong, Gloria)
August 25, 2009 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (44 in 5:09-cv-00167-JMH, 52 in 5:09-cv-00215-JMH, 1281 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 112 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION for Order Permitting Counsel to Appear Telephonically at the 8/27/09 Track II Status Conference. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 5:09-cv-00167-JMH, 5:09-cv-00215-JMH(SCD)
August 25, 2009 Filing 113 MOTION for Order by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello to Permit Counsel to Appear Telephonically at the August 27, 2009, Track II Status Conference (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Defeo, Stephen)
August 24, 2009 Filing 112 MOTION for Order by Spencer D. Plummer, III, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, S. David Plummer, II, S. David Plummer, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown), David Plummer, Spencer Plummer Permitting Counsel to Appear Telephonically at the August 27, 2009 Track II Status Conference (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Permitting Counsel to Appear Telephonically at the August 27, 2009 Track II Status Conference)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 5:09-cv-00167-JMH, 5:09-cv-00215-JMH(Sim, J.)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION AND ORDER: The time period for Plas to file and serve a response to the 1114 in 5:07-cv-353 and #87 in 5:09-cv-15 Motion to Dismiss is extended to 9/20/2009. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/24/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD)cc: COR,MDL
August 21, 2009 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (1272 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD)
August 20, 2009 Filing 110 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Geostar and Ferguson's Motion to Dismiss by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello, GeoStar Corporation, Tony Ferguson. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Garemore, Joseph) Modified to add dfts as filers on 8/21/2009 (SCD).
August 19, 2009 Filing 109 MOTION to Strike (108 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1262 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Amended Complaint,, by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Klehr, Benjamin)
August 19, 2009 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (108 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1262 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Tendered Amended Complaint. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD)
August 18, 2009 Filing 108 TENDERED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Classicstar, David S. Forman, GeoStar Corporation, GeoStar Financial Services Corporation, National Equine Lending Company, LLC, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation, Tony Ferguson, Gastar Exploration, Ltd., Private Consulting Group, Inc., GeoStar Corporation, Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, filed by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Garemore, Joseph) Modified on 8/19/2009 (SCD).
August 18, 2009 NOTICE OF ACTION BY CLERK STRIKING A DOCUMENT FROM THE RECORD re (1256 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 105 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) Amended Complaint, was an INCOMPLETE PDF document filed as main document; Attorney shall re-file the corrected Amended Complaint within three (3) business days. *TDA* cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD)
August 17, 2009 Filing 105 STRICKEN PURSUANT to Notice of Action Striking Document filed on 8/18/2009. Modified on 8/18/2009 (SCD).
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER (Track II Cases): It is ordered that these matters are set for a STATUS CONFERENCE on 8/27/2009 01:30 PM in LEXINGTON. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/14/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00008-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 5:09-cv-00167-JMH, 5:09-cv-00215-JMH(SCD)cc: COR,MDL,D Modified on 8/17/2009 (SCD).
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER: 1160 in case 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 415 in case 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, #164 in case 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, #167 in case 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, #186 in case 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, #81 in case 5:07-cv-00351-JMH, 92 in case 5:07-cv-00352-JMH, #132 in case 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, #52 in case 5:08-cv-00017-JMH, #43 in case 5:08-cv-00018-JMH, 246 in case 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, #44 in case 5:08-cv-00060-JMH, #51 in case 5:08-cv-00074-JMH, #98 in case 5:08-cv-00079-JMH, #45 in case 5:08-cv-00104-JMH, #141 in case 5:08-cv-00109-JMH, #141 in case 5:08-cv-00321-JMH; #39 in case 5:08-cv-00418-JMH, #52 in case 5:08-cv-00487-JMH, #102 in case 5:08-cv-00496-JMH, #22 in case 5:09-cv-00008-JMH, #95 in case 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, #28 in case 5:09-cv-00167-JMH, #16 in case 5:09-cv-00215-JMH, Motion to Stay is DENIED. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/14/2009. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD)cc: COR,MDL
August 3, 2009 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (781 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION to Dismiss by David S. Forman, (34 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION to Dismiss by David S. Forman. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD)
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Time period for Plas to file and serve a response to the (DE 1114 in 07-353 and #87 in 09-15) Motion to Dismiss is extended to 8/20/2009. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 7/24/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD)cc: COR,MDL
July 24, 2009 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (164 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 132 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 22 in 5:09-cv-00008-JMH, 39 in 5:08-cv-00418-JMH, 81 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH, 44 in 5:08-cv-00060-JMH, 52 in 5:08-cv-00017-JMH, 52 in 5:08-cv-00487-JMH, 28 in 5:09-cv-00167-JMH, 43 in 5:08-cv-00018-JMH, 16 in 5:09-cv-00215-JMH, 102 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH, 98 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH, 415 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, 51 in 5:08-cv-00074-JMH, 95 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 92 in 5:07-cv-00352-JMH, 246 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 186 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 141 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH, 45 in 5:08-cv-00104-JMH, 1160 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 141 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 167 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH) MOTION to Stay by GeoStar Corporation, Tony Ferguson, John Parrot, Thom Robinson. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD)
July 23, 2009 Filing 103 REPLY to Response to Motion re (164 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 132 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 22 in 5:09-cv-00008-JMH, 39 in 5:08-cv-00418-JMH, 81 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH, 44 in 5:08-cv-00060-JMH, 52 in 5:08-cv-00017-JMH, 52 in 5:08-cv-00487-JMH, 28 in 5:09-cv-00167-JMH, 43 in 5:08-cv-00018-JMH, 16 in 5:09-cv-00215-JMH, 102 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH, 98 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH, 415 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, 51 in 5:08-cv-00074-JMH, 95 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 92 in 5:07-cv-00352-JMH, 246 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 186 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 141 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH, 45 in 5:08-cv-00104-JMH, 1160 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 141 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 167 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH) MOTION to Stay by GeoStar Corporation, Tony Ferguson, John Parrot, Thom Robinson filed by GeoStar Corporation, Tony Ferguson, John Parrot, Thom Robinson. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Johnson, Brian)
July 22, 2009 Filing 102 RESPONSE in Support re (164 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 132 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 22 in 5:09-cv-00008-JMH, 39 in 5:08-cv-00418-JMH, 81 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH, 44 in 5:08-cv-00060-JMH, 13 in 5:08-cv-00103-JMH, 52 in 5:08-cv-00017-JMH, 52 in 5:08-cv-00487-JMH, 28 in 5:09-cv-00167-JMH, 43 in 5:08-cv-00018-JMH, 16 in 5:09-cv-00215-JMH, 102 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH, 98 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH, 415 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, 51 in 5:08-cv-00074-JMH, 95 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 36 in 5:07-cv-00350-JMH, 92 in 5:07-cv-00352-JMH, 246 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 186 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 141 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH, 45 in 5:08-cv-00104-JMH, 35 in 5:07-cv-00281-JMH, 1160 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 46 in 5:08-cv-00373-JMH, 141 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 167 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH) MOTION to Stay by GeoStar Corporation, Tony Ferguson, John Parrot, Thom Robinson filed by David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Spencer D. Plummer, III, S. David Plummer, II, S. David Plummer, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown), Buffalo Ranch, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, S. David Plummer(a Utah resident), Spencer D. Plummer, III, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, Inc.. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Sim, J.)
