NOVOTEK THERAPEUTICS INC. et al v. AKERS BIOSCIENCES, INC.
Plaintiff: NOVOTEK PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED and NOVOTEK THERAPEUTICS INC.
Defendant: AKERS BIOSCIENCES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv13668
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting Defendant's letter request for an extension of time to answer the Complaint by 9/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 8/9/2019. (dmr)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Justin B. Singer. (SINGER, JUSTIN)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JUSTIN B. SINGER on behalf of AKERS BIOSCIENCES, INC. (SINGER, JUSTIN)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NOVOTEK THERAPEUTICS INC., NOVOTEK PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED. AKERS BIOSCIENCES, INC. waiver sent on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (STOCKWELL, MATTHEW)
June 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Seal Document #2 Exhibit (to Document),, . Motion set for 8/5/2019 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Seal Document #2 Exhibit (to Document),, by NOVOTEK PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED, NOVOTEK THERAPEUTICS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew D. Stockwell, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(STOCKWELL, MATTHEW)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AKERS BIOSCIENCES, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, no later than the first Rule 16 conference.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 6/12/2019. (cry, )
June 12, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NOVOTEK PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED identifying Yifan International Pharmaceutical Co as Corporate Parent.. (STOCKWELL, MATTHEW)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NOVOTEK THERAPEUTICS INC. identifying Novotek Pharmaceuticals Ltd. as Corporate Parent.. (STOCKWELL, MATTHEW)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, Exhibits 1-5 to the Complaint Filed Under Seal by NOVOTEK PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED, NOVOTEK THERAPEUTICS INC.. (STOCKWELL, MATTHEW)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AKERS BIOSCIENCES, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9737732) with JURY DEMAND, filed by NOVOTEK THERAPEUTICS INC., NOVOTEK PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(STOCKWELL, MATTHEW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NOVOTEK THERAPEUTICS INC. et al v. AKERS BIOSCIENCES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOVOTEK PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED
Represented By: MATTHEW D. STOCKWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOVOTEK THERAPEUTICS INC.
Represented By: MATTHEW D. STOCKWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AKERS BIOSCIENCES, INC.
Represented By: JUSTIN B. SINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?