STANFORD v. CITIBANK-LLBEAN CORPORATIONS
Plaintiff: STAN T. STANFORD and SKYRM
Defendant: CITIBANK-LLBEAN CORPORATIONS
Case Number: 1:2019cv13715
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Due to the Court's Order of Administrative Termination, the hearing on 7/25/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider shall be, and is hereby, adjourned. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 7/15/2019. (tf, )
July 11, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (dmr)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER directing Plaintiff and Citibank to submit their dispute to arbitration with the American Arbitration Association in accordance with the parties' written agreement(s) to arbitration, etc; ORDERED that the Clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE this action. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 7/11/2019. (dmr)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER:, Initial Scheduling Conference rescheduled to 7/25/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/17/2019. (dmr)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to Arbitration by CITIBANK-LLBEAN CORPORATIONS(REILEY, WILLIAM)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CITIBANK-LLBEAN CORPORATIONS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(REILEY, WILLIAM)
June 14, 2019 Clerk's Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CITIBANK-LLBEAN CORPORATIONS has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/5/2019. (dmr)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant, Citibank-LLBean Corporations.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(REILEY, WILLIAM)
June 14, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (ssp, )
June 14, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Nature of Suit,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ssp, )
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Initial Conference set for 7/17/2019 09:30 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/14/2019. (ssp, )
June 13, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CITIBANK-LLBEAN CORPORATIONS from New Jersey Superior Court, Camden County, case number CAM-DC-004801-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9740584), filed by CITIBANK-LLBEAN CORPORATIONS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(REILEY, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STANFORD v. CITIBANK-LLBEAN CORPORATIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STAN T. STANFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SKYRM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIBANK-LLBEAN CORPORATIONS
Represented By: WILLIAM PATRICK REILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?