July 21, 2009 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re #76 MOTION for Sanctions by Arbor Farms, LLC, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC, Grover, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, Dumar Horses, L.C., Zeus Investments, LLC, Errol Skinner, Donna Hacker, John Goyak, Dana Goyak, John (SCD)
July 21, 2009 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (101 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1181 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD)
July 20, 2009 Filing 101 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extending Time for Plaintiffs' to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by GeoStar Corporation, Tony Ferguson, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Garemore, Joseph)
July 20, 2009 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (31 in 5:09-cv-00167-JMH, 25 in 5:09-cv-00008-JMH, 99 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1177 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 21 in 5:09-cv-00215-JMH) Status Report. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00008-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 5:09-cv-00167-JMH, 5:09-cv-00215-JMH(SCD)
July 20, 2009 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (39 in 5:08-cv-00018-JMH, 222 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 118 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 81 in 5:07-cv-00352-JMH, 127 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH, 153 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 391 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, 78 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 124 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 67 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH, 146 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 36 in 5:08-cv-00060-JMH, 1080 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 171 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 68 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH) MOTION for Joinder, (14 in 5:09-cv-00167-JMH) MOTION for Joinder. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD)
July 17, 2009 Filing 100 REPLY to (39 in 5:08-cv-00018-JMH, 222 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 118 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 81 in 5:07-cv-00352-JMH, 127 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH, 153 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 391 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, 78 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 124 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 67 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH, 146 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 36 in 5:08-cv-00060-JMH, 1080 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 171 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 68 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH), (14 in 5:09-cv-00167-JMH) In Support of S. David Plummer II, Spencer D. Plummer III, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC d/b/a Buffalo Ranch and Zeus Investments, LLC's Limited Joinder In the MDL Plaintiffs' Motion For Sanctions Against GeoStar, and Request For Additional Sanctions filed by David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Zeus Investments, LLC, S. David Plummer, II, S. David Plummer, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown), Buffalo Ranch, Zeus Investments, LLC, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, S. David Plummer(a Utah resident), Spencer D. Plummer, III, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, Inc.. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Sim, J.)
July 17, 2009 Filing 99 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Sea Song Farms, LLC, Lewis T. Teffeau, Linda S. Teffeau, Harriet V. Barker, Dave Werner, Kristin Werner, Karl Whitten, Lisa Whitten, JKLM Ranches, LLC, Rezie Farms, LLC, Spider Woman Ranches, LLC, David S. Forman, James D. Lyon, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello, Wilmington Trust FSB, GeoStar Corporation, Geostar Financial Corporation, GeoStar Financial Services Corporation, Geostar Leasing Corporation, Karren Hendrix Stagg Allen & Co. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00008-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 5:09-cv-00167-JMH, 5:09-cv-00215-JMH(Mihalek, Charles) Modified to add filers on 7/20/2009 (SCD).
July 15, 2009 Filing 98 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to National Equine Lending Company, LLC. cc: COR,MDL Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD)
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING SCHEDULE: It is ordered that Plas shall file a Response to 1160 Motion to Stay w/in 5 days of entry of this Order; It is further ordered that Dfts shall file a Reply in support of their 1160 Motion to Stay w/in 2 days of Plas' Response. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 7/15/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD)cc: COR,MDL
July 15, 2009 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO Leslie G. Whitmer, Clerk for review: re (1158 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION for Entry of Default by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello against National Equine Lending Company LLC, (93 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION for Entry of Default. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD)
July 14, 2009 Filing 96 MOTION to Expedite by GeoStar Corporation, Tony Ferguson, John Parrot, Thom Robinson Motion for Expedited Briefing Schedule Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Johnson, Brian)
July 14, 2009 Filing 95 MOTION to Stay by GeoStar Corporation, Tony Ferguson, John Parrot, Thom Robinson Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Goyak Plaintiffs' Request for Production of Documents to First Source Wyoming, Inc., #3 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Johnson, Brian)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Time period for Plas to file and serve a response to the 1114 Motion to Dismiss is extended to 7/23/2009. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 7/14/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD)cc: COR,MDL
July 14, 2009 Filing 93 MOTION for Entry of Default by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello against National Equine Lending Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Request for Entry of Default, #2 Proposed Order)(Garemore, Joseph) Modified event on 7/14/2009 (SCD).
