DERRY v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Petitioner: MALIK DERRY
Respondent: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv06141
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from USA to the Court requesting extension of time to file an answer to the 2255 Petition and waiver of the attorney client privilege. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Ex A)(ASKIN, PATRICK)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to MALIK DERRY (cry,mail re-sent with inmate number)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO ANSWER within forty-five (45) days of the date of the entry of this Order,. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 2/26/2019. (tf, n.m.)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 14-0050 (NLH), filed by MALIK DERRY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DERRY v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MALIK DERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: FABIANA PIERRE-LOUIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?