SCIORE et al v. PHUNG et al
Plaintiff: OLD CITY PRETZEL COMPANY, LLC and MICHAEL SCIORE
Defendant: STUDIO KP LLC, KELLY PHUNG and JOHN DOES #1-8
Case Number: 1:2019cv13775
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MICHAEL SCIORE, OLD CITY PRETZEL COMPANY, LLC. KELLY PHUNG waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019; STUDIO KP LLC waiver sent on 6/21/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (LIN, DAVID)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to KELLY PHUNG, STUDIO KP LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Summons to be Issued by MICHAEL SCIORE, OLD CITY PRETZEL COMPANY, LLC as to STUDIO KP LLC. (LIN, DAVID)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Summons to be Issued by MICHAEL SCIORE, OLD CITY PRETZEL COMPANY, LLC as to KELLY PHUNG. (LIN, DAVID)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, no later than the first Rule 16 conference.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 6/18/2019. (ssp, )
June 14, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OLD CITY PRETZEL COMPANY, LLC. (LIN, DAVID)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KELLY PHUNG, STUDIO KP LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9744410), filed by MICHAEL SCIORE, OLD CITY PRETZEL COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIN, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCIORE et al v. PHUNG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLD CITY PRETZEL COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: DAVID D. LIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL SCIORE
Represented By: DAVID D. LIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STUDIO KP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY PHUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES #1-8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?