July 13, 2009 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: re (122 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (142 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (77 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (170 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (79 in 5:07-cv-00352-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (86 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (152 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (117 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (66 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (125 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (63 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (1065 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (217 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (387 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH) MOTION to Compel. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD)
July 8, 2009 Filing 92 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re (122 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (142 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (77 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (170 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (79 in 5:07-cv-00352-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (86 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (152 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (117 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (66 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (125 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (63 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (217 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (1065 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION to Compel, (387 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH) MOTION to Compel filed by S. David Plummer, Spencer D. Plummer, III. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD) (Docketed as referenced at DE 1141 ) Modified to correct filer on 7/8/2009 (SCD).
July 6, 2009 Filing 91 NOTICE OF FILING by David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, Spencer D. Plummer, III, S. David Plummer, II, S. David Plummer, S. David Plummer(a Utah resident), Spencer D. Plummer, III re (122 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH) MOTION to Compel by David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, (142 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH) MOTION to Compel by S. David Plummer, (77 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION to Compel by S. David Plummer, (170 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH) MOTION to Compel by S. David Plummer, (79 in 5:07-cv-00352-JMH) MOTION to Compel by S. David Plummer, II, (86 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH) MOTION to Compel by David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, (152 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH) MOTION to Compel by S. David Plummer, (117 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH) MOTION to Compel by S. David Plummer, (66 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH) MOTION to Compel by S. David Plummer, (125 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH) MOTION to Compel by S. David Plummer, Spencer D. Plummer, III, (63 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH) MOTION to Compel by S. David Plummer, Spencer D. Plummer, III, (217 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH) MOTION to Compel by S. David Plummer, (1065 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION to Compel by S. David Plummer Motion of S. David Plummer to Compel Production of Audit Report, (387 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH) MOTION to Compel by S. David Plummer, II UNDER SEAL Reply In Support of Defendants S. David Plummer's Motion to Compel Production of Audit Report Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Sim, J.)
July 3, 2009 Filing 90 RESPONSE in Opposition re (222 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 81 in 5:07-cv-00352-JMH, 127 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH, 153 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 78 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 36 in 5:08-cv-00060-JMH, 39 in 5:08-cv-00018-JMH, 118 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 391 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, 124 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 67 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH, 146 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 1080 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 171 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 68 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH) MOTION for Joinder by David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Zeus Investments, LLC, S. David Plummer, II, S. David Plummer, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown), Buffalo Ranch, Zeus Inve MOTION for Joinder by David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Zeus Investments, LLC, S. David Plummer, II, S. David Plummer, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown), Buffalo Ranch, Zeus Inve MOTION for Joinder by David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Zeus Investments, LLC, S. David Plummer, II, S. David Plummer, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown), Buffalo Ranch, Zeus Inve MOTION for Joinder by David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Zeus Investments, LLC, S. David Plummer, II, S. David Plummer, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown), Buffalo Ranch, Zeus Inve MOTION for Joinder by David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Zeus Investments, LLC, S. David Plummer, II, S. David Plummer, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown), Buffalo Ranch, Zeus Inve, (14 in 5:09-cv-00167-JMH) MOTION for Joinder by S. David Plummer, Spencer Plummer filed by GeoStar Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - George Hofmeister Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B - Lee Brower Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #3 Exhibit C - Toby Norton Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #4 Exhibit D - Exhibit 188 to Carol Shrives Deposition, #5 Exhibit E - E-mail from Green to Plummer (part 1 of 2), #6 Exhibit E - E-mail from Green to Plummer (part 2 of 2), #7 Exhibit F - E-mail from Plummer to Ferguson, #8 Exhibit G - Buffalo Ranch Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #9 Exhibit H - Byron Dyson Deposition Transcript Excerpts, #10 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Johnson, Brian)
July 2, 2009 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (89 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 1133 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD)
July 1, 2009 Filing 89 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extending Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by Tony Ferguson, GeoStar Corporation, GeoStar Corporation, Geo Star Corporation, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Garemore, Joseph)
June 25, 2009 Filing 88 INCORRECTLY FILED RESPONSE to (1116 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 8 in 5:09-cv-00215-JMH) Request by Trustee For Change to Track I filed by Spencer D. Plummer, III, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, S. David Plummer, II, S. David Plummer, David Plummer, Spencer Plummer. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Sim, J.) Modified on 6/26/2009 (SCD).
June 24, 2009 Filing 87 MOTION to Dismiss by GeoStar Corporation, Tony Ferguson (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Delaware Entity Details for GeoStar Corporation, #3 Exhibit B - Delaware Entity Details for GeoStar Financial Services Corporation, #4 Exhibit C - Preferential Option Agreement (FILED UNDER SEAL), #5 Exhibit D - Option Agreement (FILED UNDER SEAL), #6 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Johnson, Brian)
