HOVLIARAS v. GLOBAL CLIENT SOLUTIONS, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE HOVLIARAS
Defendant: U.S. BANK N.A., GLOBAL CLIENT SOLUTIONS, L.L.C. and WORLD LAW GROUP
Case Number: 1:2019cv12457
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 LETTER ORDER Granting request for an extension of time to reply to Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's motion to compel arbitration. Response is now due 9/2/2019. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 7/8/2019. (rtm, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 31 Letter from Erik Berglund, Esquire, requesting extension of time. (BERGLUND, ERIK)
July 3, 2019 Filing 30 Letter from Erik Berglund, Esquire re #28 Order. (BERGLUND, ERIK)
July 2, 2019 Filing 29 Letter from Joseph M. Pinto, Esquire re #28 Order. (PINTO, JOSEPH)
July 1, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/1/2019. (db, )
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER the Court will hold a settlement conference on August 26, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. in Room 2040. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 7/1/2019. (rtm, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 27 Letter from Global Client Solutions, LLC, on behalf of all parties re #9 Scheduling Order,. (BERGLUND, ERIK)
June 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 First MOTION to Compel Arbitration, #13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions or Defenses Under Rule 12. Motion set for 7/15/2019 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting letter request to extend the return date of the #13 Motion for Extension of Time and #12 Motion to Compel Arbitration until 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 6/24/2019. (dmr)
June 24, 2019 Filing 25 Joint Discovery Plan by GLOBAL CLIENT SOLUTIONS, L.L.C., U.S. BANK N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Cover Letter)(BERGLUND, ERIK)
June 19, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by GLOBAL CLIENT SOLUTIONS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Declaration, #5 Certificate of Service)(BERGLUND, ERIK)
June 19, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CHRISTINE HOVLIARAS re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Ex A to Pinto declaration, #3 Ex B to Pinto declaration, #4 Certificate of Service)(PINTO, JOSEPH)
June 19, 2019 Filing 22 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CHRISTINE HOVLIARAS re #12 First MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Declaration, #3 Ex A to Hovliaras Declaration, #4 Ex B to Hovliaras Declaration, #5 Certificate of Service)(PINTO, JOSEPH)
June 19, 2019 Filing 21 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CHRISTINE HOVLIARAS re #13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions or Defenses Under Rule 12 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PINTO, JOSEPH)
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by GLOBAL CLIENT SOLUTIONS, L.L.C., U.S. BANK N.A. re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Counsel Fees (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(BERGLUND, ERIK)
June 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #19 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Epstein, Esq.,. Motion set for 7/15/2019 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
June 14, 2019 Filing 19 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Epstein, Esq., by GLOBAL CLIENT SOLUTIONS, L.L.C., U.S. BANK N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(BERGLUND, ERIK)
June 12, 2019 Filing 18 BRIEF in Opposition filed by CHRISTINE HOVLIARAS re #14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Notice of Removal and Attachments (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to Dec, #3 Exhibit B to Dec, #4 Certificate of Service)(PINTO, JOSEPH)
June 11, 2019 Filing 17 Letter from Joseph M. Pinto, Esquire re #14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Notice of Removal and Attachments. (PINTO, JOSEPH)
June 6, 2019 Filing 16 Letter from Joseph M. Pinto, Esquire re #13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions or Defenses Under Rule 12, #12 First MOTION to Compel Arbitration, QC - Incorrect Event Selected,. (PINTO, JOSEPH)
June 6, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #15 Letter requesting to extend the return date filed by Joseph Pinto on 6/5/2019 was submitted incorrectly using the Rule 7.1 Letter event. PLEASE SUBMIT your request addressed to the Judge using the "Letter" event found under Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court (dmr)
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions or Defenses Under Rule 12, #12 First MOTION to Compel Arbitration . (PINTO, JOSEPH)
June 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Notice of Removal and Attachments. Motion set for 7/1/2019 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Notice of Removal and Attachments by GLOBAL CLIENT SOLUTIONS, L.L.C., U.S. BANK N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(BERGLUND, ERIK)
