BROWN v. OLDCASTLE BUILDINGENVELOPE, INC. et al

Plaintiff: DELMAR BROWN
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION(S), OLDCASTLE BUILDINGENVELOPE, INC. and JOHN DOE(S)
Case Number: 1:2019cv12588
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph H Rodriguez
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams Pretrial Factual. Discovery due by 12/13/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 3/20/2020, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 6/25/2019. (dmr)
June 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 6/25/2019. (dmw)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by OLDCASTLE BUILDINGENVELOPE, INC..(SILVERMAN, SCOTT)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER Due to a scheduling conflict, the Court hereby reschedules the in-person Initial Conference previously set for June 13, 2019. The new date and time of the in-person Initial Conference is June 25, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Room 2040 - Camden. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 6/5/19. (nar)
May 17, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Attorney Information,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ssp, )
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Initial Conference set for 6/13/2019 10:00 AM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 5/17/2019. (ssp, )
May 17, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by OLDCASTLE BUILDINGENVELOPE, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/6/2019. (dmr)
May 16, 2019 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (mmb, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by IVAN R. NOVICH on behalf of OLDCASTLE BUILDINGENVELOPE, INC. (NOVICH, IVAN)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (SILVERMAN, SCOTT)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT CRAIG SILVERMAN on behalf of OLDCASTLE BUILDINGENVELOPE, INC. (SILVERMAN, SCOTT)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OLDCASTLE BUILDINGENVELOPE, INC.. (SILVERMAN, SCOTT)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by OLDCASTLE BUILDINGENVELOPE, INC. from Burlington County Superior Court, case number BUR-L-768-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9670968), filed by OLDCASTLE BUILDINGENVELOPE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Adverse Party of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 Certification of Stephen Hancock in Support of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)(SILVERMAN, SCOTT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWN v. OLDCASTLE BUILDINGENVELOPE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION(S)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLDCASTLE BUILDINGENVELOPE, INC.
Represented By: SCOTT CRAIG SILVERMAN
Represented By: IVAN R. NOVICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE(S)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELMAR BROWN
Represented By: GREGG L. ZEFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?