GREMO v. BAYER CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY GREMO
Defendant: GUERBERT LLC, BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, AMERISOURCE BERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, MALLINCKRODT, INC., LIEBEL-FLARSHEIM COMPANY LLC, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER CORPORATION, AMERISOURCE BERGEN CORPORATION and GE HEALTHCARE, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv13432
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 106 Letter from Wilfred P. Coronato. (CORONATO, WILFRED)
January 28, 2020 Filing 105 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Motion Hearing held on 1/28/2020 re #86 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery. Oral Opinion read into the record. Ordered motion granted. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tf, )
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #86 Defendants' Joint Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/28/2020. (tf, )
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 TEXT ORDER: Debra Albanese's letter request [D.I. 101] to appear by telephone for the hearing scheduled for 1/28/2020 shall be, and is hereby, GRANTED. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/28/2020. (slc)
January 27, 2020 Filing 102 Letter from D. Albanese re: supplement to request for telephonic participation by D. Albanese re #101 Letter. (ALBANESE, DEBRA)
January 27, 2020 Filing 101 Letter from D. Albanese re: request for telephonic participation by D. Albanese. (ALBANESE, DEBRA)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 TEXT ORDER: By consent, Defendants GE Healthcare Inc. and General Electric Company's application to permit Jeremy Moseley, Esq., to participate by telephone at the upcoming hearing on 1/28/2020 shall be, and is hereby, GRANTED. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1/23/2020. (slc)
January 23, 2020 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by BRAD MICHAEL WELSH on behalf of LIEBEL-FLARSHEIM COMPANY LLC (WELSH, BRAD)
January 23, 2020 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by BRAD MICHAEL WELSH on behalf of GUERBERT LLC (WELSH, BRAD)
January 23, 2020 Filing 97 Letter from D. Albanese re: request for telephonic participation by J. Moseley. (ALBANESE, DEBRA)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 TEXT ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING: By consent, oral argument on Joint Motion #86 to Stay Discovery shall be, and is hereby, RESCHEDULED to 1/28/2020 at 2:00 P.M. in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 12/10/2019. (slc)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 TEXT ORDER SETTING HEARING: Oral Argument on Joint Motion #86 to Stay Discovery set for 1/17/2020 at 1:30 PM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 12/4/2019. (slc)
October 28, 2019 Filing 94 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by All Defendants re #86 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery (Attachments: #1 Certification of Service)(CORONATO, WILFRED)
October 21, 2019 Filing 93 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by KIMBERLY GREMO re #86 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery (BRASLOW, DEREK)
October 15, 2019 Filing 92 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by GE HEALTHCARE, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY re #76 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint (w/cert. of service) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ALBANESE, DEBRA)
October 15, 2019 Filing 91 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC re #80 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certification of Service)(CORONATO, WILFRED)
October 15, 2019 Filing 90 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by GUERBERT LLC, LIEBEL-FLARSHEIM COMPANY LLC re #53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SHAFFER, BRIAN)
October 15, 2019 Filing 89 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by AMERISOURCE BERGEN CORPORATION, AMERISOURCE BERGEN DRUG CORPORATION re #79 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LOUCKS, ERIN)
October 15, 2019 Filing 88 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT, INC. re #78 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(LOUCKS, ERIN)
October 14, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE by BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC of Change of Address of Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Brennan & Baum LLP (CORONATO, WILFRED)
October 9, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #86 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery. Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 86 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Stay Discovery, #2 Certification of Wilfred P. Coronato, Esq., #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certification of Service)(CORONATO, WILFRED)
October 7, 2019 Filing 85 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by KIMBERLY GREMO re #78 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendants MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT, INC. (BRASLOW, DEREK)
October 7, 2019 Filing 84 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by KIMBERLY GREMO re #79 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendants AMERISOURCE BERGEN CORPORATION, AMERISOURCE BERGEN DRUG CORPORATION (BRASLOW, DEREK)
October 7, 2019 Filing 83 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by KIMBERLY GREMO re #80 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendants BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC (BRASLOW, DEREK)
October 7, 2019 Filing 82 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by KIMBERLY GREMO re #76 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint (w/cert. of service) by Defendants GE Healthcare Inc. and GE Electric Company (BRASLOW, DEREK)
