IMBESI v. SOLAR ENERGY WORLD et al
Plaintiff: DANIEL IMBESI
Defendant: SOLAR ENERGY WORLD, JOHN DOES 1-10 (fictitious names) and JOHN DOES 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv13366
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: In-person Settlement Conference set for 9/9/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 7/18/2019. (rtm, )
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCHNEIDER'S STANDING ORDER IN ALL CIVIL CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 7/18/2019. (rtm, )
July 17, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 7/17/2019. (tf, )
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER -- For good cause shown [Doc. No. 7] it is hereby ORDERED the initial conference scheduled on July 3, 2019 is POSTPONED and rescheduled to July 17, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. It is further ORDERED congratulations are in Order for Mr. Bieg and his family. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 7/2/19. (Schneider, Joel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 Joint Discovery Plan by SOLAR ENERGY WORLD.(MANTELL, KATERINA)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by KATERINA ROSE MANTELL on behalf of SOLAR ENERGY WORLD (MANTELL, KATERINA)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Timothy R. Bieg, Esquire requesting an adjournment of the 7.3.19 Initial Mangement Conference. (BIEG, TIMOTHY)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant Solar Energy World, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint by SOLAR ENERGY WORLD.(SARAVAY, ADAM)
June 5, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SOLAR ENERGY WORLD has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/24/2019. (rtm, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SARAVAY, ADAM)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SOLAR ENERGY WORLD. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SARAVAY, ADAM)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by REGINA MCKENNA PHILIPPS on behalf of DANIEL IMBESI (PHILIPPS, REGINA)
June 4, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (ssp, )
June 4, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ssp, )
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Initial Conference set for 7/3/2019 10:30 AM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/4/2019. (ssp, )
June 4, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ssp, )
June 3, 2019 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SOLAR ENERGY WORLD , LLC from Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Camden County, case number CAM-L-1672-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9714226), filed by SOLAR ENERGY WORLD. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Compliance, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(SARAVAY, ADAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IMBESI v. SOLAR ENERGY WORLD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL IMBESI
Represented By: REGINA MCKENNA PHILIPPS
Represented By: TIMOTHY R. BIEG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOLAR ENERGY WORLD
Represented By: ADAM NEIL SARAVAY
Represented By: KATERINA ROSE MANTELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10 (fictitious names)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?