June 3, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 First MOTION to Compel Arbitration, #13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions or Defenses Under Rule 12. Motion set for 7/1/2019 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions or Defenses Under Rule 12 by GLOBAL CLIENT SOLUTIONS, L.L.C., U.S. BANK N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(BERGLUND, ERIK)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION to Compel Arbitration by GLOBAL CLIENT SOLUTIONS, L.L.C., U.S. BANK N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(BERGLUND, ERIK)
May 22, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion set for 7/1/2019 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 11 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Counsel Fees. (BERGLUND, ERIK)
May 22, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Motion set for 6/17/2019 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by CHRISTINE HOVLIARAS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Plaintiff's Counsel, #2 Brief, #3 Ex A to brief, #4 Ex B to brief, #5 Ex C to brief, #6 Ex D to brief, #7 Ex E to brief, #8 Ex F to brief, #9 Ex G to brief, #10 Ex H to brief, #11 Ex I to brief, #12 Certificate of Service, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(PINTO, JOSEPH)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: In-person scheduling conference previously set for June 5, 2019, is rescheduled for July 1, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. in Room 2040 Camden. Plaintiffs shall present a demand by May 24, 2019. Defendants shall respond to same by May 31, 2019. The parties shall submit a joint letter by June 28, 2019 notifying the Court of their decision to pursue mediation, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 2/21/2019. (rtm, )
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Defendants shall have fifteen (15) days to amend their notice of removal and attachments to properly comply with 28 U.S.C. 1332, etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 5/21/2019. (dmr)
May 20, 2019 Clerk's Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by GLOBAL CLIENT SOLUTIONS, L.L.C. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/31/2019. (dmr)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint. Attorney ERIK GUNNAR JAMES BERGLUND for U.S. BANK N.A. added. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BERGLUND, ERIK)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER Upon letter application dated May 14, 2019 from Erik Berglund, Esquire, counsel for defendant Global Client Solutions, LLC, and it appearing that all counsel consent to the request to reschedule the in-person Initial conference previously set for June 6, 2019, the Court hereby GRANTS the request. The new date and time of the in-person Initial Conference is June 5, 2019 at 12:30 p.m. in Room 2040 - Camden. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 5/17/19. (nar)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Erik Berglund, Esq. re #2 Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden). (BERGLUND, ERIK)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. BANK N.A. identifying U.S. Bancorp, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BERGLUND, ERIK)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GLOBAL CLIENT SOLUTIONS, L.L.C. identifying Global Holdings LLC as Corporate Parent.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BERGLUND, ERIK)
May 13, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (ssp, )
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Initial Conference set for 6/6/2019 11:00 AM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 5/13/2019. (ssp, )
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, no later than the first Rule 16 conference.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 5/13/2019. (ssp, )
May 10, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GLOBAL CLIENT SOLUTIONS, L.L.C. REMOVING from CHRISTINE HOVLIARAS V. GLOBAL CLIENT SOLUTIONS, L.L.C.; WORLD LAW GROUP; U.S. BANK, N.A., case number BUR-L-000588-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9658466), filed by GLOBAL CLIENT SOLUTIONS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #4 Declaration DECLARATION OF BRENT HAMPTON, ESQ., #5 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #6 Statement DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, #7 Statement DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, #8 Certificate of Service)(BERGLUND, ERIK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOVLIARAS v. GLOBAL CLIENT SOLUTIONS, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE HOVLIARAS
Represented By: JOSEPH MICHAEL PINTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. BANK N.A.
Represented By: ERIK GUNNAR JAMES BERGLUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLOBAL CLIENT SOLUTIONS, L.L.C.
Represented By: ERIK GUNNAR JAMES BERGLUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WORLD LAW GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?