BARATOV v. KANE et al
Petitioner: ALBERT MIKHAYLOVICH BARATOV
Respondent: JOHN DOE #02-05, WARDEN OF FCI FORT DIX, RAND BEERS, THOMAS R. KANE and JOHN DOE #01
Case Number: 1:2019cv06715
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to ALBERT MIKHAYLOVICH BARATOV re #8 Order (dmr) Modified on 4/11/2019 (dmr, ).
March 25, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (dmr)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying as moot the petition for writ of habeas corpus #1 and #2 Motion to Dismiss; ORDERED that the Clerk shall close this matter. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 3/25/2019. (dmr)(n.m.)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 OPINION. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 3/25/2019. (dmr)(n.m.)
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from AUSA O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(O'NEILL, JESSICA)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to ALBERT MIKHAYLOVICH BARATOV re #3 Order. (dmrm)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (released 3/1/2019). Mail sent to ALBERT MIKHAYLOVICH BARATOV (ssp, )
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing Respondent to file an Answer to the Petition within 30 days; ORDERED that within 45 days of receipt of the Answer Petitioner may file a Reply to the Answer, etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 2/27/2019. (dmr)(n.m.)
February 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 4/1/2019 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ssp, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by RAND BEERS, THOMAS R. KANE. (ssp, ).
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by ALBERT MIKHAYLOVICH BARATOV. (Attachments: #1 17-3775 Opinion. Signed by Judge Bumb on 2/22/2019, #2 17-3775 Order. Signed by Judge Bumb on 2/22/2019)FF waived(ssp, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARATOV v. KANE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN DOE #02-05
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN OF FCI FORT DIX
Represented By: JESSICA ROSE O'NEILL
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RAND BEERS
Represented By: JESSICA ROSE O'NEILL
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THOMAS R. KANE
Represented By: JESSICA ROSE O'NEILL
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN DOE #01
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ALBERT MIKHAYLOVICH BARATOV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?