October 7, 2019 Filing 81 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by KIMBERLY GREMO re #77 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Defendants Guerbet LLC and Liebelflarsheim (BRASLOW, DEREK)
September 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #78 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #79 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #80 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 80 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC. Responses due by 10/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, #2 Certification of Wilfred P. Coronato, Esq., #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certification of Service)(CORONATO, WILFRED)
September 17, 2019 Filing 79 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by AMERISOURCE BERGEN CORPORATION, AMERISOURCE BERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. Responses due by 10/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit A)(LOUCKS, ERIN)
September 17, 2019 Filing 78 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT, INC.. Responses due by 10/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G)(LOUCKS, ERIN)
September 17, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by GUERBERT LLC, LIEBEL-FLARSHEIM COMPANY LLC. Responses due by 10/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief in support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(KENDALL, JAMIE)
September 17, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint (w/cert. of service) by GE HEALTHCARE, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. Responses due by 10/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief in support of motion to dismiss, #2 Certification of D. Albanese, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ALBANESE, DEBRA)
September 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #76 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint (w/cert. of service), #77 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 TEXT ORDER: The time within which to file a motion to stay discovery shall be, and is hereby, extended to 10/8/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/5/2019. (slc)
September 5, 2019 Filing 74 Letter from Wilfred P. Coronato, Esq. to Hon. Ann Marie Donio, U.S.M.J. re 73 Order,. (CORONATO, WILFRED)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' letter [D.I. 72] requesting an extension of the deadline to file a motion to stay discovery. Defense counsel shall advise the Court in writing as to whether opposing counsel consents to the request. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/4/2019. (slc)
September 4, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #68 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/17/2019. (tf, )
September 4, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #71 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by GUERBERT LLC, LIEBEL-FLARSHEIM COMPANY LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/17/2019. (tf, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 72 Letter from Wilfred P. Coronato, Esq. to Hon. Ann Marie Donio, U.S.M.J. re 43 Order on Oral Motion. (CORONATO, WILFRED)
September 3, 2019 Filing 71 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Amended Complaint.. (KENDALL, JAMIE)
September 3, 2019 Filing 70 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by KIMBERLY GREMO re #61 MOTION to Dismiss (BRASLOW, DEREK)
September 3, 2019 Filing 69 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by KIMBERLY GREMO re #60 MOTION to Dismiss (w/ cert. of service) (BRASLOW, DEREK)
September 3, 2019 Filing 68 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Amended Complaint by Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC and Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc... (CORONATO, WILFRED)
August 30, 2019 Filing 67 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Amended Complaint by GE Healthcare Inc. and General Electric Company.. (TRAFLET, STEPHEN)
August 30, 2019 Filing 66 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to First Amended Complaint.. (LOUCKS, ERIN)
August 30, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #66 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AMERISOURCE BERGEN CORPORATION, MALLINCKRODT, INC., AMERISOURCE BERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, MALLINCKRODT LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/17/2019. (tf, )
August 30, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #67 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GE HEALTHCARE, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/17/2019. (tf, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 65 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by KIMBERLY GREMO re #53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint BY DEFENDANTS GUERBET LLC AND LIEBEL-FLARSHEIM (BRASLOW, DEREK)
August 20, 2019 Filing 64 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by KIMBERLY GREMO re #52 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS MALLINCKRODT INC. AND MALLINCKRODT LLC (BRASLOW, DEREK)
August 20, 2019 Filing 63 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by KIMBERLY GREMO re #57 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANTS AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORPORATION AND AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION (BRASLOW, DEREK)
August 20, 2019 Filing 62 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AMERISOURCE BERGEN CORPORATION, AMERISOURCE BERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, GE HEALTHCARE, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GUERBERT LLC, LIEBEL-FLARSHEIM COMPANY LLC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT, INC., filed by KIMBERLY GREMO.(BRASLOW, DEREK)
August 13, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #61 MOTION to Dismiss , #60 MOTION to Dismiss (w/ cert. of service). Motion set for 9/16/2019 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss by BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, #2 Certification of Wilfred P. Coronato, Esq., #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certification of Service)(CORONATO, WILFRED)
