BAUTISTA v. F/V PAPA'S GIRL et al
Plaintiff: ROBERTO BAUTISTA
Defendant: PAPA'S GIRL, LLC, F/V PAPA'S GIRL and CHESTER MOORE
Case Number: 1:2019cv13091
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted by ROBERTO BAUTISTA as to F/V PAPA'S GIRL. (sms)
June 12, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated per Chambers. (dmr)
June 12, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Attorney A. JORDAN RUSHIE filed a #11 Notice to Withdraw on 6/11/201. The Clerk's Office has reinstated the attorney since there isn't a substitution of counsel or an order granting withdrawal. This message is for informational purposes only. (dmr)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney A. JORDAN RUSHIE terminated. (RUSHIE, A.)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ROBERTO BAUTISTA (RUSHIE, A.)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED ORDER Appointing substitute custodian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 5/30/2019. (rss, )
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Appointing substitute custodian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 5/30/2019. (rss, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 WARRANT Arrest of Vessel In Rem issued (rss, )
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 5/30/2019. (rss, ) (Main Document 6 replaced with correct document on 5/31/2019) (rss, ). Modified on 5/31/2019 (rss, ).
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 Second MOTION to Appoint Custodian by ROBERTO BAUTISTA. (RUSHIE, A.)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 Amended MOTION to Appoint Custodian by ROBERTO BAUTISTA. (RUSHIE, A.)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by A. JORDAN RUSHIE on behalf of ROBERTO BAUTISTA (ssp, )
May 30, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by ROBERTO BAUTISTA. (RUSHIE, A.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/30/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ssp, ).
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against F/V PAPA'S GIRL, CHESTER MOORE, PAPA'S GIRL, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9703487) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ROBERTO BAUTISTA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 - PERMITS, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET)(RUSHIE, A.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/30/2019: #3 Affidavit) (ssp, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAUTISTA v. F/V PAPA'S GIRL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAPA'S GIRL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/V PAPA'S GIRL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHESTER MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERTO BAUTISTA
Represented By: A. JORDAN RUSHIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?