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER: 1) Above-styled actions are NO LONGER STAYED with regard to ClassicStar, L.L.C.; 2) These actions with regards to ClassicStar, L.L.C., are RETURNED to the active docket of the Court; 3) Clerk shall no longer file that order directing that these actions be stayed w/ regard to ClassicStar, LLC, in the record of additional cases filed, removed or transferred hereto that are related to the ClassicStar Mare Lease Litigation. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/22/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD)cc: COR,MDL
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 AMENDED TRACK II PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER UPON TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1407(a) (re: 5:07-cv-353, 5:08-cv-846, and Track II Cases 5:09-cv-8, 5:09-cv-15, 5:09-cv-167, 5:09-cv-215): Case management procedures as noted in order. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/22/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD)cc: COR,MDL
June 19, 2009 Filing 84 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re (122 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH), (142 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH), (77 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH), (170 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH), (79 in 5:07-cv-00352-JMH), (86 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH), (152 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH), (117 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH), (66 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH), (125 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH), (63 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH), (217 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH), (1065 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) (387 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH) MOTION to Compel filed by Tony Ferguson, GeoStar Corporation, John Parrot, Thom Robinson. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD) (Docketed as referenced at DE 1107 )
June 19, 2009 Filing 83 NOTICE OF FILING by GeoStar Corporation, Tony Ferguson, John Parrot, Thom Robinson re (1065 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION to Compel by S. David Plummer Motion of S. David Plummer to Compel Production of Audit Report Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Johnson, Brian)
June 19, 2009 Filing 82 NOTICE OF FILING Order Lifting Stay as to ClassicStar by AA-J Breeding, LLC, Arbor Farms, Anne Baker, Neil Baker, Harriet V. Barker, Beechglen Farms, Thomas Bissmeyer, Bissmeyer Properties, C. Edward Cunningham, DLJ Family Investment Partners, Derby Stakes, LLC, Dumar Horses, L.C., Peter Fortenbaugh, Gekko Holdings, LLC, Michael Ginaldi, Ginaldi thoroughbreds, llc, Dana Goyak, John Goyak, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, Donna Hacker, John Hales, Ora-Oli Halfon, Uri Halfon, Jean Hertzog, Leo Hertzog, Beverly House-Myers, J&L Canterbury Farms, LLC, JKLM Ranches, LLC, John Goyak and Associates, Incorporated, Jupiter Ranches, LLC, Betty Lee, James D. Lyon, MacDonald Stables LLC, Larry McNeill, Greg Minor, Stephanie Minor, Moonshadow Ranch, LLC, Denise G. Morello, Thomas E. Morello, Mark Myers, Nebann Farms, LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, No Limits Productions, LLC, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Gregory R. Raifman, Susan Raifman, Raifman Family Trust dated 7/2/03, Rezie Farms, LLC, Rolling Knoll Farms, LLC, Julie Romanowski, William Romanowski, Romanowski Thoroughbreds, LLC, Sandra N. Tillotson Family Trust, Sea Song Farms, LLC, Errol Skinner, Spider Woman Ranches, LLC, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Su-Sim, LLC, Ralph Tamm, Linda T. Teffeau, Linda S. Teffeau, Sandra N. Tillotson, Janice Webb, Steven Webb, Dave Werner, Kristin Werner, West Hills Farms, LLC, Karl Whitten, Lisa Whitten, Zeus Investments, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Judge Howard's January 3, 2008 Order, #2 Exhibit B - Judge Howard's March 16, 2009 Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Hunter, Barry) Modified to add descriptive text and correct filers on 6/22/2009 (SCD).
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 TRACK II PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER UPON TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1407(A) (re: 5:07-cv-353, 5:08-cv-496, 5:09-cv-08, 5:09-cv-15, 5:09-cv-167, 5:09-cv-215): Case management procedures as noted in order. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 6/18/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD)cc: COR,MDL
June 16, 2009 Filing 80 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re (36 in 5:08-cv-00104-JMH, 116 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 141 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 43 in 5:08-cv-00487-JMH, 62 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH, 85 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH, 216 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 124 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH, 169 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 1061 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 43 in 5:08-cv-00017-JMH, 65 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH, 76 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 30 in 5:08-cv-00418-JMH, 78 in 5:07-cv-00352-JMH, 120 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 151 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 42 in 5:08-cv-00074-JMH, 385 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH) MOTION for Sanctions filed by Geo Star Corporation. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD) (Docketed as referenced at DE 1090 ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2012: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H) (STB). Modified on 4/27/2012 (STB).
June 16, 2009 Filing 79 NOTICE OF FILING by GeoStar Corporation re (76 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION for Sanctions by Arbor Farms, LLC, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC, Grover, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, Dumar Horses, L.C., Zeus Investments, LLC, Errol Skinner, Donna Hacker, John Goyak, Dana Goyak, John Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Filed Under Seal Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Johnson, Brian)
June 15, 2009 Filing 78 MOTION for Joinder (re: 1061 in 5:07-cv-353-JMH, #76 in 5:09-cv-15-JMH) by David Plummer, Spencer Plummer, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, LLC, Spencer D. Plummer, III, Zeus Investments, LLC, S. David Plummer, II, S. David Plummer, Buffalo Ranch.(a business entity form unknown), Buffalo Ranch, Zeus Investments, LLC, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, S. David Plummer(a Utah resident), Spencer D. Plummer, III, Strategic Opportunity Solutions, Inc. Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support OF S DAVID PLUMMER II, SPENCER D PLUMMER III, STRATEGIC OPPORTUNITY SOLUTIONS, LLC D/B/A BUFFALO RANCH, AND ZEUS INVESTMENTS, LLC'S LIMITED JOINDER IN THE MDL PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST GEOSTAR [DE #1061], AND REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL SANCTION, #2 Proposed Order GRANTING MOTION OF S DAVID PLUMMER II, SPENCER D PLUMMER III, STRATEGIC OPPORTUNITY SOLUTIONS, LLC D/B/A BUFFALO RANCH, AND ZEUS INVESTMENTS, LLC FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST GEOSTAR)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Sim, J.) Modified to create link to related document on 6/16/2009 (Dawkins, Susan).