August 12, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION to Dismiss (w/ cert. of service) by GE HEALTHCARE, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief in support of motion to dismiss, #2 Certification of D. Albanese (with exhibits), #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ALBANESE, DEBRA)
August 12, 2019 Filing 59 RESPONSE in Support filed by KIMBERLY GREMO re #36 MOTION to Remand Pursuant to 28 USC 1447 (BRASLOW, DEREK)
August 5, 2019 Filing 58 BRIEF in Opposition filed by BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC re #36 MOTION to Remand Pursuant to 28 USC 1447 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Wilfred P. Coronato, Esq. (with Exhibits A-F), #2 Certification of Service)(CORONATO, WILFRED)
August 2, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss by AMERISOURCE BERGEN CORPORATION, AMERISOURCE BERGEN DRUG CORPORATION. Responses due by 8/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(LOUCKS, ERIN)
August 2, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE by LIEBEL-FLARSHEIM COMPANY LLC re #54 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Request for Judicial Notice FDA Safety Announcements (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(KENDALL, JAMIE)
August 2, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE by GUERBERT LLC re #53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Request for Judicial Notice FDA Safety Announcements (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(KENDALL, JAMIE)
August 2, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by LIEBEL-FLARSHEIM COMPANY LLC. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(KENDALL, JAMIE)
August 2, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by GUERBERT LLC. Responses due by 8/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(KENDALL, JAMIE)(ssp, ).
August 2, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION to Dismiss by MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT, INC.. Responses due by 8/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Certificate of Service, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(LOUCKS, ERIN)
August 2, 2019 Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERISOURCE BERGEN CORPORATION, AMERISOURCE BERGEN DRUG CORPORATION identifying AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (LOUCKS, ERIN)
August 2, 2019 Filing 50 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT, INC. identifying Mallinckrodt PLC as Corporate Parent.. (LOUCKS, ERIN)
August 2, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #52 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 9/3/2019 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
August 2, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #57 MOTION to Dismiss , #53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 9/3/2019 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
August 2, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Motions to Dismiss #53 & #54 submitted by Jamie Kendall on 8/2/2019 appear to be duplicates. These submissions will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (tf, )
July 29, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Devin K. Ross: $ 150, receipt number CAM010593 (rss, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 49 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Edward Dumoulin, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CORONATO, WILFRED)
July 25, 2019 Filing 48 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jennifer Greenblatt, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CORONATO, WILFRED)
July 25, 2019 Filing 47 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice T. Matthew Leckman, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9841070.) (BRASLOW, DEREK)
July 25, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, EDWARD DUMOUIN and JENNIFER L. GREENBLATT, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (tf, )
July 25, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, T. MATTHEW LECKMAN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (tf, )
July 19, 2019 AMENDED Set/Reset Deadlines as to #36 MOTION to Remand Pursuant to 28 USC 1447. Motion set for 8/19/2019 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 46 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #36 MOTION to Remand Pursuant to 28 USC 1447 . (CORONATO, WILFRED)
July 17, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to T. Matthew Leckman. receipt number TRE104242 (in-jal, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 45 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Telephone Status Conference held on the record. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder Electronic Court Recorder.) (rss, )
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting #41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Devin K. Ross. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/16/2019. (rss, )
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TEXT ORDER: As set forth during the telephone conference held on the record on 7/16/2019, any motion for a stay of discovery shall be filed by no later than 9/6/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/16/2019. (slc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMY ALEXANDER GUNN on behalf of AMERISOURCE BERGEN CORPORATION, AMERISOURCE BERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT, INC. (GUNN, JEREMY)
July 15, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Devin K. Ross by AMERISOURCE BERGEN CORPORATION, AMERISOURCE BERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Devin K. Ross, #2 Certification of Erin Loucks Leffler, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(LOUCKS, ERIN)
July 15, 2019 Filing 40 Letter from T. Matthew Leckman, Esq., to Hon. Ann Marie Donio, U.S.M.J. re #39 Letter. (BRASLOW, DEREK)
