GARRETT v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: ALAN D. GARRETT
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv12359
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Jerome B Simandle
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to ALAN D. GARRETT (cry, )
May 15, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (ssp, )
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Clerk shall file the petition. ORDERED that petition is denied. ORDERED that Clerk shall provide Petitioner with a copy of this Opinion and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case shall be closed.. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 5/13/2019. (ssp, n.m. ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/29/2019) (ssp, ).
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 5/13/2019. (ssp, n.m. ).
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 Petition Received. NO FF/IFP (cry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GARRETT v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALAN D. GARRETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?