June 1, 2009 Filing 77 MOTION to Compel Production of Audit Report by S. David Plummer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of J. Ronald Sim, #3 Proposed Order) (Filed pursuant to QC re: DE 1065 in 5:07-cv-353-JMH)(SCD)
May 29, 2009 Filing 76 MOTION for Sanctions by Arbor Farms, LLC, MacDonald Stables LLC, Nelson Breeders, LLC, West Hills Farms, LLC, Grover, Jaswinder Grover, Monica Grover, Dumar Horses, L.C., Zeus Investments, LLC, Errol Skinner, Donna Hacker, John Goyak, Dana Goyak, John Goyak and Associates, Incorporated, Jupiter Ranches, LLC, Gekko Breeding and Racing, Larry McNeill, AA-J Breeding, LLC, Su-Sim, LLC, Derby Stakes, LLC, Uri Halfon, Ora-Oli Halfon, Gunshy Thoroughbreds, LLC, DLJ Family Investment Partners, Michael Ginaldi, Ginaldi thoroughbreds, llc, Beechglen Farms, John Hales, J & L Canterbury Farms, LLC, Leo Hertzog, Jean Hertzog, Gregory R. Raifman, Susan Raifman, Gekko Holdings, LLC, Bissmeyer Properties, Raifman Family Trust dated 7/2/03, Premiere Thoroughbreds, LLC, Greg Minor, Neil Baker, Anne Baker, Nebann Farms, LLC, Harriet V. Barker, Spider Woman Ranches, LLC, Beverly House-Myers, Mark Myers, Rolling Knoll Farms, LLC, William Romanowski, Julie Romanowski, Romanowski Thoroughbreds, LLC, Ralph Tamm, No Limits Productions, LLC, Steven Webb, Janice Webb, Moonshadow Ranch, LLC, Dave Werner, Kristin Werner, Rezie Farms, LLC, Karl Whitten, Lisa Whitten, JKLM Ranches, LLC, Stephanie Minor, Lynn T MacDonald, Lindalee MacDonald, C. Edward Cunningham, Sandra N Tillotson, Sandra N. Tillotson Family Trust, Betty Lee, Peter Fortenbaugh, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello, Susan Raifman, Raifman Family Revocable Trust Dated 7/2/03, Gekko Holdings, LLC, Gregory R. Raifman, Zeus Investments, LLC, Ginaldi Thoroughbreds, LLC, Sandra N Tillotson Family Trust, Betty Lee The MDL Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Against GeoStar Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of the MDL Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Against GeoStar FILELD UNDER SEAL, #2 Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Against GeoStar)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Hunter, Barry)
May 22, 2009 Filing 75 Summons Issued as to GeoStar Corporation, Tony Ferguson; issued summons returned to counsel via US Mail (SCD)
May 22, 2009 Filing 74 NOTICE OF FILING by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello (Attachments: #1 Summons Geostar, #2 Summons Tony Ferguson)(Garemore, Joseph)
May 18, 2009 Filing 73 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Wilmington Trust Corporation on 12/10/2008, filed by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello. (Garemore, Joseph)
May 18, 2009 Filing 72 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Private Consulting Group, Inc. on 12/17/2008, filed by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello. (Garemore, Joseph)
May 18, 2009 Filing 71 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on David S. Forman on 12/15/2008, filed by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello. (Garemore, Joseph)
May 18, 2009 Filing 70 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania on 12/10/2008, filed by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello. (Garemore, Joseph)
May 18, 2009 Filing 69 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Wilmington Trust, FSB on 12/19/2008, filed by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello. (Garemore, Joseph)
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 VIRTUAL ORDER: Granting 990 in 07-353 and #61 in 09-15 Motion for Extension of Time; Plas must serve GeoStar Corporation and Tony Ferguson by 30 days from the date of the Court's Order. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 5/14/2009. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD)cc: COR,MDL
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) 1014 in 07-353 and 198 in 08-53 Motion for Joinder is GRANTED; 2) 1015 Duplicate Motion for Joinder is DENIED AS MOOT; 3) Dft GeoStar Corporation's 1005 in 07-353 Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; 4) GeoStar shall have no obligations to provide a designee informed of GeoStar's current financial condition and the current location of its assets; 5) This order does not relieve GeoStar of any other discovery obligations. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 5/12/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD)cc: COR,MDL
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER: It is ordered that any response (to DE 1005 Motion for Protective Order) be filed on or before 5/12/2009 at 9:00 AM. Any reply be filed on or before 5/12/2009 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/11/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD)cc: COR,MDL
May 8, 2009 Filing 65 MOTION for Protective Order by GeoStar Corporation Restricting Scope of Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition of GeoStar Corporation, #3 Exhibit B - GeoStar's Objections to 30(b)(6) Notice, #4 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' Response to GeoStar's Objections, #5 Exhibit D - Additional 30(b)(6) Topics, #6 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Johnson, Brian)
May 5, 2009 Filing 64 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello. National Equine Lending Company, LLC waiver sent on 1/8/2009, answer due 3/9/2009. (Garemore, Joseph)
May 5, 2009 Filing 63 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Private Consulting Group, Inc. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD)
May 4, 2009 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO Leslie G. Whitmer, Clerk for review: re (989 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION for Entry of Default by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello, (60 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION for Entry of Default by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD)
May 1, 2009 Filing 62 NOTICE OF FILING by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello re (60 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION for Entry of Default by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello, (989 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION for Entry of Default by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello as to Private Consulting Group, Inc. and National Equine Lending Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Garemore, Joseph)
April 30, 2009 Filing 61 MOTION for Extension of Time by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Letter dated 1/8/09 to GeoStar Corp, #3 Exhibit B - Letter dated 1/8/09 to Tony Ferguson)(SCD) (Filed pursuant to QC re: 990 in 5:07-cv-353-JMH)
April 30, 2009 Filing 60 MOTION for Entry of Default by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Request, #2 Exhibit A - Return of Service, #3 Exhibit B - Letter dated 1/8/2009)(SCD) (Filed pursuant to QC re: 989 in 5:07-cv-353) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2009: #4 Proposed Order) (SCD).
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: 1) 901 in 07-353 and 339 in 06-243 Motion to Compel Discovery and Compliance with the Court's 2/2/2009 Order is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; 2) 921 in 07-353, 343 in 06-243, #128 in 07-347, #145 in 07-348, #149 in 07-349, #59 in 07-351, #72 in 07-352, #108 in 07-419, #36 in 08-17, #172 in 08-53, #35 in 08-74, #45 in 08-79, #30 in 08-104, #114 in 08-109, #97 in 08-321; #24 in 08-418, #36 in 08-487, #72 in 08-496, #54 in 09-15 Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; 3) GeoStar shall produce the requested financial data except as otherwise provided in this Order through December 31, 2008; 4) If Plas believe that there is reasonable cause that documents/information from after 12/31/2008 would be relevant, seek relief from Court and file a formal pleading; 5) GeoStar shall produce financial data for VCR's inception in 2005 through May 2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B Todd on 4/15/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD)cc: COR,MDL
April 9, 2009 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (762 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION to Dismiss by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), (30 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION to Dismiss by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD)
April 8, 2009 Filing 58 REPLY to Response to Motion re (762 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION to Dismiss, (30 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD) (Filed pursuant to QC re: DE 936 in 07-353 and #57 in 09-15)
April 8, 2009 Filing 57 INCORRECTLY FILED RESPONSE in Support re (762 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH) MOTION to Dismiss by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), (30 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH) MOTION to Dismiss by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) Reply in Support of Motion of Defendants Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB and Wilmington Trust Corporation to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(Klehr, Benjamin) Please see DE 947 in 07-353 and #58 in 09-15 for the CORRECT ENTRY for this pleading. Modified on 4/9/2009 (SCD).