July 15, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 300, receipt number CAM010562 as to Jennifer L. Greenblatt, ESQ. and Edward J. Dumoulin, ESQ. (rtm, )
July 15, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Devin K. Ross. Motion set for 8/19/2019 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 39 Letter from Wilfred P. Coronato, Esq. to Hon. Ann Marie Donio, U.S.M.J.. (CORONATO, WILFRED)
July 8, 2019 Filing 38 Certification of DEREK T. BRASLOW IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF T. MATTHEW LECKMAN, ESQ. PRO HAC VICE on behalf of KIMBERLY GREMO Re QC - Electronic signature does not match e-filer,. (BRASLOW, DEREK)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting #35 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JENNIFER GREENBLATT, ESQ. AND EDWARD DUMOULIN, ESQ.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/2/2019. (rss, )
July 2, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #36 MOTION to Remand Pursuant to 28 USC 1447. Motion set for 8/5/2019 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Remand Pursuant to 28 USC 1447 by KIMBERLY GREMO. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Plaintiff's Motion for Remand, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(BRASLOW, DEREK)
July 1, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification i/s/o Motion for PHV Admission, #2 Exhibit A to Wilfred P. Coronato Certification, #3 Exhibit B to Wilfred P. Coronato Certification, #4 Text of Proposed Order Grating Pro Hac Vice Admission)(CORONATO, WILFRED)
July 1, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, Michael O'Donnell and Jeremy Moseley, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (rss, )
July 1, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 8/5/2019 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to T. Matthew Leckman; shall make a payment of $150.00 to the United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 6/28/2019. (tf, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 33 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jeremy Moseley to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (ALBANESE, DEBRA)
June 28, 2019 Filing 32 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Michael O'Donnell to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (ALBANESE, DEBRA)
June 28, 2019 Filing 31 Certification of T. Matthew Leckman (with Certificate of Good Standing) on behalf of KIMBERLY GREMO Re #30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, QC - Electronic signature does not match e-filer,. (BRASLOW, DEREK)
June 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for T. MATTHEW LECKMAN (w/ cert. of service). Motion set for 8/5/2019 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
June 28, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Certification of T. Matthew Leckman #[30-2] submitted by Derek Braslow on 6/27/2019 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE CERTIFICATION ONLY WITH A SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (tf, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for T. MATTHEW LECKMAN (w/ cert. of service) by KIMBERLY GREMO. (Attachments: #1 Certification of D. Braslow, #2 Certification of T. Matthew Leckman (with Certificate of Good Standing), #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BRASLOW, DEREK)
June 27, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 300, receipt number CAM010531 (rtm, )
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' letter [D.I. 27], as well as Plaintiff's response thereto [D.I. 28] concerning the upcoming initial scheduling conference on 7/16/2019 at 11:30 A.M. The Court will convert the initial scheduling conference to a telephone conference. The parties need not submit a joint discovery plan at this time, but should be prepared to discuss their positions with respect to the scheduling of discovery. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 6/26/2019. (slc)
June 26, 2019 Filing 28 Letter from D. Braslow re: Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' request to continue initial scheduling conference re #27 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Notice and Application to Continue Scheduling Conference)(BRASLOW, DEREK)
June 25, 2019 Filing 27 Letter from D. Albanese re: Defendants' request to continue initial conference. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Application to Continue Scheduling Conference)(ALBANESE, DEBRA)
June 24, 2019 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIEBEL-FLARSHEIM COMPANY LLC. (KENDALL, JAMIE)
June 24, 2019 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GUERBERT LLC. (KENDALL, JAMIE)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Extending Time to Answer, Move, Or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint; Answer due by 8/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 6/24/2019. (rss, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GE HEALTHCARE, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY identifying none as Corporate Parent.. (ALBANESE, DEBRA)
June 21, 2019 Filing 22 Letter from D. Albanese re. extension of time to respond. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent Order Extending Time to Respond)(ALBANESE, DEBRA)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jeremy A, Moseley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 6/20/2019. (dmr)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael L. O'Donnell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 6/20/2019. (dmr)
June 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for J. Moseley (w/ cert. of service), #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for M. O'Donnell (w/ cert. of service). Motion set for 7/15/2019 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for J. Moseley (w/ cert. of service) by GE HEALTHCARE, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certification of D. Albanese, #2 Certification of J. Moseley (with Certificate of Good Standing), #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ALBANESE, DEBRA)
