BASH v. DITECH FINANCIAL LLC et al
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE BASH
Defendant: GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC, WALTER INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, DITECH FINANCIAL LLC and DT HOLDINGS LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv12814
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (dmr)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER of Administrative Termination Without Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 7/18/2019. (dmr)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Ethan R. Buttner, Esq.. (BUTTNER, ETHAN)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER ORDER addressed to Mr. Thomas re: Notice of Bankruptcy Filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 7/2/2019. (rss, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Ethan R. Buttner, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(BUTTNER, ETHAN)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Defendant Ditech Financial LLC (erroneously named as DT Holdings LLC, Green Tree Servicing LLC, and Walter Investment Management Corporation) by DITECH FINANCIAL LLC, DT HOLDINGS LLC, GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC, WALTER INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(BUTTNER, ETHAN)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ETHAN REEVES BUTTNER on behalf of DITECH FINANCIAL LLC, DT HOLDINGS LLC, GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC, WALTER INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT CORPORATION (BUTTNER, ETHAN)
June 14, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion set for 7/15/2019 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by LAWRENCE BASH. (THOMAS, JOSHUA)
May 22, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Jury Demand,Nature of Suit, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DITECH FINANCIAL LLC, DT HOLDINGS LLC, GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC, WALTER INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
May 22, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DITECH FINANCIAL LLC, DT HOLDINGS LLC, GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC, WALTER INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9686508) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LAWRENCE BASH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit s a-d)(THOMAS, JOSHUA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BASH v. DITECH FINANCIAL LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC
Represented By: ETHAN REEVES BUTTNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALTER INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT CORPORATION
Represented By: ETHAN REEVES BUTTNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC
Represented By: ETHAN REEVES BUTTNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DT HOLDINGS LLC
Represented By: ETHAN REEVES BUTTNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE BASH
Represented By: JOSHUA LOUIS THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?