April 7, 2009 Attorney Update. Attorney Eric Matthew Hurwitz terminated per DE 931 Order Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 VIRTUAL ORDER (re: 5:07-cv-353, 5:09-cv-15): 829 in 07-353 and #39 in 09-15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 4/7/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD)cc: COR,MDL
April 7, 2009 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Hood for review: (97 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 149 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 72 in 5:07-cv-00352-JMH, 36 in 5:08-cv-00487-JMH, 343 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, 45 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH, 30 in 5:08-cv-00104-JMH, 172 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 54 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 108 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 72 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH, 921 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 145 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 128 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 114 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH, 24 in 5:08-cv-00418-JMH, 35 in 5:08-cv-00074-JMH, 36 in 5:08-cv-00017-JMH, 59 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH) MOTION for Protective Order by GeoStar Corporation Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD)
April 6, 2009 Filing 55 NOTICE OF FILING by Geo Star Corporation re (97 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 149 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 72 in 5:07-cv-00352-JMH, 36 in 5:08-cv-00487-JMH, 343 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, 45 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH, 30 in 5:08-cv-00104-JMH, 172 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 54 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 108 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 72 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH, 921 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 145 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 128 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 114 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH, 24 in 5:08-cv-00418-JMH, 35 in 5:08-cv-00074-JMH, 36 in 5:08-cv-00017-JMH, 59 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH) MOTION for Protective Order by GeoStar Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Protective Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Johnson, Brian)
April 6, 2009 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Brian Johnson re (97 in 5:08-cv-00321-JMH, 149 in 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 72 in 5:07-cv-00352-JMH, 36 in 5:08-cv-00487-JMH, 343 in 5:06-cv-00243-JMH, 45 in 5:08-cv-00079-JMH, 30 in 5:08-cv-00104-JMH, 172 in 5:08-cv-00053-JMH, 54 in 5:09-cv-00015-JMH, 108 in 5:07-cv-00419-JMH, 72 in 5:08-cv-00496-JMH, 921 in 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 145 in 5:07-cv-00348-JMH, 128 in 5:07-cv-00347-JMH, 114 in 5:08-cv-00109-JMH, 24 in 5:08-cv-00418-JMH, 35 in 5:08-cv-00074-JMH, 36 in 5:08-cv-00017-JMH, 59 in 5:07-cv-00351-JMH) MOTION for Protective Order by GeoStar Corporation; Error: Attached Memorandum in Support does not pertain to this Motion; Entry by attorney; Attorney shall prepare a pleading entitled Notice of Filing (with a certificate of service), file the Notice using the event Notice of Filing, attach the correct memorandum in support, and create a link to the related docket entry within 3 business days. cc: COR Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD)
April 3, 2009 Filing 54 MOTION for Protective Order by GeoStar Corporation Motions referred to James B Todd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(Johnson, Brian)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 VIRTUAL ORDER (re: 5:07-cv-349, 5:09-cv-15): 848 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Steven Forman in case 07-353, #141 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Steven Forman in case 5:07-349, #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case for Steven C. Forman 5:09-15 are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 3/27/2009. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:07-cv-00349-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD)cc: COR,MDL,Steven Forman w/ Electronic Filing Registration Form
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER OF DISMISSAL (re:5:09-cv-15): It is hereby ordered that all claims of Settling Plas (Thomas Morello, Denise Morello and Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC) against the Settling Dft (Handler, Thayer, & Duggan, LLC) are hereby dismissed with prejudice, pursuant to the term of the Settlement Agreement, with the Court to retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 3/26/2009.Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH, 5:09-cv-00015-JMH(SCD)cc: COR,MDL
March 26, 2009 Filing 51 NOTICE to Electronic Filing Users re: filing in related cases by Clerk. Associated Cases: 5:07-cv-00353-JMH et al.(SCD)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER/MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 3/2/2009, before Magistrate Judge James B Todd: It is ordered that Plas are given leave to file a Motion to Compel the production of data on or before 3/27/2009. Dft GeoStar Corporation file any response accompanied by a Motion for Protective Order on or before 4/3/2009. Plas make any reply on or before 4/10/2009. (SCD)cc: COR
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Time for Wilmington Trust to Reply to #30 Motion to Dismiss is extended until 4/8/2009. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 3/19/2009.(SCD)cc: COR
March 19, 2009 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Dismiss by David S. Forman filed by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Garemore, Joseph)
March 18, 2009 Filing 47 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Response to the Motion by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello, Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Freed, Eric)
March 18, 2009 Filing 46 NOTICE OF FILING by David S. Forman re #42 Notice of Filing, #40 MOTION for Steven C. Forman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David S. Forman (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Perlman, Pamela)
March 13, 2009 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION to Dismiss by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certification of Service)(Defeo, Stephen)
March 12, 2009 Filing 44 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Order of Dismissal by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello, Handler, Thayer, Duggan, LLC. (Defeo, Stephen) Modified to add dft as filer on 3/13/2009 (SCD).
March 9, 2009 Filing 43 JOINT ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by S. David Plummer, Spencer Plummer.(Sim, J.)