June 19, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for M. O'Donnell (w/ cert. of service) by GE HEALTHCARE, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certification of D. Albanese, #2 Certification of M. O'Donnell (with Certificate of Good Standing), #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ALBANESE, DEBRA)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting Extension of Time to Answer; Answer due by 8/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 6/18/2019. (rss, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN W. SHAFFER on behalf of GUERBERT LLC, LIEBEL-FLARSHEIM COMPANY LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SHAFFER, BRIAN)
June 18, 2019 Filing 15 Letter from Wilfred P. Coronato, Esq. for Notice and Application on Consent for Order Extending Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Reply to the Complaint Pursuant to Local Civ. R. 6.1(a). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CORONATO, WILFRED)
June 18, 2019 Filing 14 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC, and Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc... (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CORONATO, WILFRED)
June 18, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Application for Clerk's Order to Extend Time #14 filed by WILFRED CORONATO on 6/18/2019 cannot be granted at this time due to the prior application to extend time filed on 6/6/2019. Please resubmit the document using the event LETTER found under OTHER DOCUMENTS (rss, )
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply; reply to Plaintiffs Complaint is extended through and including August 2, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 6/14/2019. (tf, )
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply; reply to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended through and including August 2, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 6/14/2019. (tf, )
June 13, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint, #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 7/15/2019 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by AMERISOURCE BERGEN CORPORATION, AMERISOURCE BERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(LOUCKS, ERIN)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by GUERBERT LLC, LIEBEL-FLARSHEIM COMPANY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(KENDALL, JAMIE)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by DEBRA MARIE ALBANESE on behalf of GE HEALTHCARE, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (ALBANESE, DEBRA)
June 11, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GE HEALTHCARE, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/26/2019. (tf, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants General Electric Company and GE Healthcare Inc.. Attorney STEPHEN GERARD TRAFLET for GE HEALTHCARE, INC.,STEPHEN GERARD TRAFLET for GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY added. (TRAFLET, STEPHEN)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM, OPINION, ORDER Directing the Oleander claimants to produce copies of the Root Cause Analysis report to all parties by June 14, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/7/2019. (rss, )
June 7, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/26/2019. (rss, )
June 7, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the Order attached to docket entry #7 filed by the Clerk's office on 6/7/2019 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (rss, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (CORONATO, WILFRED)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Initial Conference set for 7/16/2019 11:30 AM in Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 6/6/2019. (cry, )
June 6, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
June 5, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (CORONATO, WILFRED)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC. (CORONATO, WILFRED)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAYER CORPORATION. (CORONATO, WILFRED)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey: Atlantic County, case number ATL-L-000848-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9720921), filed by BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC, BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service)(CORONATO, WILFRED)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREMO v. BAYER CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUERBERT LLC
Represented By: JAMIE LYNN KENDALL
Represented By: BRIAN W. SHAFFER
Represented By: BRAD MICHAEL WELSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC
Represented By: WILFRED P. CORONATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT LLC
Represented By: JEREMY ALEXANDER GUNN
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Represented By: STEPHEN GERARD TRAFLET
Represented By: DEBRA MARIE ALBANESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERISOURCE BERGEN DRUG CORPORATION
Represented By: JEREMY ALEXANDER GUNN
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT, INC.
Represented By: JEREMY ALEXANDER GUNN
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIEBEL-FLARSHEIM COMPANY LLC
Represented By: JAMIE LYNN KENDALL
Represented By: BRIAN W. SHAFFER
Represented By: BRAD MICHAEL WELSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: WILFRED P. CORONATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYER CORPORATION
Represented By: WILFRED P. CORONATO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERISOURCE BERGEN CORPORATION
Represented By: JEREMY ALEXANDER GUNN
Represented By: ERIN PATRICIA LOUCKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE HEALTHCARE, INC.
Represented By: STEPHEN GERARD TRAFLET
Represented By: DEBRA MARIE ALBANESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY GREMO
Represented By: DEREK T. BRASLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?