ECKSTEIN v. SARKISSIAN
Plaintiff: MURRAY S. ECKSTEIN
3Rd Party Plaintiff: KAREN H. SARKISSIAN
3Rd Party Defendant: CRAIG M. ECKSTEIN
Case Number: 1:2019cv13394
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against CRAIG M. ECKSTEIN, filed by KAREN H. SARKISSIAN. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(rtm, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 7/30/2019 on the record. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder Electronic Court Recorder.) (rss, )
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/30/2019. (slc, n.m.)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by KAREN H. SARKISSIAN. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(cry, )
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: Upon the letter application of Defendant, and there being no objection by counsel for Plaintiff, the initial scheduling conference on 7/16/2019 shall be, and is hereby, ADJOURNED. The Court has RESCHEDULED the initial scheduling conference for 7/30/2019 at 12:00 Noon in Courtroom 3B. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/15/2019. (slc, n.m.)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Defendant shall have fifteen (15) days to amend her notice of removal, etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 7/8/2019. (rss, n.m.)
July 3, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Answer #5 filed by DARIA JANKA on 7/3/2019 was submitted incorrectly as a Claim. In the future, please use the correct event ANSWER TO COMPLAINT found under COMPLAINTS AND OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. This message is for informational purposes only. (rss, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 CLAIM Counterclaim by MURRAY S. ECKSTEIN. (JANKA, DARIA)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Notice of Removal, COUNTERCLAIM against MURRAY S. ECKSTEIN by KAREN H. SARKISSIAN.(rss, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DARIA BOJIDAROVA JANKA on behalf of MURRAY S. ECKSTEIN (JANKA, DARIA)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Initial Conference set for 7/16/2019 11:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 6/5/2019. (cry, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by KAREN H. SARKISSIAN from SUPERIOR COURT OF NJ, BURLINGTON COUNTY, case number C 50 19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number CAM010484), filed by KAREN H. SARKISSIAN. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(cry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ECKSTEIN v. SARKISSIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MURRAY S. ECKSTEIN
Represented By: LOUIS G. RUBINO
Represented By: DARIA BOJIDAROVA JANKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: KAREN H. SARKISSIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: CRAIG M. ECKSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?