March 6, 2009 Filing 42 NOTICE OF FILING by David S. Forman re #40 MOTION for Steven C. Forman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David S. Forman (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Perlman, Pamela)
March 6, 2009 Filing 41 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Order of Dismissal by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Dismissal)(Defeo, Stephen)
March 5, 2009 Filing 40 MOTION for Steven C. Forman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David S. Forman (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Filed in Master File and refiled herein for case management purposes)(STB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2009: #3 CORRECT Affidavit of David S. Forman) (SCD).
March 2, 2009 Filing 39 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by David S. Forman (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Permitting Withdrawal)(Hurwitz, Eric)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Plts to respond to #34 MOTION to Dismiss by David S. Forman by 3/19/2009. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 2/17/2009.(STB)cc: COR
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Plts to respond to Dft Wilmington Trust's #30 MOTION to Dismiss by 3/13/2009. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 2/17/2009.(STB)cc: COR
February 13, 2009 Filing 36 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extending Time for Response to David S. Forman's Motion to Dismiss by David S. Forman, Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello. (Garemore, Joseph)
February 10, 2009 Filing 35 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extending Time for Response to Wilmington Trust's Motion to Dismiss by Stanwyck Glen Farms, LLC, Thomas E. Morello, Denise G. Morello, Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Garemore, Joseph)
February 4, 2009 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss by David S. Forman (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Perlman, Pamela)
February 4, 2009 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela Dae Perlman on behalf of David S. Forman (Perlman, Pamela)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: GeoStar's Motion for Protective Order to preserve attorney-client privilege is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B Todd on 2/2/2009.(STB)cc: COR
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) GeoStar's Motion for Protective Order is DENIED; (2) West Hills Plts shall bear reasonable cost to GeoStar of copying & delivering data to counsel for West Hills; (3) By 2/12/2009, GeoStar shall provide West Hills good-faith estimate of reasonable cost of copying & delivering data; (4) By 2/17/2009, West Hills shall notify GeoStar whether it wishes GeoStar to proceed to produce data based on estimate; (5) GeoStar shall PRODUCE requested financial data in native format to West Hills by 3/4/2009; (6) GeoStar shall be relieved of obligation to timely produce data only if West Hills advise GeoStar they do not wish to proceed w/ production as set forth above. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B Todd on 2/2/2009.(STB)cc: COR
January 30, 2009 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A- Compalint, #3 Exhibit B- Individual Investment Agency/Sole Discretion, #4 Exhibit C-West Hills Case History, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(Klehr, Benjamin) Modified to describe attachments on 2/2/2009 (STB).
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: (1) #28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is GRANTED; (2) Arthur J. Abramowitz and Thomas McKay, III of Cozen O'Connor are deemed withdrawn as counsel for Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB and Wilmington Trust Corporation. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 1/27/2009. (STB)cc: COR
January 20, 2009 Filing 28 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation Motion to Withdraw Arthur J. Abramowitz and Thomas McKay, III as Counsel (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Klehr, Benjamin)
January 20, 2009 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D. Freed on behalf of Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB, Wilmington Trust Corporation Entry of Appearances of Eric D. Freed and Neal D. Colton (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Freed, Eric)
January 12, 2009 Clerk's Note: ECF Registration Form re ClassicStar Mare Lease Litigation mailed to attorneys Joseph M. Garemore, Stephen J. Defeo, Arthur Joel Abramowitz, Benjamin Samuel Klehr, Thomas McKay, III, Eric Matthew Hurwitz. (STB)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER (1) any motions pending in the transferor courts not refiled in this Court are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and (2) the Clerk is directed to serve this Order to counsel of record in the above cases and counsel in any additional case that may be filed, removed, or transferred hereto. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 2/14/2008.(STB)cc: COR
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FIRST AMENDED PRACTICE & PROCEDURE ORDER; case management procedures as noted in order. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 10/31/2007. (Attachments: #1 First Amended Schedule A, #2 Schedule B)(STB)cc: COR
January 12, 2009 Conflict Check run. (STB)
January 12, 2009 Filing 24 Civil Case Assignment; Case Transferred from District of New Jersey (STB)
January 12, 2009 Filing 23 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New Jersey. Case number 1:08-cv-05866. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. cc: COR w/ docket sheet
January 12, 2009 Clerk's Note: Case extracted via CMECF to the Eastern District of Kentucky. (th, ) [Transferred from njd on 1/12/2009.]
January 9, 2009 Filing 22 Certified Copy Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Eastern District of Kentucky. (Attachments: #1 Transferee letter)(th, ) [Transferred from njd on 1/12/2009.]
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to answer; answer due 1/31/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/5/09. (js) [Transferred from njd on 1/12/2009.]
December 30, 2008 Filing 20 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by DAVID S. FORMAN. (HURWITZ, ERIC) [Transferred from njd on 1/12/2009.]
December 30, 2008 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC MATTHEW HURWITZ on behalf of DAVID S. FORMAN (HURWITZ, ERIC) [Transferred from njd on 1/12/2009.]
December 18, 2008 Setting Deadlines as to #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Eric D. Freed, Esquire and #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Neal D. Colton, Esquire. Motion set for 1/20/2009 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (js) [Transferred from njd on 1/12/2009.]
December 18, 2008 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Neal D. Colton, Esquire by WILMINGTON TRUST OF PENNSYLVANIA, WILMINGTON TRUST FSB, WILMINGTON TRUST CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certification, #4 Certificate of Service)(KLEHR, BENJAMIN) [Transferred from njd on 1/12/2009.]
December 18, 2008 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Eric D. Freed, Esquire by WILMINGTON TRUST OF PENNSYLVANIA, WILMINGTON TRUST FSB, WILMINGTON TRUST CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certification, #4 Certificate of Service)(KLEHR, BENJAMIN) [Transferred from njd on 1/12/2009.]
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to answer; answer due 1/31/09. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 12/17/08. (js) [Transferred from njd on 1/12/2009.]
