RODGERS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: HERBERT O RODGERS
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE REGIONAL CHIEF COUNSEL and UNITED STATES ATTORNEY DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY
Case Number: 1:2019cv13968
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 Administrative Record Filed - Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10)(KERNICKY, JOANNE)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JOANNE KELLEY KERNICKY on behalf of COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (KERNICKY, JOANNE)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HERBERT O RODGERS. ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (JARVIS, ADRIENNE)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HERBERT O RODGERS. OFFICE OF THE REGIONAL CHIEF COUNSEL served on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (JARVIS, ADRIENNE)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HERBERT O RODGERS. UNITED STATES ATTORNEY DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY served on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (JARVIS, ADRIENNE)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
June 24, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the USM Transmittal letter attached to docket entry #3 filed by the Clerk's office on 6/21/20189 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (cry, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from ADRIENNE F. JARVIS. (JARVIS, ADRIENNE)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (cry, )
June 20, 2019 COMPLAINT #1 against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by HERBERT O RODGERS.(cry, )
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting Plaintiff's IFP application. ORDERED that the Clerk file the complaint etc Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 6/20/2019. (cry, ) Modified on 6/24/2019 (cry, ).
June 19, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman added. (dd, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application IFP)(JARVIS, ADRIENNE) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2019: #3 Text of Proposed Order) (cry, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RODGERS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: JOANNE KELLEY KERNICKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF THE REGIONAL CHIEF COUNSEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES ATTORNEY DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HERBERT O RODGERS
Represented By: ADRIENNE FREYA JARVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?