December 16, 2008 Filing 15 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER by WILMINGTON TRUST OF PENNSYLVANIA, WILMINGTON TRUST FSB, WILMINGTON TRUST CORPORATION. (KLEHR, BENJAMIN) [Transferred from njd on 1/12/2009.]
December 16, 2008 Filing 14 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants, Wilmington Trust of Pennsylvania, Wilmington Trust FSB and Wilmington Trust Corporation.. (KLEHR, BENJAMIN) [Transferred from njd on 1/12/2009.]
December 16, 2008 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN SAMUEL KLEHR on behalf of WILMINGTON TRUST OF PENNSYLVANIA, WILMINGTON TRUST FSB, WILMINGTON TRUST CORPORATION (KLEHR, BENJAMIN) [Transferred from njd on 1/12/2009.]
December 16, 2008 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS MCKAY, III on behalf of WILMINGTON TRUST OF PENNSYLVANIA, WILMINGTON TRUST FSB, WILMINGTON TRUST CORPORATION (MCKAY, THOMAS) [Transferred from njd on 1/12/2009.]
December 16, 2008 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by ARTHUR JOEL ABRAMOWITZ on behalf of WILMINGTON TRUST OF PENNSYLVANIA, WILMINGTON TRUST FSB, WILMINGTON TRUST CORPORATION (ABRAMOWITZ, ARTHUR) [Transferred from njd on 1/12/2009.]
December 8, 2008 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to PRIVATE CONSULTING GROUP, INC., DAVID S. FORMAN, WILMINGTON TRUST OF PENNSYLVANIA, WILMINGTON TRUST FSB, WILMINGTON TRUST CORPORATION. Days Due - 20. (js) [Transferred from njd on 1/12/2009.]
December 5, 2008 Filing 9 Request for Summons to be Issued by STANWYCK GLEN FARMS, LLC, THOMAS E. MORELLO, DENISE G. MORELLO as to DAVID S. FORMAN. (GAREMORE, JOSEPH) [Transferred from njd on 1/12/2009.]
December 5, 2008 Filing 8 Request for Summons to be Issued by STANWYCK GLEN FARMS, LLC, THOMAS E. MORELLO, DENISE G. MORELLO as to PRIVATE CONSULTING GROUP, INC.,. (GAREMORE, JOSEPH) [Transferred from njd on 1/12/2009.]
December 5, 2008 Filing 7 Request for Summons to be Issued by STANWYCK GLEN FARMS, LLC, THOMAS E. MORELLO, DENISE G. MORELLO as to WILMINGTON TRUST CORPORATION. (GAREMORE, JOSEPH) [Transferred from njd on 1/12/2009.]
December 5, 2008 Filing 6 Request for Summons to be Issued by STANWYCK GLEN FARMS, LLC, THOMAS E. MORELLO, DENISE G. MORELLO as to WILMINGTON TRUST FSB. (GAREMORE, JOSEPH) [Transferred from njd on 1/12/2009.]
December 5, 2008 Filing 5 Request for Summons to be Issued by STANWYCK GLEN FARMS, LLC, THOMAS E. MORELLO, DENISE G. MORELLO as to WILMINGTON TRUST OF PENNSYLVANIA. (GAREMORE, JOSEPH) [Transferred from njd on 1/12/2009.]
December 4, 2008 Filing 4 Letter from Joseph Garemore. (GAREMORE, JOSEPH) [Transferred from njd on 1/12/2009.]
December 4, 2008 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STANWYCK GLEN FARMS, LLC, THOMAS E. MORELLO, DENISE G. MORELLO. (GAREMORE, JOSEPH) [Transferred from njd on 1/12/2009.]
December 4, 2008 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH M. GAREMORE on behalf of all plaintiffs (GAREMORE, JOSEPH) [Transferred from njd on 1/12/2009.]
December 1, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PRIVATE CONSULTING GROUP, INC.,, DAVID S. FORMAN, NATIONAL EQUINE LENDING COMPANY, LLC, GEOSTAR CORPORATION, S. DAVID PLUMMER, SPENCER PLUMMER, TONY FERGUSON, HANDLER, THAYER, DUGGAN, LLC., WILMINGTON TRUST OF PENNSYLVANIA, WILMINGTON TRUST FSB, WILMINGTON TRUST CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 2292197.) JURY DEMANDED, filed by STANWYCK GLEN FARMS, LLC, THOMAS E. MORELLO, DENISE G. MORELLO. (Attachments: #1 Complaint part 2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Summonses not submitted.(dmw, ) [Transferred from njd on 1/12/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STANWYCK GLEN FARMS, LLC et al v. WILMINGTON TRUST OF PENNSYLVANIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEOSTAR CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ClassicStar, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TONY FERGUSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. DAVID PLUMMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILMINGTON TRUST FSB
Represented By: BENJAMIN SAMUEL KLEHR
Represented By: THOMAS MCKAY, III
Represented By: Eric D. Freed
Represented By: ARTHUR JOEL ABRAMOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL EQUINE LENDING COMPANY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILMINGTON TRUST OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: BENJAMIN SAMUEL KLEHR
Represented By: THOMAS MCKAY, III
Represented By: Eric D. Freed
Represented By: ARTHUR JOEL ABRAMOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANDLER, THAYER, DUGGAN, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILMINGTON TRUST CORPORATION
Represented By: BENJAMIN SAMUEL KLEHR
Represented By: THOMAS MCKAY, III
Represented By: Eric D. Freed
Represented By: ARTHUR JOEL ABRAMOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID S. FORMAN
Represented By: STEVEN C FORMAN
Represented By: ERIC MATTHEW HURWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIVATE CONSULTING GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEOSTAR FINANCIAL SERVICES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPENCER PLUMMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STANWYCK GLEN FARMS, LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN J. DEFEO
Represented By: JOSEPH M. GAREMORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS E. MORELLO
Represented By: STEPHEN J. DEFEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE G. MORELLO
Represented By: STEPHEN J. DEFEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?